Harold Johnson, Sr.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-05259 (alnb)

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[17] Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/24/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-05259-DSC Harold Johnson, Sr. Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: lstubblef Page 1 of 2 Date Rcvd: Jan 22, 2018 Form ID: van002 Total Noticed: 59 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Jan 24, 2018. db Harold Johnson, Sr., 515 Forest Way, Leeds, AL 35094-1830 9584184 +AARON'S INC., 1725 ASHVILLE ROAD STE. 101, LEEDS AL 35094-7557 9584186 AFFINITY PHYSICIAN SERVICES, AHN#: 14748X, PO BOX 14000, BELFAST ME 04915-4033 9584187 +ALABAMA INPATIENT SERVICES, %SMITH ROUCHIN & ASSOCIATES, SRA, 1456 ELLIS AVENUE, JACKSON MS 39204-2204 9584188 +ALABAMA NASAL & SINUS CENTER, 7191 CAHABA VALLEY ROAD, SUITE 301, BIRMINGHAM AL 35242-6448 9584189 +AMERICREDIT/GM FINANCIAL, PO BOX 183853, ARLINGTON TX 76096-3853 9584190 +AMERICREDIT/GM FINANCIAL, PO BOX 181145, ARLINGTON TX 76096-1145 9584191 +AMERICREDIT/GM FINANCIAL, PO BOX 78143, PHOENIX AZ 85062-8143 9584192 +ANESTHESIOLOGIST ASSOCIATED PC, %THE ESDALE LAW FIRM, LLC, 3250 INDEPENDENCE DRIVE, SUITE 102, BIRMINGHAM AL 35209-4187 9584193 +AVADIAN CREDIT UNION, 1 RIVERCHASE PKWY S, HOOVER AL 35244-2008 9589704 +Avadian Credit Union, P.O. Box 360287, Birmingham, AL 35236-0287 9584196 +BIRMINGHAM GASTRO ASSOC PC, %CBBI, 1920 3RD AVENUE NORTH, BESSEMER AL 35020-4910 9584195 +BIRMINGHAM GASTRO ASSOC PC, %CBBI, PO BOX 590, BESSEMER AL 35021-0590 9584197 +BIRMINGHAM INPATIENT PHYSICIAN, PO BOX 660503, BIRMINGHAM AL 35266-0503 9584198 BROOKWOOD BAPTIST, HEALTH PRINCETON, PO BOX 11407, BIRMINGHAM AL 35246-0206 9584199 BROOKWOOD DIAGNOSTIC CTR, 513 BROOKWOOD BLVD. STE. 100, BIRMINGHAM AL 35209-6878 9584200 +BROOKWOOD FOOT CARE CENTER, 1009 MONTGOMERY HIGHWAY, BIRMINGHAM AL 35216-2843 9584201 +BROOKWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, %CENTRAL FINANCIAL CONTROL, ATTN: BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 66044, ANAHEIM CA 92816-6044 9584202 CARDIOVASCULAR ASSOCIATES, 3980 COLONNADE PARKWAY, BIRMINGHAM AL 35243-2382 9584204 +CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, %CREDIT MANAGEMENT, LP, 4200 INTERNATIONAL PARKWAY, CARROLLTON TX 75007-1912 9584203 +CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, %CREDIT MANAGEMENT, LP, ATTN: BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 118288, CARROLLTON TX 75011-8288 9584209 +DISH NETWORK, %MAURY COBB ATTORNEY AT LAW, 301 BEACON PARKWAY WEST, SUITE 100, BIRMINGHAM AL 35209-3103 9584211 EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS ASSOC., PO BOX 830529, BIRMINGHAM AL 35283-0529 9584212 +EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS ASSOC., %FRANKLIN COLLECTION SERVICE, 2978 WEST JACKSON STREET, TUPELO MS 38801-6731 9584213 +EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS ASSOC., %FRANKLIN COLLECTION SERVICE, PO BOX 3910, TUPELO MS 38803-3910 9584214 +EYE CARE, 15933 CLAYTON ROAD, SUITE 201, BALLWIN MO 63011-2172 9584216 +GEICO, 3301 LORNA ROAD SUITE 2, BIRMINGHAM AL 35216-5499 9584217 +HEARTLAND MEDICAL LLC, 7955 FLINT STREET, OVERLAND PARK KS 66214-3333 9584219 INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, 401 W PEACHTREE STREET NW, ROOM 1665, STOP 334-D, ATLANTA GA 30308 9584221 +KAREN JOHNSON, 515 FOREST WAY, LEEDS AL 35094-1830 9584223 +MERRICK BANK/CARDWORKS/CWNEXUS, ATTN: BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 9201, OLD BETHPAGE NY 11804-9001 9584224 NATIONWIDE INSURANCE, PO BOX 96040, CHARLOTTE NC 28296-0040 9584229 +SOUTHVIEW MEDICAL GROUP PC, DEP 2544 PO BOX 2153, BIRMINGHAM AL 35287-0002 9584231 +STATE FARM, 3900 MONTCLAIR ROAD STE. 350, BIRMINGHAM AL 35213-2430 9584232 +U-HAUL STORAGE, 540 VALLEY AVENUE, BIRMINGHAM AL 35209-3802 9584233 +UROLOGY CENTER OF AL, PO BOX 59867, BIRMINGHAM AL 35259-0867 9584234 +US ATTORNEY, NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, 1801 FOURTH AVENUE NORTH, BIRMINGHAM AL 35203-2101 9584235 +US ATTORNEY GENERAL, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, 950 PENNSYLVANIA AVENUE, WASHINGTON DC 20530-0009 9584236 +WELLS FARGO BANK, PO BOX 5058, MAC P6053-021, PORTLAND OR 97208-5058 9584237 +WINDSTREAM, 1720 GALLERIA BLVD., CHARLOTTE NC 28270-2408 9584239 #+WOODS PHARMACY LLC, 151 TEXAS ROAD, OLD BRIDGE NJ 08857-3904 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. 9584185 +Fax: 864-336-7400 Jan 23 2018 02:17:40 ADVANCE AMERICA, 300 OXMOOR ROAD STE 101, BIRMINGHAM AL 35209-6116 9584194 E-mail/Text: defaultspecialty.us@bbva.com Jan 23 2018 01:42:16 BBVA COMPASS BANK, PO BOX 830606, BIRMINGHAM AL 35283-0606 9584205 E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@thecheckdepot.com Jan 23 2018 01:43:54 CHECK DEPOT, 64 GREENSPRINGS HIGHWAY, BIRMINGHAM AL 35209 9584206 +E-mail/Text: bk@creditcentralllc.com Jan 23 2018 01:43:31 CREDIT CENTRAL, 536 W TOWN PLZ, BESSEMER AL 35020-5346 9585075 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@thecheckdepot.com Jan 23 2018 01:43:54 Check Depot, 211 Summit Pkwy. #116, Birmingham, AL 35209-4742 9605237 +E-mail/Text: bk@creditcentralllc.com Jan 23 2018 01:43:31 Credit Central, LLC, 700 E North St Suite 15, Greenville, SC 29601-3013 9584207 E-mail/Text: Bankruptcy.Consumer@dish.com Jan 23 2018 01:42:10 DISH NETWORK, PO BOX 7203, PASADENA CA 91109-7303 9584210 E-mail/Text: Bankruptcy.Consumer@dish.com Jan 23 2018 01:42:10 DISH NETWORK, DEPARTMENT 0063, PALATINE IL 60055-0063 9584208 +E-mail/Text: bsimmons@amsher.com Jan 23 2018 01:43:28 DISH NETWORK, %AMSHER COLLECTION SRV, 4524 SOUTHLAKE PARKWAY, SUITE 15, HOOVER AL 35244-3271 Case 17-05259-DSC13 Doc 18 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 3 District/off: 1126-2 User: lstubblef Page 2 of 2 Date Rcvd: Jan 22, 2018 Form ID: van002 Total Noticed: 59 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (continued) 9584215 +E-mail/Text: corporatecredit@farmersfurniture.com Jan 23 2018 01:42:04 FARMER'S HOME FURNITURE, 7480 PARKWAY DRIVE, LEEDS AL 35094-4822 9584218 E-mail/Text: cio.bncmail@irs.gov Jan 23 2018 01:41:26 INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, CENTRALIZED INSOLVENCY OPS, PO BOX 7346, PHILADELPHIA PA 19101-7346 9584222 +E-mail/Text: bkr@cardworks.com Jan 23 2018 01:41:06 MERRICK BANK, PO BOX 660702, DALLAS TX 75266-0702 9584226 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy_notifications@ccsusa.com Jan 23 2018 01:44:07 NATIONWIDE INSURANCE, %CREDIT COLLECTIONS SERVICES, ATTENTION: BANKRUPTCY, 725 CANTON STREET, NORWOOD MA 02062-2679 9584225 E-mail/Text: bankruptcy_notifications@ccsusa.com Jan 23 2018 01:44:07 NATIONWIDE INSURANCE, %CREDIT COLLECTIONS SERVICES, PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, PO BOX 55126, BOSTON MA 02205-5126 9584227 +E-mail/Text: asi@auditsystemsinc.net Jan 23 2018 01:44:17 REGIONS BANK, %AUDIT SYSTEMS INCORPORATED, 3696 ULMERTON ROAD, SUITE 200, CLEARWATER FL 33762-4237 9584228 +E-mail/Text: bsimmons@amsher.com Jan 23 2018 01:43:28 RETINA CONSULTANTS OF ALABAMA, %AMSHER COLLECTION SRV, 4524 SOUTHLAKE PARKWAY, SUITE 15, HOOVER AL 35244-3271 9584230 E-mail/Text: dl-csgbankruptcy@charter.com Jan 23 2018 01:44:18 SPECTRUM, 4145 S FALKENBURG ROAD, RIVERVIEW FL 33578-8652 9584238 E-mail/Text: Bankruptcy@FCScollects.com Jan 23 2018 01:44:11 WINDSTREAM, %FIRST COLLECTION SERVICES, 10925 OTTER CREEK EAST BLVD., MABELVALE AR 72103-1661 TOTAL: 18 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (undeliverable, * duplicate) ***** 9584220* ++INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, CENTRALIZED INSOLVENCY OPERATIONS, PO BOX 7346, PHILADELPHIA PA 19101-7346 (address filed with court: IRS SPECIAL PROCEDURES STAFF, COLLECTION DIVISION, 801 TOM MARTIN DRIVE STOP 126, BIRMINGHAM AL 35211) TOTALS: 0, * 1, ## 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. Addresses marked '++' were redirected to the recipient's preferred mailing address pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 342(f)/Fed.R.Bank.PR.2002(g)(4). Addresses marked '#' were identified by the USPS National Change of Address system as requiring an update. While the notice was still deliverable, the notice recipient was advised to update its address with the court immediately. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Jan 24, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on January 22, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com J. Suzanne Shinn on behalf of Debtor Harold Johnson, Sr. pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort3@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com TOTAL: 2 Case 17-05259-DSC13 Doc 18 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 3 Van−002 [Notice of Hearing] (Rev. 05/14) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−05259−DSC13 Harold Johnson Sr. Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−1671 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF HEARING Notice is hereby given that a hearing will be held to consider and act upon the following: 16 − Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km) Date: Tuesday, February 13, 2018 Time: 11:00 AM Location: Robert S. Vance Federal Bldg, 1800 5th Ave No, Courtroom 1, Birmingham, AL 35203 Attorneys should attend all scheduled hearings. If a conflict is known, the Court should be notified immediately. Continuances of non−evidentiary hearings may be granted if all parties consent. Evidentiary hearings will not be continued except for good cause shown. If there is a failure to attend a scheduled hearing, and the Court has not been notified of the reason for the failure, the Court may enter appropriate orders. Attendance is not required if a settlement has been reached as approved by all parties and filed with the Court by an attorney prior to the hearing date. Dated: January 22, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court dls Case 17-05259-DSC13 Doc 18 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 3 of 3

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 268 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/14/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Harold Johnson Sr. (Shinn, J.)
2
12/14/2017
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Debtor Harold Johnson Sr. (Shinn, J.)
3
12/14/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Harold Johnson Sr. (Shinn, J.)
5
12/14/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Harold Johnson Sr. (Shinn, J.)
6
12/14/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Harold Johnson Sr. (Shinn, J.)
7
12/14/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Harold Johnson Sr. (Shinn, J.)
8
12/14/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Harold Johnson Sr. (Shinn, J.)
9
12/14/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/10/2018 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 02/13/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 02/22/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 06/12/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 03/12/2018.
12/15/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Harold Johnson, Sr. Case Number 91-02235, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/21/1991, Dismissed for Other Reason on 01/21/1992; Case Number 10-75978, Chapter 13 filed in Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/28/2010, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 06/08/2011; Case Number 93-06395, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/22/1993, Standard Discharge on 01/14/1999; Case Number 13-04707, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 10/21/2013, Standard Discharge on 01/21/2014; Case Number 90-07757, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/11/1990, Dismissed for Other Reason on 03/21/1991; Case Number 08-69015, Chapter 13 filed in Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/12/2008, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 03/03/2010.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
12/15/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11
12/15/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Harold Johnson).
12
12/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 12/16/2017.
13
12/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Harold Johnson). Notice Date 12/17/2017.
14
12/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 12/17/2017.
15
01/11/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 1/10/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)
16
01/19/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
17
01/22/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 2/13/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
18
01/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[17] Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/24/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.