Green Valley Hospital, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona (Bankruptcy)

4:2017-bk-03353 (azb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 103 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/03/2017
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements (except for those listed below). Failure to timely upload the list of creditors, may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Electronic Filing Declaration due 04/24/2017, Master Mailing due 04/10/2017, Schedules A/B-J due 04/17/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 04/17/2017, Attorney Disclosure Statement due 04/17/2017, Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income due by 04/17/2017, Payment Advices Declaration Required by 11 USC Section 521(a)(1)(B)(iv) due by 04/17/2017, filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC (FORRESTER, S.)
04/03/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(4:17-bk-03353) [other,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28181201. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
04/03/2017
Omnibus Declaration of John Matuska in Support of First Day Motions filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
3
04/03/2017
Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 05/11/2017 at 11:00 AM at U.S. Trustee Meeting Room, James A. Walsh Court, 38 S Scott Ave, St 140, Tucson, AZ (341-TUC). (FORRESTER, S.)
4
04/03/2017
Ex Parte Motion to Exceed Page Limit of First Day Motions filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
5
04/03/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request For Notice filed by ROBERT M CHARLES JR of LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP on behalf of SCM Specialty Finance Opportunities Fund, L.P.
6
04/03/2017
Amended Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by ROBERT M CHARLES JR of LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP on behalf of SCM Specialty Finance Opportunities Fund, L.P.
7
04/03/2017
Emergency Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION FOR ORDER (1) AUTHORIZING DEBTOR TO OBTAIN POST-PETITION FINANCING PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 364; (2) GRANTING LIENS AND SUPERPRIORITY CLAIMS PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 364; (3) AUTHORIZING THE USE OF CASH COLLATERAL PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 363; (4) SCHEDULING A FINAL HEARING; AND (5) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
8
04/03/2017
Emergency Motion to Approve Emergency Motion to Establish Notice and Service Procedures filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
9
04/03/2017
Ex Parte Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
10
04/04/2017
Notice of Appearance filed by ROBERT A. SHULL of DICKINSON WRIGHT on behalf of Artemis Realty Capital Advisors, LLC.
11
04/04/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by LARRY L. WATSON of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.
12
04/04/2017
Notice of Appearance filed by KELLY SINGER of SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS (US) LLP on behalf of LATERAL U.S. CREDIT OPPORTUNITIES FUND, L.P.
13
04/04/2017
Motion to Set Hearing EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION FOR ACCELERATED HEARINGS ON FIRST DAY MOTIONS filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
14
04/04/2017
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING DEBTORS EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION FOR ACCELERATED HEARINGS ON FIRST DAY MOTIONS filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC (related document(s) 13 Motion to Set Hearing).(FORRESTER, S.)
15
04/04/2017
Notice of Emergency/Expedited Hearing on First Day Motions filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC (related document(s) 13 Motion to Set Hearing) Hearing on Emergency/Expedited Motion set for 4/6/2017 at 03:00 PM at 38 S. Scott Avenue, Courtroom 329, Tucson, AZ (Tucson Court - SHG).(FORRESTER, S.)
16
04/04/2017
Notice of Appearance filed by DEAN M. DINNER of NUSSBAUM GILLIS & DINNER, P.C. on behalf of James R. McDowell.
17
04/04/2017
Notice of Appearance filed by STEVEN D. JEROME of SNELL & WILMER L.L.P. on behalf of Green Valley Medical Investments, LLLP.
18
04/04/2017
Notice of Appearance AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE filed by PATRICK A CLISHAM of ENGELMAN BERGER PC on behalf of GVH Mexinvestors, LLC; Vantage FBA Daniel L. Poppe IRA; Ruben Araiza, and Laura Esther Araiza.
19
04/04/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by JODY A. CORRALES of DECONCINI MCDONALD YETWIN & LACY P.C. on behalf of Padmon, LLC.
20
04/04/2017
ORDER Approving Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Accelerated Hearings on First Day Motions (Related Doc # 13) signed on 4/4/2017 Hearing set for 4/6/2017 at 03:00 PM at 38 S. Scott Avenue, Courtroom 329, Tucson, AZ (Tucson Court - SHG) Parties may also appear at 230 N. 1st Avenue, Courtroom 301, Phoenix, AZ 85003.
21
04/04/2017
Amended Notice of Emergency/Expedited Hearing ON (1) FIRST DAY MOTIONS and (2) MOTION FOR ACCELERATED HEARING ON FIRST DAY MOTIONS filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC (related document(s) 20 Order on Motion to Set Hearing) Hearing on Emergency/Expedited Motion set for 4/6/2017 at 03:00 PM at 38 S. Scott Avenue, Courtroom 329, Tucson, AZ (Tucson Court - SHG).(FORRESTER, S.)
22
04/05/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by ALISA C. LACEY of STINSON LEONARD STREET LLP on behalf of CERNER CORPORATION.
23
04/05/2017
Response to Motion/Application Proposed Interim DIP Financing Order Regarding SCM's Cash Collateral (related to motions(s)7) filed by ROBERT M CHARLES JR of LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP on behalf of SCM Specialty Finance Opportunities Fund, L.P.
24
04/05/2017
Application to Employ Counsel for the Debtors filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
25
04/05/2017
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Employment of Counsel for the Debtors filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC (related document(s) 24 Application to Employ).(FORRESTER, S.)
26
04/06/2017
Deficiency Memo (related document(s) 25 Notice of Lodging Proposed Order)
27
04/06/2017
Amended Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Employment of Counsel for the Debtors filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC (related document(s) 24 Application to Employ).(FORRESTER, S.)
28
04/06/2017
Objection /Preliminary Limited Objection to Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Debtor in Possession Financing filed by DEAN M. DINNER of NUSSBAUM GILLIS & DINNER, P.C. on behalf of James R. McDowell (related document(s) 7 Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral).
29
04/06/2017
Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice filed by MICHAEL R. JOHNSON of RAY QUINNEY & NEBEKER PC on behalf of Med One Capital Funding, LLC.
30
04/10/2017
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING DEBTORS EX PARTE MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS FOR FIRST DAY MOTIONS filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC (related document(s) 4 Motion to Exceed Page Limit).(FORRESTER, S.)
31
04/10/2017
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Setting Bar Date for Proofs of Claim filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC (related document(s) 9 Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim).(FORRESTER, S.)
32
04/10/2017
ORDER Granting Motion to Exceed Page Limit (Related Doc # 4) signed on 4/10/2017.
33
04/10/2017
ORDER for Joint Administration signed on 4/10/2017.
34
04/10/2017
ORDER Granting Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim (Related Doc # 9) signed on 4/10/2017.
35
04/10/2017
Request for Notice Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2017
36
04/11/2017
Chapter 11 Corp/Part Notice of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/11/2017 at 11:00 AM at U.S. Trustee Meeting Room, James A. Walsh Court, 38 S Scott Ave, St 140, Tucson, AZ (341-TUC)
37
04/06/2017
** ENTERED IN ERROR** Minutes of Hearing held on: 04/06/2017 Subject: EXPEDITED HEARING ON EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION FOR ACCELERATED HEARINGS ON FIRST DAY MOTIONS FILED BY S. CARY FORRESTER OF FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC ON BEHALF OF GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (vCal Hearing ID (1203848)). (related document(s) 13) Modified on 4/13/2017
38
04/06/2017
Minutes of Hearing held on: 04/06/2017 Subject: EXPEDITED HEARING ON EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION FOR ACCELERATED HEARINGS ON FIRST DAY MOTIONS FILED BY S. CARY FORRESTER OF FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC ON BEHALF OF GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (vCal Hearing ID (1203848)). (related document(s) 13)
39
04/11/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors (related document(s) 36 BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part)
40
04/18/2017
ORDER GRANTING DEBTORS EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION FOR AN ORDER UNDER BANKRUPTCY RULE 1007(C) EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR FILING SCHEDULES AND STATEMENT OF FINANCIAL AFFAIRS AND ACCOMPANYING DOCUMENTS signed on 4/18/2017.
41
04/20/2017
Schedules for Non-Individual filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. Electronic Filing Declaration due by 04/27/2017, (FORRESTER, S.)
42
04/20/2017
List of Equity Security Holders filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
43
04/20/2017
Declaration re: Master Mailing List filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
44
04/24/2017
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. Electronic Filing Declaration due by 05/1/2017, (FORRESTER, S.)
45
04/25/2017
Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
46
05/02/2017
Notice of Substitution of Attorney filed by RENEE SANDLER SHAMBLIN of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.
47
05/03/2017
Notice of Withdrawal of United States Trustee's:Notice of Substitution of Counsel for the United States Trustee filed by LARRY L. WATSON of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE (related document(s) 46 Notice of Substitution of Attorney).
48
05/04/2017
Periodic Report Regarding Value, Operations and Profitability of Entities in Which the Debtor's Estate Holds a Substantial or Controlling Interest filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
49
05/18/2017
Monthly Operating Report For April, 2017 filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
50
05/23/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by CRISTINA PEREZ HESANO of BELLAH PEREZ, PLLC on behalf of DAVID S. WANGER.(PEREZ HESANO, CRISTINA)
51
05/30/2017
Minutes of 341 Meeting filed by LARRY L. WATSON of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.
52
06/19/2017
Withdrawal of Claim 9 filed by MATTHEW ALLEN SILVERMAN of OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL on behalf of ARIZONA HEALTH CARE COST CONTAINMENT SYSTEM.
53
06/21/2017
Monthly Operating Report For May, 2017 filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
54
07/18/2017
Monthly Operating Report For June, 2017 filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
55
08/16/2017
Monthly Operating Report For July, 2017 filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
56
09/08/2017
Withdrawal of Claim 61 filed by CODY D. VANDEWERKER of GERALD K. SMITH AND JOHN C SMITH LAW on behalf of GE Healthcare.
57
09/19/2017
Monthly Operating Report For August, 2017 filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
58
10/04/2017
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 11,15 signed on 10/4/2017.
59
10/05/2017
Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order (related document(s) 58 Order Ruling on Objection to Claim)
60
10/05/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by ROBERT M CHARLES JR of LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP on behalf of SQN Asset Finance Income Fund Ltd.
61
10/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 59 Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order)
62
10/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 59 Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order)
63
10/19/2017
Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to File Notice of Appeal filed by JOHN C SMITH of GERALD K SMITH & JOHN C SMITH LAW OFFICE on behalf of GE Healthcare (related document(s) 58 Order Ruling on Objection to Claim).
64
10/19/2017
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order to Extend Time to File Notice of Appeal filed by JOHN C SMITH of GERALD K SMITH & JOHN C SMITH LAW OFFICE on behalf of GE Healthcare (related document(s) 63 Motion to Extend).
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
65
10/20/2017
Certificate of Mailing filed by JOHN C SMITH of GERALD K SMITH & JOHN C SMITH LAW OFFICE on behalf of GE Healthcare. (related document(s) 63 Motion to Extend, 64 Notice of Lodging Proposed Order)
66
10/20/2017
ORDER Granting Motion to Extend (Related Doc # 63) signed on 10/20/2017.
67
10/25/2017
Monthly Operating Report For September, 2017 filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
68
11/17/2017
Monthly Operating Report For October, 2017 filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
69
12/01/2017
Change of Address filed by MATTHEW ALLEN SILVERMAN of OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL on behalf of ARIZONA HEALTH CARE COST CONTAINMENT SYSTEM.
70
12/18/2017
Monthly Operating Report For November, 2017 filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
71
02/06/2018
Monthly Operating Report For December, 2017 filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
72
06/21/2018
Amended Operating Report For December, 2017 Amended Monthly Operating Report for December, 2017 filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
73
06/22/2018
Monthly Operating Report For January, 2018 filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
74
06/22/2018
Monthly Operating Report For February, 2018 filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
75
06/22/2018
Monthly Operating Report For March, 2018 filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
76
07/12/2018
Monthly Operating Report For April, 2018 filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
77
07/25/2018
Monthly Operating Report For May, 2018 filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
78
07/25/2018
Monthly Operating Report For June, 2018 filed by S. CARY FORRESTER of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of GREEN VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC. (FORRESTER, S.)
79
09/28/2018
oDismissing Case
81
10/19/2018
Operating Report
10/19/2018
Close Bankruptcy Case (ALL) (DISMISSED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.