Harry Gooden, Sr. and Anita Sherron Gooden
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00152 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 206 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/12/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Harry Gooden Sr., Anita Sherron Gooden
2
01/12/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Joint Debtor Anita Sherron Gooden, Debtor Harry Gooden Sr.
4
01/12/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Joint Debtor Anita Sherron Gooden, Debtor Harry Gooden Sr.
5
01/12/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor Anita Sherron Gooden, Debtor Harry Gooden Sr.
01/12/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-00152-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21602175. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
01/12/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Joint Debtor Anita Sherron Gooden, Debtor Harry Gooden Sr.
7
01/12/2018
**INCORRECT NOTICE AS TO JUDGE REASSIGNMENT** Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/07/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 03/13/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/23/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 07/11/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 04/09/2018. Modified on 1/16/2018
8
01/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 01/14/2018.
01/15/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors Harry Gooden, Sr. and Anita Sherron Gooden Case Number 95-06538, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 10/20/1995, Standard Discharge on 06/17/1997; Case Number 99-01033, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/18/1999, Dismissed for Other Reason on 07/31/2000; Case Number 97-02445, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 04/02/1997, Dismissed for Other Reason on 01/15/1999; Case Number 86-02195, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/19/1986; Case Number 90-00089, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/03/1990, Standard Discharge on 08/24/1994; Case Number 04-00367, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/16/2004; Case Number 10-01555, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/10/2010, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 08/29/2011; Case Number 04-10435, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 11/29/2004, Standard Discharge on 09/15/2009; Case Number 05-01549, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/15/2005; Case Number 01-02049, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/23/2001, Standard Discharge on 11/23/2004; Case Number 08-00372, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/28/2008, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 06/05/2009; Case Number 12-02155, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/03/2012, Standard Discharge on 02/13/2017.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
01/13/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
01/16/2018
Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 07-06, dated April 19, 2007, and Rule 9029 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, authorizing this Court to establish and promulgate local rules of practice and procedure not inconsistent with the Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, and subject to the requirements of Rule 83 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that: 1. Any case filed by the same Debtor within 12 months of the date of entry of an Order of dismissal or of discharge of a prior case, shall be assigned to the same Judge from the prior case. 2. Any case filed by the same Debtor within 12 months of the date of closing a prior case, shall be assigned to the same Judge from the prior case. 3. Any case filed by a debtor that already has a case pending, shall be assigned to the same judge as the pending case. 4. If any such case has been assigned either by the random or by the automatic Judge assignment and is inconsistent with Administrative Order No. 07-06, the Clerk's office shall reassign the case consistent with said Administrative Order.Judge Tamara O Mitchell added to case. Involvement of Judge D. Sims Crawford Terminated
11
01/16/2018
Amended Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/7/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 4/9/2018.Proofs of Claims due by 3/23/2018.Government Proof of Claim due by 7/11/2018.Confirmation hearing to be held on 3/22/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
12
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 11 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
13
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Harry Gooden, Joint Debtor Anita Sherron Gooden). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
14
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
15
01/23/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.