Harley D. Barnes and Elizabeth Ann Barnes
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00130 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
46
11/06/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
47
01/10/2019
Proceeding Memo
48
01/10/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
49
01/11/2019
Claims (SA)
01/11/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
01/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
51
02/05/2019
Compensation / Professional Fees
52
04/03/2019
Trustees Final Report (TFR)
53
04/18/2019
Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)
54
04/18/2019
Certificate of Service

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.