Gustafson et al v. Bowman et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

2:2018-cv-00001 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
21
05/22/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
22
05/28/2018
ORDER granting 13 Motion to Set Aside Default. Bowman shall tender payment of $2,164 to counsel for Plaintiffs within 21 days from the date this order is filed. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 5/28/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
06/01/2018
Clerk's Notice of Deficiency (Proof of Service) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
06/05/2018
Answer to Complaint
25
06/15/2018
Service by Publication
26
06/15/2018
Declaration
27
06/15/2018
Declaration
28
06/15/2018
Affidavit
29
06/15/2018
Certificate of Service
06/24/2018
Order on Motion for Service by Publication (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
08/21/2018
Service by Publication
33
08/21/2018
Affidavit
34
08/21/2018
Declaration
35
08/30/2018
Order on Motion for Service by Publication
36
11/26/2018
Affidavit
12/07/2018
Status Report Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
12/07/2018
Status Report
39
12/11/2018
Status Report
40
12/12/2018
Service by Publication
41
12/12/2018
Declaration
42
12/19/2018
Order on Motion for Service by Publication
43
01/18/2019
Notice (Other)
44
02/15/2019
Entry of Default
45
02/15/2019
Certificate of Service
46
02/15/2019
Certificate of Service
47
02/21/2019
Clerks Entry of Default
48
02/28/2019
Initial Case Status Report Order
49
03/19/2019
Status Report
03/24/2019
Status Report Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
04/17/2019
Stipulation of Dismissal
04/19/2019
Order Dismissing Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.