Gutierrez v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00237 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/10/2018
Notice of Removal
2
10/10/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
10/10/2018
Notice (Other)
4
10/10/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
5
10/17/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
6
10/17/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
7
10/17/2018
Notice of Service List
8
10/29/2018
Substitute Party
9
10/29/2018
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
10
11/29/2018
Order
11
11/29/2018
Order
12
01/03/2019
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
13
01/03/2019
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.