Hall v. Alaska Department of Corrections
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00268 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
41
05/25/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
42
05/25/2018
Affidavit
43
05/25/2018
Declaration
44
05/25/2018
Affidavit
45
05/25/2018
Affidavit
46
05/25/2018
Additional Related Document
47
07/19/2018
Notice of Appearance
07/20/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
07/20/2018
Notice of Appearance
49
07/23/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
08/21/2018
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
09/11/2018
Continue
53
09/11/2018
Declaration
09/12/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
11/06/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
11/07/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
12/03/2018
Status Report
12/17/2018
Order Referring Case to Mediation (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
12/20/2018
Order
61
01/02/2019
Notice of Appearance
62
01/04/2019
Continue
63
01/04/2019
Expedite
01/07/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/06/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
Settlement Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
04/08/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
04/08/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/08/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
Settlement Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
04/23/2019
Notice (Other)
05/01/2019
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
05/17/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.