Graciani v. Providence Health & Services et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00087 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
8
06/01/2018
Notice of Change of Address
9
06/06/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
10
06/07/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
11
06/11/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
06/12/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
06/15/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
14
06/15/2018
Answer to Complaint
15
06/20/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
16
06/20/2018
Notice (Other)
17
06/21/2018
Summons Returned Executed
18
07/03/2018
Vacate
19
07/03/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
20
07/06/2018
Order on Motion to Vacate
21
07/10/2018
Notice of Appearance
22
07/13/2018
Notice (Other)
23
07/17/2018
Answer to Complaint
24
07/31/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
25
08/01/2018
Scheduling Order
08/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
08/13/2018
Notice of Change of Address
28
08/15/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
29
08/15/2018
Affidavit
30
08/21/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
31
08/24/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
32
08/24/2018
Witness List
08/27/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
08/24/2018
Stipulation
35
08/29/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
08/30/2018
Order on Stipulation (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
09/05/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
38
09/05/2018
Affidavit
39
09/05/2018
Notice (Other)
40
10/01/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
41
10/02/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
42
10/09/2018
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
43
10/09/2018
Supplement
10/24/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
10/09/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
46
10/29/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
47
11/13/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
48
12/12/2018
Order
12/20/2018
Settlement Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
02/01/2019
Witness List
50
02/03/2019
Initial Disclosure
51
03/25/2019
Notice of Change of Address
52
03/28/2019
Compel
53
03/28/2019
Declaration
54
04/08/2019
ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIM V: Defendants Motion to Dismiss Claim V at Docket 42 is GRANTED as to all Defendants, without prejudice and with leave to amend. Ms. Graciani is accorded 14 days from the date of this order to file an amende d complaint, or a notice that she intends to proceed solely on Claims IIV and VI as to Providence only. If an amended complaint is filed, Defendants are accorded 14 days from the date of its filing to respond. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 04/05/2019.
55
04/11/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
56
04/11/2019
Declaration
04/16/2019
Notice Re: Chamber Copy (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
04/18/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
59
04/18/2019
Declaration
60
04/18/2019
Additional Related Document
61
04/19/2019
Amend/Correct
62
04/24/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
63
04/24/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
64
04/26/2019
Hearing
04/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/29/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/29/2019
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
66
04/29/2019
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
67
04/30/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
68
04/30/2019
Declaration
05/01/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
Order on Motion to Expedite (Text entry; no document attached.)
69
04/30/2019
Expedite
71
05/03/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
72
05/03/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
73
05/03/2019
Additional Related Document
05/06/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/06/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
05/06/2019
Order
76
05/08/2019
Scheduling Order
77
05/10/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
78
05/13/2019
Amend/Correct
79
05/15/2019
Notice (Other)
80
05/21/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
81
05/23/2019
Notice of Change of Address
82
05/24/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.