Gregory Lewis Bonner and Sonya Michelle Bonner
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-01458 (alnb)

Bench Sheet: (RE: related document(s)[51] Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).

Case: 17 - 01458 - DSC13 BENCH SHEET FOR HEARING ON TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS Hearing Date: 01 / 23 / 2018 Hearing Time: 10: 30 am Debtor: BONNER, GREGORY LEWIS Co - Debtor: BONNER, SONYA MICHELLE Attorney: BOND, BOTES, REESE & SHINN, P. C. Case Filed: 04 / 05 / 2017 Case Confirmed: 08 / 29 / 2017 (O) Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. () Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. () Case isCONVERTED to Chapter 7 on debtor's Notice of Conversion. (O) Debtor's CONSENT to the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is APPROVED. O Trustee's WITHDRAWAL of Motion to Dismiss is ACCEPTED. (Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is CONDITIONALLY DENIED, pending compliance by the Debtor with these requirements. (1) the debtor shall cause a full plan payment to be received in the Trustee's office before 4: 00 p. m. on 02 / 22 / 2018; and, (2) the debtor shall cause all plan payments due during the next 12 months to be received in the full amounts due in the Trustee's office before 4: 00 p. m. on the dates due. If the debtor fails to satisfy these conditions, the Trustee may file a Notice of Continuing Default with the Court, with copies to the debtor and debtor's attorney, after which the Court may GRANT the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss and may DISMISS this case without further notice or hearing. Begin Payments: 05 / 05 / 2017 Schedule 3, 555. 00 MONTHLY Payment Method: Order Sent: Employer: AUTO POLISH AT ITS BES Delinquency Since On Schedule: Actual Payments: Amount Delinquent: 05 / 05 / 2017 31, 995. 00 14. 915. 00 17, 080. 00 Balance Due Claims: Expected Admin: less Funds On Hand: Approximate Balance Due: 142, 087. 46 9, 732. 99 0. 00 151, 820. 45 (), Trustee shall send a DIRECTION FOR DEDUCTION. (S Plan payments are MODIFIED to $ _ 4471 VOL. (OOTHER: Months (on Schedule) to Pay Out Case: 51 01 / 23 / 2018 Date: Case Filed 9 Months Ago (60 Month Plan) Last 12 Transactions 10 / 03 / 17 CASH 1, 600. 00 09 / 18 / 17 CASH 3, 000. 00 07 / 31 / 17 CASH 3, 200. 00 06 / 27 / 17 CASH 1, 000. 00 06 / 13 / 17 CASH 2, 560. 00 05 / 03 / 17 CASH 3, 555. 00 Appearances Chapter 13 TrusteeU.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Debtor Joint Debtor Debtor's Attorney or Other Spouse (standing in) Deputy Clerk Case 17 - 01458 - DSC13 Doc 57 Filed 01 / 24 / 18 Entered 01 / 24 / 18 12: 54: 28 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1.

Order Conditionally Denying Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. Payments are modified to $4,071.00 monthly. (Related Doc # [51]) Signed on 1/24/2018.

Van−122 [TMD Order] (Rev. 08/17) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−01458−DSC13 Gregory Lewis Bonner Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−6096 Sonya Michelle Bonner SSN: xxx−xx−0487 Debtor(s) ORDER This matter came before the Court on 1/23/18 for a hearing on the Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that: Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Case is CONVERTED to Chapter 7 on Debtor's Notice of Conversion. Trustee's WITHDRAWAL of Motion to Dismiss is ACCEPTED. Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is CONDITIONALLY DENIED, pending compliance by the Debtor with these requirements. 1. The Debtor shall cause a full plan payment to be received in the Trustee's office before 4:00 p.m. on 2/22/18 and, 2. The Debtor shall cause all plan payments due during the next 12 months to be received in the full amounts due in the Trustee's office before 4:00 p.m. on the dates due and on or before the 22nd day of each month thereafter. If the Debtor fails to satisfy these conditions, the Trustee may file a Notice of Continuing Default with the Court, with copies to the Debtor and Debtor's attorney, after which the Court may GRANT the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss and may DISMISS the case without further notice or hearing. Trustee shall send a DIRECTION FOR DEDUCTION. Plan payments are MODIFIED to $ 4,071.00 monthly Debtor's CONSENT to the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is APPROVED. OTHER: Dated: January 24, 2018 /s/ D. Sims Crawford United States Bankruptcy Judge cdr Case 17-01458-DSC13 Doc 58 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/24/18 15:14:05 Desc Order on TMD Page 1 of 1

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 267 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/05/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Gregory Lewis Bonner, Sonya Michelle Bonner
2
04/05/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner.
4
04/05/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner.
5
04/05/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner.
6
04/05/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/03/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 05/23/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 08/01/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/02/2017 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/03/2017.
7
04/05/2017
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner.
04/05/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-01458-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20549551. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
04/05/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2015 Filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner.
9
04/06/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
04/06/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors Gregory Lewis Bonner and Sonya Michelle Bonner Case Number 97-04753, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 07/02/1997, Standard Discharge on 03/01/2001; Case Number 02-07565, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/25/2002, Standard Discharge on 04/08/2008.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
04/06/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
11
04/07/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/07/2017.
12
04/07/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner). Notice Date 04/07/2017.
13
04/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/08/2017.
14
04/10/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Robert John Fehse Jr Filed by Creditor TD Auto Finance LLC.
15
04/13/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jonathan Mancil Smothers Filed by Creditor JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association.
16
04/21/2017
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner.).
17
04/21/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 16 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.). Hearing scheduled 5/23/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
18
04/25/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas G Tutten Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
19
04/27/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Steven D Altmann Filed by Creditor Gloria Weintraub Trustee- Irvin Weintraub Trust.
20
05/04/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 5/3/2017. (Ch13troffice, jc)
21
05/09/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
22
05/10/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 21 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 5/23/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
23
05/12/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 22 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/12/2017.
24
05/15/2017
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner.).
25
05/17/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 24 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association,). Hearing scheduled 5/23/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
26
05/22/2017
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner.). (Shinn, J.)
27
05/22/2017
Second Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner. (Shinn, J.)
28
05/23/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 5/23/2017 (RE: related document(s) 6 Confirmation Hearing, 16 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., 21 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 24 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association,). Hearing scheduled 6/20/2017 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
29
05/25/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Application for Automatic Extension Filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner.
30
05/25/2017
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) 16 Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner.).).
31
05/25/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 28 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 05/25/2017.
32
06/15/2017
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) 24 Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner.).).
33
06/19/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner. (Shinn, J.)
34
06/21/2017
Third Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner (RE: related document(s) 27 Second Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner. (Shinn, J.)). (Shinn, J.)
35
06/21/2017
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 5 of Internal Revenue Service in the amount of $22,339.90 Filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner. (Shinn, J.)
36
06/21/2017
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 8 of Republic Finance, LLC in the amount of $3,258.87 Filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner. (Shinn, J.)
37
06/23/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 35 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner, 36 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner). Hearing scheduled 7/25/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
38
06/23/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 6/23/2017 (RE: related document(s) 6 Confirmation Hearing, 21 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 8/1/2017 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
39
06/25/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 38 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 06/25/2017.
40
06/25/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 37 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/25/2017.
41
07/13/2017
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Plaza Services (Claim No. 15) To 13.7, LLC. Fee Amount $25 Filed by Creditor 13.7, LLC.
07/13/2017
Receipt of Transfer of Claim(17-01458-DSC13) [claims,trclm] (25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20918690. Fee Amount 25.00 (re:Doc# 41) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
07/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 41 Transfer of Claim filed by Creditor 13.7, LLC). Notice Date 07/16/2017.
43
07/24/2017
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 5 - Objection to Claim #5 is Withdrawn. Signed on 7/24/2017 (RE: related document(s) 35 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner).
44
07/24/2017
Affidavit Filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner (RE: related document(s) 36 Objection to Claim). (Shinn, J.)
45
07/26/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 43 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 07/26/2017.
46
07/27/2017
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 8 - Debtors' Objection is Sustained and Claim 8 shall be treated as a nonpriority unsecured claim. Signed on 7/27/2017 (RE: related document(s) 36 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Gregory Lewis Bonner, Joint Debtor Sonya Michelle Bonner).
47
07/29/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 46 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 07/29/2017.
48
08/02/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
49
08/29/2017
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan. Trustees Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are withdrawn. Signed on 8/29/2017 (RE: related document(s) 21 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss).
50
08/31/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 49 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 08/31/2017.
51
12/13/2017
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, ct)
52
12/14/2017
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s) 51 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 1/23/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
53
12/15/2017
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Ally Financial (Claim No. 4) To Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Fee Amount $25 Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management LLC.
54
12/15/2017
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Carol Hardy on behalf of PRA Receivables Management, has attached a PDF which lists the Transferor as OneMain and Claim #2 when filing the Transfer of Claim #4 in which the Docket Text References Ally Financial as the Transferor and Claim #4 (Doc. 53). SOLUTION: The filer, Carol Hardy on behalf of PRA Receivables Management, should Enter a Corrective Entry for Document 53 and file either a corrected transfer pdf or file the Transfer into the correct claim. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 53 Transfer of Claim filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management LLC).
12/15/2017
Receipt of Transfer of Claim(17-01458-DSC13) [claims,trclm] (25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21515921. Fee Amount 25.00 (re:Doc# 53) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
12/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 52 Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 12/16/2017.
56
12/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 54 Notice of Incorrect Event/Filing). Notice Date 12/17/2017.
57
01/24/2018
Bench Sheet: (RE: related document(s)[51] Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
58
01/24/2018
Order Conditionally Denying Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. Payments are modified to $4,071.00 monthly. (Related Doc # [51]) Signed on 1/24/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.