Gregory Hill, Sr.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2016-bk-02993 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 306 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/22/2016
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Gregory Hill Sr.
2
07/22/2016
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Gregory Hill Sr.
3
07/22/2016
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Gregory Hill Sr.
5
07/22/2016
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Gregory Hill Sr.
6
07/22/2016
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Gregory Hill Sr.
7
07/22/2016
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Gregory Hill Sr.
8
07/22/2016
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/24/2016 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 09/15/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 11/22/2016. Government Proof of Claim due by 01/18/2017 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 10/24/2016.
9
07/24/2016
Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Filed by Debtor Gregory Hill Sr.
10
07/23/2016
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11
07/24/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 07/24/2016.
07/25/2016
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Gregory Hill, Sr. Case Number 05-00701, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/22/2005, Dismissed for Failure to File Information on 04/23/2009; Case Number 13-02357, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/20/2013; Case Number 85-04041, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 07/03/1985, Standard Discharge on 02/23/1990; Case Number 99-04205, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 07/19/1999, Standard Discharge on 11/08/2000; Case Number 09-03377, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/08/2009, Dismissed for Other Reason on 05/08/2013.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
07/25/2016
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Gregory Hill).
13
07/25/2016
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 9 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Gregory Hill). Hearing scheduled 8/11/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
14
07/27/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Gregory Hill). Notice Date 07/27/2016.
15
07/27/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 07/27/2016.
16
07/27/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 13 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 07/27/2016.
17
08/06/2016
Amended Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Individual Fee Amount $30, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Gregory Hill Sr.
08/06/2016
Receipt of Schedule E/F- Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims(16-02993-TOM13) [misc,schef] (30.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19673839. Fee Amount 30.00 (re:Doc# 17) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
08/08/2016
Notice of Amendment to Schedules (RE: related document(s) 17 Schedule E/F- Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims filed by Debtor Gregory Hill, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules).
19
08/10/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Notice of Amendment to Schedules (prior to confirmation)). Notice Date 08/10/2016.
20
08/11/2016
ORDER Granting Signed on 08/11/2016 RE: Doc #9; Debtor's Motion to Extend Automatic Stay.
21
08/13/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Order Granting). Notice Date 08/13/2016.
22
08/15/2016
Tax Documents for the Year for 2015 2014 Filed by Debtor Gregory Hill Sr.
23
08/19/2016
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/11/2016 10:25:36 AM ]. File Size [ 519 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:27 ]. (RE: Doc #9; Debtor's Motion to Extend Automatic Stay). (adiuser).
24
08/24/2016
Meeting of Creditors Held 8/24/2016.
25
08/25/2016
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed) with Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor MGC MORTGAGE, INC.
26
08/26/2016
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss.
27
08/28/2016
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Gregory Hill Sr.
28
08/28/2016
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Gregory Hill Sr.
29
08/29/2016
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 26 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 9/15/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
30
08/30/2016
Trustee's Direction for Deduction.
31
08/31/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 29 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 08/31/2016.
09/15/2016
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 155.00 Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham [Acting]. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/15/2016
Receipt of Payment of Fee(16-02993-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (155.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19817104. Fee Amount 155.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
09/19/2016
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
33
09/26/2016
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/15/2016 11:49:55 AM ]. File Size [ 319 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:53 ]. (RE: Doc #26; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan and Motion to Dismiss (Insufficient notice time)). (adiuser).
34
10/12/2016
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed on 10/12/2016 (RE: related document(s) 26 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss).
35
10/14/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 34 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 10/14/2016.
36
10/17/2016
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
10/20/2016
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting). (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/20/2016
Receipt of Payment of Fee(16-02993-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19946627. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/17/2016
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting). (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/17/2016
Receipt of Payment of Fee(16-02993-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20050809. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
10/24/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay, Filed by Creditor LNV CORPORATION
1
Affidavit Affidavit #
2
Exhibit Note #
3
Exhibit Mortgage #
4
Exhibit AOM's
4 Attachments
10/24/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(16-02993-TOM13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21318082. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 37) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
10/24/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor LNV CORPORATION (RE: related document(s) 37 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay,).
39
10/25/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by LNV Corporation (RE: related document(s) 37 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor LNV CORPORATION, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay). Hearing scheduled 11/16/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
41
10/27/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 39 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 10/27/2017.
42
11/13/2017
Courtroom Deputy Notes (Based on agreement of the parties, this matter is settled; Beth Rouse to submit a separate order.) RE: Doc #37; Motion for Relief from Stay and Co-Debtor Stay, filed by Beth McFadden Rouse, Attorney for LNV Corporation
43
11/16/2017
Consent Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay and Co-Debtor Stay(Related Doc # 37) Signed on 11/16/2017.
44
11/18/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 43 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 11/18/2017.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.