Heather Ossig and Brian Ossig
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00424 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
doc
05/25/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
56
06/11/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
57
06/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
06/19/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
07/17/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
07/18/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.