Gregory Steven Martini and Tamara Ann Martini
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

1:2018-bk-00078 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/31/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
doc
05/31/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
06/04/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
28
06/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
29
06/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
30
06/11/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
31
06/14/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
32
06/22/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing
33
06/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
34
06/27/2018
Proceeding Memo
35
06/29/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
36
06/29/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
37
07/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/02/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
07/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
39
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
40
07/20/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
07/20/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
42
07/26/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
43
07/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
07/30/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.