Greater Southeast Alaska Conservation Community et al v. Stewart et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2016-cv-00009 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
55
05/31/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
56
06/07/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
57
06/08/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
58
06/13/2018
Notice (Other)
06/14/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
06/29/2018
Dismiss
61
07/20/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
62
07/20/2018
Response in Support of Motion
63
08/03/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
08/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
65
08/17/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.