Gregory Curtis Forschen and Sherry Gwen Forschen
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00299 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/10/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
09/10/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
3
09/10/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
4
09/10/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
09/10/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
6
09/10/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
7
09/10/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
8
09/10/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
09/10/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/10/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/10/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
09/11/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
10
09/11/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
11
09/11/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
12
09/11/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
13
09/11/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
14
09/11/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
15
09/11/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
16
09/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
17
09/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
18
09/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
19
09/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
20
09/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
09/14/2018
Request for Special Notice
09/17/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
09/18/2018
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
09/18/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
09/20/2018
Vacating Order (SA)
24
09/20/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
25
09/20/2018
Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)
09/20/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
09/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
28
09/27/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
09/27/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
09/27/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
30
09/27/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
31
09/27/2018
Certificate of Service
32
10/16/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
33
10/16/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
34
10/16/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
35
10/16/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
10/17/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
10/19/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
10/22/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
10/24/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
10/29/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
11/07/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
39
11/08/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
40
11/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
41
11/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.