Harmon v. Houser et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00083 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
7
06/29/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
8
07/10/2018
Notice of Appearance
9
07/12/2018
Notice (Other)
12
09/10/2018
Dismiss
13
09/19/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
10/16/2018
Order Reassigning Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
01/16/2019
Order on Motion to Dismiss
16
01/24/2019
Judgment
17
02/01/2019
Notice of Appeal
02/05/2019
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
02/05/2019
USCA Case Number
19
02/12/2019
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
20
02/14/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
21
02/22/2019
Additional Related Document
22
04/29/2019
USCA Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.