Gwen Ann Mills
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

5:2018-bk-00260 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/10/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
08/10/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
08/10/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
4
08/10/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
08/10/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
08/10/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
6
08/10/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
7
08/10/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
8
08/10/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
9
08/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10
08/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
08/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
08/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
08/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
08/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
08/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
08/13/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
08/20/2018
Entry of Appearance
17
08/28/2018
Extend Time
08/29/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
08/30/2018
Extend Time
19
09/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
09/05/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
09/12/2018
Clerks Notice of Undeliverable Mail
09/19/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
09/26/2018
Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)
22
09/26/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
23
09/26/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
24
09/26/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
09/26/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
09/26/2018
Change of Address
09/26/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
09/27/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
10/02/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
10/03/2018
Proceeding Memo
28
10/10/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
29
10/10/2018
Entry of Appearance
30
10/10/2018
Certificate of Service
10/17/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
10/18/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.