Gregory A. Burden, Jr. and Claudette C. Burden
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00344 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
33
07/25/2018
Entry of Appearance
34
08/13/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
35
08/17/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
08/17/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
08/17/2018
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
37
08/17/2018
Certificate of Service
38
08/21/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
39
08/28/2018
Hearing
40
09/12/2018
Proceeding Memo
41
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
42
10/15/2018
Change of Address
10/17/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.