Gregory A Smith
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2014-bk-03143 (alnb)

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[51] Case Closed Without Discharge). Notice Date 02/14/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 14-03143-TOM Gregory A Smith Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: mbagwell Page 1 of 2 Date Rcvd: Feb 12, 2018 Form ID: van032 Total Noticed: 35 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Feb 14, 2018. db #+Gregory A Smith, 274 Rime Village Dr, Birmingham, AL 35216-6406 8373628 +APCO EMPLOYEES CREDIT UNION, 750 17TH ST N, BIRMINGHAM, AL 35203-2020 8364483 +APCO Employees CU, 1608 7th Ave N, Birmingham, AL 35203-1908 8364482 America's Readers/preferred renewals, c/o Interstate Recovery, POB OX 8125, Virginia Beach, VA 23450 8364484 ++BANK OF AMERICA, PO BOX 982238, EL PASO TX 79998-2238 (address filed with court: Bk Of Amer, Po Box 982235, El Paso, TX 79998) 8364486 ++CITIBANK, PO BOX 790034, ST LOUIS MO 63179-0034 (address filed with court: Citibank Usa, Citicorp Credit Services/Attn:Centralize, Po Box 20507, Kansas City, MO 64195) 8364485 +Chase, Po Box 15298, Wilmington, DE 19850-5298 8364487 +Coastal Readers Service/Preferred Renewa, c/o Interstate Recovery, PO BOX 8125, Virginia Beach, VA 23450-8125 8364490 +First National Bank, Attention:FNN Legal Dept, 1620 Dodge St. Stop Code: 3290, Omaha, NE 68197-0003 8380722 +First National Bank of Omaha, 1620 Dodge Street, Stop Code 3105, Omaha Ne 68197-0003 8364494 Jefferson County Sewer Services, ATTN: Billing, 716 Richard Arrington Jr # 800, Birmingham, AL 35203-0123 8364495 Jewelry TV PReferred, PO BOX 105658, Atlanta, GA 30348-5658 8364496 +Joyce W Vance, Us Attorney Northern District of Alabama, 1801 4th Ave N, Birmingham, AL 35203-2101 8395522 +Shelby County Water Services, POB 10, Columbiana AL 35051-0010 8364499 State of Ala Dept of Revenue, POB 154, Montgomery, AL 36135-0001 8364501 US Atty General/Office of US Atty Gen., US Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Ave, Washington, DC 20530-0001 8372293 Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., P.O. Box 19657, Irvine, CA 92623-9657 8364480 +Wfs Financial/Wachovia Dealer Srvs, Po Box 3569, Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91729-3569 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. 8395518 E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@revenue.alabama.gov Feb 13 2018 01:30:44 ALA Dept of Revenue Legal Division, PO Box 320001, Montgomery, AL 36132-0001 8395521 E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@alagasco.com Feb 13 2018 01:30:42 AlaGasCo, ATTN: Bankruptcy, PO Box 2224, Birmingham, AL 35246-0022 8395520 +E-mail/Text: G2APCBANK@southernco.com Feb 13 2018 01:28:38 Alabama Power, Attn: Bankruptcy, 1313 6th Ave N, Birmingham, AL 35203-1701 8383358 E-mail/PDF: EBN_AIS@AMERICANINFOSOURCE.COM Feb 13 2018 01:32:47 American InfoSource LP as agent for, Midland Funding LLC, PO Box 268941, Oklahoma City, OK 73126-8941 8384077 +E-mail/PDF: acg.acg.ebn@americaninfosource.com Feb 13 2018 01:26:03 Compass Bank, P.O. Box 201347, Arlington, TX 76006-1347 8364488 +E-mail/Text: defaultspecialty.us@bbva.com Feb 13 2018 01:29:09 Compass Bank/BBVA Compass Bk, Attn:Bankruptcy, Po Box 10566, Birmingham, AL 35296-0001 8367982 E-mail/Text: mrdiscen@discover.com Feb 13 2018 01:28:02 Discover Bank, DB Servicing Corporation, PO Box 3025, New Albany, OH 43054-3025 8364489 +E-mail/Text: mrdiscen@discover.com Feb 13 2018 01:28:02 Discover Fin Svcs Llc, Po Box 15316, Wilmington, DE 19850-5316 8364491 +E-mail/Text: cashiering-administrationservices@flagstar.com Feb 13 2018 01:30:36 Flagstar Bank, Attn: Bankruptcy Dept, 5151 Corporate Dr, Troy, MI 48098-2639 8364492 +E-mail/PDF: gecsedi@recoverycorp.com Feb 13 2018 01:25:58 GECRB/Sams Club, Gecrb/Sams Club, Po Box 103104, Roswell, GA 30076-9104 8364493 +E-mail/PDF: gecsedi@recoverycorp.com Feb 13 2018 01:25:58 GECRB/Walmart, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 103104, Roswell, GA 30076-9104 8364481 E-mail/Text: cio.bncmail@irs.gov Feb 13 2018 01:28:18 Internal Revenue Service, PO Box 7346, Philadelphia PA 19101-7346 8479553 E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Feb 13 2018 01:32:38 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, POB 41067, Norfolk VA 23541 8364497 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcyteam@quickenloans.com Feb 13 2018 01:30:09 Quickn Loans, 1050 Woodward Ave, Detroit, MI 48226-1906 8364498 E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@shelbyal.com Feb 13 2018 01:29:59 Shelby County Tax Collector, 102 Depot Street, Columbiana, AL 35051-9332 8364500 +E-mail/PDF: gecsedi@recoverycorp.com Feb 13 2018 01:26:14 Syncb/toysrus, Po Box 965005, Orlando, FL 32896-5005 8477046 E-mail/PDF: gecsedi@recoverycorp.com Feb 13 2018 01:25:59 Synchrony Bank, c/o Recovery Management Systems Corp, 25 SE 2nd Ave Suite 1120, Miami FL 33131-1605 TOTAL: 17 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (undeliverable, * duplicate) ***** 8395519* +Internal Revenue Service TCS, insolvency, 801 Tom Martin Drive, Birmingham, AL 35211-6432 8395523* Shelby County Tax Collector, 102 Depot Street, Columbiana AL 35051-9332 TOTALS: 0, * 2, ## 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Case 14-03143-TOM13 Doc 53 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 3 District/off: 1126-2 User: mbagwell Page 2 of 2 Date Rcvd: Feb 12, 2018 Form ID: van032 Total Noticed: 35 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (continued) ***** Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. Addresses marked '++' were redirected to the recipient's preferred mailing address pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 342(f)/Fed.R.Bank.PR.2002(g)(4). Addresses marked '#' were identified by the USPS National Change of Address system as requiring an update. While the notice was still deliverable, the notice recipient was advised to update its address with the court immediately. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Feb 14, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on February 12, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Brent William Davis on behalf of Debtor Gregory A Smith brent@brentwdavis.com, bwdllcmyecfmail@gmail.com;brentwdavisassociatesllc@gmail.com;r41804@notify.bestcase.com TOTAL: 2 Case 14-03143-TOM13 Doc 53 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 3 Van−032 [Case Closed Without Discharge] (Rev. 12/15) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 14−03143−TOM13 Gregory A Smith Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−6634 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF CASE CLOSED WITHOUT DISCHARGE All creditors and parties in interest are notified that the above−captioned case has been closed without entry of discharge for the reason(s) indicated below. Debtor did not file Official Form 423, Certification About a Financial Management Course. Debtor did not file Director's Procedural Form 2830, Chapter 13 Debtor's Certifications Regarding Domestic Support Obligations and Section 522(q), as required by Administrative Order 09−01. Debtor received a discharge in a prior case commenced before the time limitations specified in 11 U.S.C. §727(a)(8) or before the time limitations and without satisfying the conditions specified in 11 U.S.C. §727(a)(9). Debtor received a discharge in a prior case commenced before the time limitations specified in 11 U.S.C. §1328(f)(1) and (2). Dated: February 12, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court meb Case 14-03143-TOM13 Doc 53 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 3 of 3

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 250 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/11/2014
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Gregory A Smith
3
08/11/2014
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith.
4
08/11/2014
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith.
5
08/11/2014
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith.
6
08/11/2014
Amended Schedule I, Amended Schedule J, Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities, Summary of Schedules, Declaration re: Filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith.
7
08/11/2014
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 09/10/2014 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 10/21/2014 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 1 (TBB) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 12/09/2014. Government Proof of Claim due by 02/09/2015 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 11/10/2014.
8
08/11/2014
Less 100% Composition Letter (pro rata)
9
08/11/2014
Clerk's Notice of Non-Payment of Filing Fees due in the amount of $310.00 by filer Brent Davis, attorney for debtor for Voluntary Petition Filing Fee. The debtor is required to pay the filing fee within fourteen days from the date of this notice. Failure to comply with the foregoing payment requirement within the stated time limit will result in the IMMEDIATE DISMISSAL of this case without further hearing. (RE: related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith). Filing Fees due by 8/25/2014.
10
08/12/2014
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11
08/13/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 08/13/2014.
12
08/13/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Letter). Notice Date 08/13/2014.
13
08/13/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith). Notice Date 08/13/2014.
08/14/2014
Payment of Voluntary Petition Fee. Fee Amount $ 310 Filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith. (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2014
Receipt of Payment of Fee(14-03143-TBB13) [misc,feepay] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 16977170. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
08/14/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 08/14/2014.
15
09/10/2014
Trustee's Notice Continuance of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/17/2014 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.
16
09/10/2014
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith.
17
09/10/2014
Amended Schedule C, Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities, Summary of Schedules, Declaration re:, Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith.
18
09/10/2014
Amended Schedules. F Fee Amount $30 Filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith.
09/10/2014
Receipt of Amended Schedules (Fee)(14-03143-TBB13) [misc,amdsch2] (30.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 17077704. Fee Amount 30.00 (re:Doc# 18) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
09/11/2014
Notice of Amendment to Schedules (RE: related document(s) 18 Amended Schedules (Fee) filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith).
20
09/13/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 Notice of Amendment to Schedules (prior to confirmation)). Notice Date 09/13/2014.
21
09/14/2014
Tax Documents for the Year for 2013 Filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith.
22
09/15/2014
Motion to Surrender Filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith
23
09/15/2014
Debtor's Objection to Claim 3 of creditor Wells Fargo in the amount of $2939.19 Filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith.
24
09/15/2014
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 22 Motion to Surrender filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith, 23 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith). Hearing scheduled 10/21/2014 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (TBB) Birmingham.
25
09/17/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 24 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/17/2014.
26
09/18/2014
Meeting of Creditors Held 9/17/014.
27
09/22/2014
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7.
28
09/23/2014
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 27 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7). Hearing scheduled 10/21/2014 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 1 (TBB) Birmingham.
29
09/23/2014
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith.
30
09/25/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 28 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/25/2014.
31
10/14/2014
Trustee's Bench Sheet.
32
10/14/2014
Amended Schedule I, Amended Schedule J, Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities, Summary of Schedules, Declaration re: Filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith.
33
10/22/2014
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #22; Debtor's Motion to Surrender Collateral) Hearing scheduled 10/21/2014 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 1 (TBB) Birmingham.
34
10/22/2014
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #23; Debtor's Objection to Claim #3 of Wells Fargo in the amount of $2939.19) Hearing scheduled 10/21/2014 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 1 (TBB) Birmingham.
35
10/22/2014
Courtroom Deputy Notes (The Trustee's objection to confirmation, motion to dismiss, and motion to convert case to a Chapter 7 are moot. This case is confirmed per Trustee's bench sheet.) Confirmation Hearing
36
10/22/2014
Order - the Debtor's motion to surrender collateral is GRANTED, the objection is SUSTAINED and claim number 3 is allowed as an informational claim only with the right of the claimant to file an amended claim. Signed on 10/22/2014 (RE: related document(s) 22 Motion to Surrender filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith, 23 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith).
37
10/25/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 36 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 10/25/2014.
38
11/02/2014
Notice of Change of Address of Debtor Filed by Debtor Gregory A Smith.
39
11/04/2014
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss or in the alternative, Motion to Convert to Chapter 7 are moot. Signed on 11/4/2014 (RE: related document(s) 27 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7).
40
11/06/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 39 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 11/06/2014.
41
10/12/2016
Trustee's Motion to Modify Plan After Confirmation. (Ch13troffice, km)
43
10/13/2016
Notice and Order Granting and the confirmed plan is modified to a pot of $12,927.00 so that general unsecured creditors will receive a pot of $12,927.00, and the Debtor will contribute all of his projected disposable income for the applicable commitment period Signed on 10/13/2016 (RE: related document(s) 41 Trustee's Motion to Modify Plan).
44
10/15/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 43 Notice and Order). Notice Date 10/15/2016.
45
09/11/2017
Trustee's Certification of Plan Completion. (Ch13troffice, tt)
46
09/11/2017
*ENTERED IN ERROR* - Notice of Requirement to File Debtor's Certifications Regarding Domestic Support Obligations and Section 522(q). (dxt) Modified per Corrective Entry on 9/11/2017
09/11/2017
Corrective Entry - Entered in Error (RE: related document(s) 46 Notice of Requirement to File Debtor's Certifications). (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
09/11/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management for Debtor., Notice of Requirement to File Debtor's Certifications Regarding Domestic Support Obligations and Section 522(q). Financial Management Course due:10/11/2017.
48
09/13/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 47 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 09/13/2017.
49
09/13/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 47 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 09/13/2017.
50
01/10/2018
Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account. (Ch13troffice, tt)
51
02/12/2018
Case closed without discharge for non-compliance. Debtor has not filed required certification documents. If the Debtor subsequently files a Motion to Reopen the Case to allow for the filing of the certification documents, the full reopening fee must be paid for filing the motion and the fee cannot be waived.
52
02/12/2018
Order Discharging Standing Trustee, Releasing Bond Liability and Closing Case: It appearing to the Court that the trustee in this case has performed all of the duties required of him in the administration of this case; that he has made distribution by order of this Court, and has rendered a full and complete account thereof, and no adverse interest being represented; It is therefore ORDERED that the Ch 13 trustee be discharged and relieved of his trust, and that he and the sureties on this bond be released from further liability thereunder; It is further Ordered that this case be, and the same is hereby CLOSED. U.S. Bankruptcy Judge (Non-Image Entry)
53
02/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[51] Case Closed Without Discharge). Notice Date 02/14/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.