Haube v. Houser
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00170 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
22
06/07/2018
Dismiss
23
08/13/2018
Leave to File Document
08/15/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
08/15/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
26
08/22/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
10/15/2018
Order Reassigning Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
02/19/2019
Response to Habeas Petition
30
03/21/2019
Merit Briefing re 28:2254, Reply to Response

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.