Gregory B. Harris and Janice C. Harris
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81636 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
13
06/06/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
44
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
52
01/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
54
02/01/2019
Limit Notice
55
02/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
56
02/04/2019
Motion to Modify Plan

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.