Hayden v. Blue Cross/b Shield, et al
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:1999-cv-00538 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 607 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/26/1999
DEMAND for jury trial by Steven Mark Hayden
2
05/26/1999
NOTICE of filing notice of removal to state court by Blue Cross/B Shield
3
06/03/1999
ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Cross/B Shield (Attorney Teresa G. Minor). Referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
06/04/1999
Notice of assignment to US Mag Judge mailed to counsel for all parties. (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
07/07/1999
ORDER, setting Scheduling Conference by telephone for 3:00 7/26/99 before Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody ; Requesting the parties to complete and send to the Clerk of the Court the attached consent form so that the form is received by the Clerk by 7/22/99 (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to CA, DH, HC.
5
07/29/1999
Defendant's Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge, referred to Magistrate Judge Coody
6
07/29/1999
Plaintiff's Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge, referred to Magistrate Judge Coody
7
07/30/1999
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 3/20/00 before Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody; Motion Filing deadline on 12/20/00 ; Discovery cutoff 3/6/00 ; jury trial set for 9:00 4/26/00 before Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody ; set amended pleading deadline for 10/13/99 Jury selection before Magistrate Judge McPherson set for 10:00 4/17/00; Mediation Notice deadline on 11/8/99 (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to CA, YG, HC, CAC, SC, MAG. Judge McPherson. (VACATED PER ORDER of 3/l5/00) (war) Modified on 03/15/2000
8
09/21/1999
MOTION by Steven Mark Hayden for non-party Mississippi Board of Medical Licensure to Produce referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
9
09/28/1999
ORDER denying [8-1] motion to Produce (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
10
10/06/1999
MOTION by Blue Cross/B Shield to Compel plaintiff Steven Mark Hayden to provide Rule 26 Disclosures (Exhibit A attached), referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
11
10/07/1999
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the defendant's motion to compel should not be granted; Response to Order to Show Cause due on 10/22/99 for Steven Mark Hayden (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody). Copies mailed to counsel.
12
10/13/1999
MOTION by Blue Cross/B Shield to Compel Plaintiff to serve copies of subpoenas served upon 3rd parties and all documents and materials received in response thereto (Exhibit A attached), referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
13
10/15/1999
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the motion to compel should not be granted: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 11/1/99 for Steven Mark Hayden (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
15
10/20/1999
ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
16
10/20/1999
AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT by Steven Mark Hayden amending [1-1] complaint, referred to Judge Coody
17
10/22/1999
RESPONSE by Steven Mark Hayden to [10-1] motion to Compel plaintiff Steven Mark Hayden to provide Rule 26 Disclosures by Blue Cross/B Shield, referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
18
10/27/1999
ORDER denying as moot [12-1] motion to Compel Plaintiff to serve copies of subpoenas served upon 3rd parties and all documents and materials received in response thereto (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
19
11/02/1999
ANSWER by Blue Cross/B Shield (Attorney Cavender C. Kimble, Teresa G. Minor, Mark E. Tindal) to amended complaint, referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
20
11/02/1999
RESPONSE by Blue Cross/B Shield to [10-1] motion to Compel plaintiff Steven Mark Hayden to provide Rule 26 Disclosures by Blue Cross/B Shield, referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
21
11/19/1999
MOTION by Blue Cross/B Shield to Extend Scheduling Deadlines referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
22
12/01/1999
APPLICATION/MOTION to Intervene for a limited purpose by Eliyyah Abbud referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
23
12/03/1999
ORDER that motion hearing set for 4:00 12/6/99 before Mag. Judge John L. Carroll for [22-1] motion to Intervene for a limited purpose by Eliyyah Abbud ; DIRECTING the Clerk's Office to provide counsel for the parties with a copy of this order by facsimile (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to SL, YG, HC.
24
12/06/1999
ORDER denying as moot [22-1] motion to Intervene for a limited purpose by Eliyyah Abbud (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies mailed to counsel.
25
12/07/1999
ORDER modifying [7-1] Scheduling order as follows: resetting dispositive Motion Filing deadline to 2/4/00, as further set out in order (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody). Copies mailed to counsel.
26
01/10/2000
MOTION by Blue Cross/B Shield to Strike plaintiff's expert disclosures, or in the alternative to Compel Complete Expert Disclosures (Exhibit A attached), referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
27
01/12/2000
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the motion to strike or in the alternative to compel expert disclosures should not be granted: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 1/27/00 for Steven Mark Hayden (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
29
01/20/2000
ORDER granting [28-1] motion to Amend [3-1] answer by Blue Cross/B Shield (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
30
01/20/2000
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Cross/B Shield : amends [3-1] answer by Blue Cross/B Shield, referred to Magistrate Judge Coody
31
01/31/2000
RESPONSE by Steven Mark Hayden to [26-1] motion to Strike plaintiff's expert disclosures by Blue Cross/B Shield, [26-2] motion to Compel Complete Expert Disclosures by Blue Cross/B Shield referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
32
02/02/2000
MOTION by Steven Mark Hayden in Limine RE: Ruling by Board of Medical Examiners referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
33
02/03/2000
ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Strike plaintiff's expert disclosures, granting [26-2] motion to Compel Complete Expert Disclosures; that plaintiff shall provide disclosures consistent with the Court's Scheudling Order by 2/l4/00 and that defendant shall provide any rebuttal disclosure by 3/l5/00 (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
34
02/04/2000
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the plaintiff's motion in limine should not be granted: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 2/21/00 for Blue Cross/B Shield (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
35
02/04/2000
MOTION by Blue Cross/B Shield to Compel Dr. Steven Mark Hayden to produce this tape recording, or, in the alternative for Protective Order (Exhibist A-C attached), referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
36
02/04/2000
MOTION by Blue Cross/B Shield for Summary Judgment referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
37
02/04/2000
BRIEF by Blue Cross/B Shield in support of [36-1] motion for Summary Judgment referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
38
02/04/2000
NOTICE of FILING EVIDENTIARY MATERIAL by Blue Cross/B Shield in support of [36-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Exhibits maintained in separate binder), referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
39
02/04/2000
NOTICE of Filing Affidavits in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judge by Blue Cross/B Shield (Affidavits maintained in separate binder), referred to Magistrate Judge Coody.
40
02/08/2000
ORDER [36-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Blue Cross/B Shield set for submission on 2/25/00 (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
41
02/08/2000
RESPONSE by Blue Cross/B Shield to [32-1] motion in Limine RE: Ruling by Board of Medical Examiners by Steven Mark Hayden, referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
42
02/14/2000
MOTION by Steven Mark Hayden for John Oliver Cameron to Withdraw as Attorney, and to Suspend and Extend Cutoff Dates and Other Relief, referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
43
02/17/2000
ORDER, motion hearing set for 9:30 2/28/00 before Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody for [42-1] motion for John Oliver Cameron to Withdraw as Attorney, motion hearing set for 9:30 2/28/00 before Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody for [42-2] motion to Suspend and Extend Cutoff Dates ; STAYING all proceedings in this action pending resolution of plaintiff counsel's motion to withdraw (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to plaintiff and counsel.
44
02/23/2000
MOTION by Steven Mark Hayden to Extend Time to amend complaint referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
45
02/28/2000
ORDER granting [42-1] motion for John Oliver Cameron to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney John Oliver Cameron for Steven Mark Hayden); that the plaintiff may file a motion for leave to amend by 3/l/00; terminating [44-1] motion to Extend Time to amend complaint; that the defendant shall file a respons by 3/8/00; Plaintiff's Response to Motion set to 3/3/00 for [36-1] motion for Summary Judgment ; that in all other respects, the stay previously entered in this case remains in effect (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
02/28/2000
Motion hearing held re: [42-1] motion for John Oliver Cameron to Withdraw as Attorney by Steven Mark Hayden, [42-2] motion to Suspend and Extend Cutoff Dates by Steven Mark Hayden (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
02/28/2000
Courtroom Deputy's MINUTES of proceedings: Moton Hearing for John Cameron to Withdraw as counsel and Plaintiff's motion to Suspend and Extend Cutoff Dates held 2/28/00 before Magistrate Judge Coody
48
03/03/2000
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the plaintiff's motion to amend complaint should not be granted: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 3/20/00 for Blue Cross/B Shield (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
49
03/03/2000
RESPONSE by Steven Mark Hayden in opposition to [36-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Blue Cross/B Shield (w/attachments, Affidavits maintained in separate binder), referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
50
03/06/2000
MOTION by Steven Mark Hayden to Correct Plaintiff's Opposition to Summary Judgment (Affidavit of Angela R. Hayden maintained in separate binder), referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
51
03/08/2000
RESPONSE by Blue Cross/B Shield to [47-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint by Steven Mark Hayden, referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
52
03/08/2000
MOTION by Blue Cross/B Shield to Strike Affidavits of Steven Mark Hayden, Angela R. Hayden, Mary Traudt-Bowdoin and Stephen Sievers, referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
53
03/08/2000
MOTION by Blue Cross/B Shield for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, (Reply Brief Attached), referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
54
03/15/2000
ORDER vacating [7-1] Scheduling order (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
55
03/27/2000
ORDER setting Oral Argument for 1:30 4/18/00 before Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to CA, YG, HC.
04/18/2000
ORAL ARGUMENT held before Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/18/00 (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
04/18/2000
Courtroom Deputy's MINUTES of proceedings: Oral Argument held 4/18/00 before Mag. Judge Coody - Pending Motions Including Motion to Amend and Motion for Summary Judgment
57
05/05/2000
ORDER denying as moot [10-1] motion to Compel plaintiff Steven Mark Hayden to provide Rule 26 Disclosures, denying [32-1] motion in Limine RE: Ruling by Board of Medical Examiners, denying [35-2] motion for Protective Order, granting [35-1] motion to Compel Dr. Steven Mark Hayden to produce this tape recording, denying [47-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint, granting [50-1] motion to Correct Plaintiff's Opposition to Summary Judgment, denying [52-1] motion to Strike Affidavits of Steven Mark Hayden, Angela R. Hayden, Mary Traudt-Bowdoin and Stephen Sievers, granting [53-1] motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
58
05/05/2000
MEMORANDUM OPINION (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
59
05/05/2000
ORDER granting [36-1] motion for Summary Judgment; Entering judgment in favor of the defendant; DISMISSING this case with prejudice; TAXING costs against the plaintiff (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
05/05/2000
Case closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
05/15/2000
AFFIDAVIT by Steven Mark Hayden Re: Submitted for Consideration for the Judge (Exhibits maintained in separate binder), referred to Magistrate Judge Coody.
62
05/16/2000
Bill of costs in the amount of $ 3886.87 entered by Blue Cross/B Shield against Plaintiff (w/attachments)
05/17/2000
Costs $ 3886.87 taxed for Blue Cross/B Shield against Plaintiff (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
05/19/2000
RESPONSE by Blue Cross/B Shield to [60-1] motion to Alter Judgment by Steven Mark Hayden, [60-2] motion to Amend [59-1] Summary Judgment and Dismissal order by Steven Mark Hayden, referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
65
05/22/2000
ORDER denying [60-1] motion to Alter Judgment, denying [60-2] motion to Amend [59-1] Summary Judgment and Dismissal order, denying as moot [64-1] motion to Strike [61-1] affidavit by Steven Mark Hayden (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
66
06/02/2000
MOTION by Blue Cross/B Shield for Attorney Fees (Exhibits A-B attached), referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
67
06/06/2000
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why motion for attorney fees should not be granted; Response to Order to Show Cause due on 6/21/00 for Steven Mark Hayden (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed.
68
06/09/2000
MOTION by Steven Mark Hayden for non-redacted copy of Blue Cross billing statement referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
69
06/13/2000
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the motion for non-redacted copy of Blue Cross billing statement should not be granted: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 6/28/00 for Blue Cross/B Shield (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
70
06/13/2000
RESPONSE by Blue Cross/B Shield to [68-1] motion for non-redacted copy of Blue Cross billing statement by Steven Mark Hayden (Exhibit A attached), referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
71
06/15/2000
ORDER Denying as moot [68-1] motion for non-redacted copy of Blue Cross billing statement (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
72
06/16/2000
MOTION (REQUEST) by Steven Mark Hayden for Three-Judge Panel (w/attachments), referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
73
06/16/2000
MOTION by Steven Mark Hayden to Compel Discovery, and for Sanctions referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
75
06/20/2000
MOTION for Tracy G. Birdsong, L.Scott Johnson, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
76
06/21/2000
ORDER denying [74-1] motion to Vacate [59-1] order on Summary Judgment, denying [73-1] motion to Compel Discovery, denying [73-2] motion for Sanctions, denying [72-1] motion for Three-Judge Panel (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
77
06/21/2000
Pro Se NOTICE OF APPEAL by Steven Mark Hayden to the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit from the final order entered in this action on May 22, 2000. (Copies mailed to Steven Mark Hayden, Pro Se with Transcript Order Information Form, Tracy Birdsong, L. Johnson, Cavender Kimble, Mark Tindal, Teresa Minor, & Certified copy to USCA with copies of orders appealed from and docket entries.) FILING FEE $ 105.00 RECEIPT # 82478 (dkt clerk)
06/21/2000
Notice of Appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [77-1] appeal by Steven Mark Hayden (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
78
06/21/2000
BRIEF (REASONS) by Steven Mark Hayden in opposition to [66-1] motion for Attorney Fees, referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
79
06/22/2000
REQUEST for Production of Facts From the Non-Redacted Attorney Fees of Balch and Bingham by Steven Mark Hayden (w/attachments), referred to Magistrate Judge Coody.
06/23/2000
Copy of Order of 6/15/00 returned as to Tracy G. BirdSong marked "Return to Sender, Forwarding Order Expired" (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/30/2000
Received Transcript Order Information Form from Appellant Steven Mark Hayden with notation " No transcript is required for appeal purposes". (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/30/2000
USCA Case Number Re: [77-1] appeal by Steven Mark Hayden USCA NUMBER: 00-13295-DD (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
07/05/2000
MOTION (REQUEST) by Steven Mark Hayden to Consider Evidence of Impropriety of Blue Cross Attorney Actions Prior to Considering Payment of Blue Cross Attorney Fees (w/attachment), referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
81
07/10/2000
MOTION by Steven Mark Hayden to Amend the Record (With Attachments. (DEPOSITIONS of William Hansford, Sheila Knight, Kathy Ferrell, Patrick Ryce, & Vicky Wyatt maintained in separate BINDER) referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (dkt clerk)
83
07/12/2000
ORDER granting [75-1] motion for Tracy G. Birdsong, L.Scott Johnson, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney L. Scott Johnson for Steven Mark Hayden, attorney Tracy G. BirdSong for Steven Mark Hayden (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
84
07/12/2000
ORDER denying [82-1] motion for Relief From Judgment Or Order (construed) as a motion for Reconsideration of [59-1] order, denying [81-1] motion to Amend the Record, denying [80-1] motion to Consider Evidence of Impropriety of Blue Cross Attorney Actions Prior to Considering Payment of Blue Cross Attorney Fees denying [79-1] produce requested (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
85
07/12/2000
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the United States Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit by Steven Mark Hayden from the Order entered on July 12, 2000. Copies mailed to Steven Mark Hayden with appeal information sheet, Counsel and to USCA, Eleventh Circuit along with certified copies of orders appealed from and docket entries.
07/14/2000
Notice of Appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [85-1] appeal by Steven Mark Hayden (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2000
USCA appeal fees received from Steven Mark Hayden $ 105.00 Receipt # 82857 (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2000
USCA Case Number Re: [85-1] appeal by Steven Mark Hayden USCA NUMBER: 00-13709-D (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2000
CERTIFICATE OF READINESS of record on appeal mailed to USCA, 11th Circuit and counsel: [85-1] appeal by Steven Mark Hayden, [77-1] appeal by Steven Mark Hayden [00-13295-DD] & [00-13709-DD] (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
86
10/19/2000
MOTION by Blue Cross/B Shield to Enlarge Attorneys' Fee Request, and for Expedited Hearing (Exhibit A attached), referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
87
10/26/2000
ORDER denying [86-1] motion to Enlarge Attorneys' Fee Request, denying [86-2] motion for Expedited Hearing (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies provided to counsel.
10/27/2000
REQUEST for Record On Appeal from USCA re: [85-1] appeal by Steven Mark Hayden, [77-1] appeal by Steven Mark Hayden (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2000
Certified and transmitted Record on Appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals: [85-1] appeal by Steven Mark Hayden, [77-1] appeal by Steven Mark Hayden [00-13709-DD] (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2000
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of RECEIPT of RECORD ON APPEAL from USCA Re: [85-1] appeal by Steven Mark Hayden, [77-1] appeal by Steven Mark Hayden USCA Number: 00-13709-DD (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
88
03/08/2001
ORDER denying without prejudice [66-1] motion for Attorney Fees; The petition for fees may be renewed if the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals affirms and a petition is filed within 60 days after the issuance of the mandate. (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies provided to counsel.
89
03/21/2001
MOTION by Blue Cross/B Shield to Renew its Request for Attorney Fees ; [Exhibit A attached]. Referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (dkt clerk)
90
03/26/2001
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the motion for attorney's fees should not be granted; Response to Order to Show Cause due on 4/6/01 for Steven Mark Hayden (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies provided to counsel.
91
03/26/2001
RESPONSE by Steven Mark Hayden to [89-1] motion to Renew its Request for Attorney Fees by Blue Cross/B Shield; (Attachments). Referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (dkt clerk)
92
04/02/2001
MOTION by Steven Mark Hayden for a New Trial Under 60(B)(6). Referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (dkt clerk)
93
04/02/2001
MOTION by Steven Mark Hayden for Hearing to Inquire into Violations of Rule 11(B) BCBS attorneys and REQUEST for Production of 1) the Redacted Fees; 2) Medical Reviews of Denied Claims and 3) Ex Parte Communication ; (Attachment). Referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (dkt clerk)
94
04/04/2001
Stamped ORDER denying [92-1] motion for a New Trial Under 60(B)(6); (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody). Copies provided to counsel. (dkt clerk)
95
04/04/2001
Stamped ORDER denying [93-1] motion for Hearing to Inquire into Violations of Rule 11(B) BCBS attorneys; denying [93-2] motion for Production of 1) the Redacted Fees; 2) Medical Reviews of Denied Claims and 3) Ex Parte Communication; (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody). Copies provided to counsel. (dkt clerk)
96
04/06/2001
MOTION by Steven Mark Hayden for Judge Coody to Recuse Himself. Referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (dkt clerk)
97
04/11/2001
FACTUAL BASIS by Steven M. Hayden, M.D. for Judge Coody to Recuse Himself. Referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (dkt clerk)
98
04/11/2001
RESPONSE by Blue Cross/B Shield to [96-1] motion for Judge Coody to Recuse Himself by Steven Mark Hayden; [Exhibit A attached]. Referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (dkt clerk)
99
04/12/2001
ORDER denying [96-1] motion for Judge Coody to Recuse Himself (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies provided to counsel.
100
04/12/2001
ORDER denying [89-1] motion to Renew its Request for Attorney Fees; (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody). Copies provided to plaintiff and counsel. (dkt clerk)
101
04/18/2001
MOTION by Blue Cross/B Shield for Costs incurred in responding to Plaintiff's motion. Referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (dkt clerk)
04/19/2001
Received copy of PER CURIAM OPINION entered March 16, 2001 of the USCA, 11th Circuit. [00-13295-DD & 00-13709-DD] (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
102
04/19/2001
JUDGMENT OF USCA issued as mandate April 17, 2001 Re: [85-1] appeal by Steven Mark Hayden, [77-1] appeal by Steven Mark Hayden, that it is ordered, adjudged, and decreed that the attached opinion, included herein by reference, is entered as the judgment of this Court. (Before: TJOFLAT, BLACK and FAY, Circuit Judge.) [00-13295 & 00-13709-DD] (dkt clerk)
04/19/2001
Record on Appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: [85-1] appeal, [77-1] appeal [00-13295 & 0-13709-DD] (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/20/2001
File w/copy of USCA JUDGMENT & OPINION forwarded to Judge Coody. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/28/2001
Five envelopes of exhibits returned from the United States Court of Appeals, Eleventh Cicuit. (Text entry; no document attached.)
103
02/15/2002
ORDER denying [101-1] motion for Costs incurred in responding to Plaintiff's motion (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies provided to counsel, plaintiff. (ajr) Modified on 02/15/2002
05/02/2003
Partial Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 7.00 RECEIPT # 97155 (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.