Graaf v. Schuster Enterprises, Inc.

3:2014-cv-00247 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 482 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/04/2014
COMPLAINT against Burger King Corporation (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602031556.), filed by Michelle Graaf.
1
Receipt
1 Attachment
2
04/04/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Michelle Graaf.
3
04/09/2014
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Schuster Enterprises, Inc., filed by Michelle Graaf.
04/10/2014
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Michelle Graaf. (No pdf attached to this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
04/11/2014
Summons Issued as to Schuster Enterprises, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with 3 Amended Complaint.
5
04/14/2014
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and Amended Complaint signed by Fields for Schuster Enterprises, Inc. served on 4/11/2014, answer due 5/2/2014.
6
04/17/2014
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and Amended Complaint signed by Ashleigh Monell for Schuster Enterprises, Inc. served on 4/15/2014.
7
04/24/2014
NOTICE of Appearance by Lowell Landis Sexton on behalf of Michelle Graaf
04/24/2014
***Attorney Tracy Gwyn Birdsong added for Michelle Graaf. (see Doc. 7 for pdf) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
04/30/2014
Joint MOTION to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint by Schuster Enterprises, Inc., and Michelle Graaf. Modified on 5/1/2014 to clean up text and add additional filer.
9
04/30/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Schuster Enterprises, Inc.
10
04/30/2014
Motion for Richard M. Escoffery to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Schuster Enterprises, Inc. Modified on 5/1/2014 to include name of attorney requesting appearance.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
11
04/30/2014
Motion for John D. Bennet to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Schuster Enterprises, Inc. Modified on 5/1/2014 to include name of attorney requesting appearance.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
04/30/2014
***Attorney Richard M. Escoffery, and John D. Bennett added PRO HAC VICE for Schuster Enterprises, Inc. (see Doc. 10 and 11 for pdfs) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2014
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Schuster Enterprises, Inc. (NO PDF attached) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
05/02/2014
ORDER directing that, upon consideration of the Joint Motion to Extend Time (Doc. 8), it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED; Defendant shall have until on or before June 2, 2014, in which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint; further ORDERED that, on or before May 28, 2014, each party shall complete and file with the Clerk of the Court the attached form in order to confirm they party's consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/2/14.
13
05/05/2014
Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re 10 & 11 Motions: $ 100.00, receipt number 4602031876.
05/07/2014
Motions No Longer Referred to US Magistrate Judge: 10 & 11 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
05/07/2014
Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge.
15
05/08/2014
TEXT ORDER granting 10 and 11 Motions for Richard M. Escoffery and John D. Bennet Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/8/14.(NO PDF Document attached to this notice).
16
05/29/2014
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Schuster Enterprises, Inc., and Michelle Graaf. Modified on 5/30/2014 to add additional filer.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
17
06/02/2014
TEXT ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time; Dft Schuster Enterprises, Inc. to answer or file other responsive pleading to Plf's Complaint is extended to 6/16/2014, and all other deadlines for Defendant are extended accordingly. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/2/2014. (No pdf attached to this entry)
18
06/16/2014
ANSWER to 3 Amended Complaint by Schuster Enterprises, Inc.
19
06/18/2014
STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Michelle Graaf, Schuster Enterprises, Inc. Modified on 6/18/2014 to add as also filed on behalf of the dft.
20
06/23/2014
JUDGMENT re 19 Stipulation of Dismissal: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this cause is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs; DIRECTING the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/23/2014.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.