Heidi Marie Rivera
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00412 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/04/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
12/04/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
12/04/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
12/04/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
12/04/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
12/04/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/04/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
12/04/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
6
12/04/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
7
12/04/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
8
12/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
12/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
12/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
12/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
12/10/2018
Schedules A-J
13
12/10/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
12/11/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
12/12/2018
Declaration About Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec and 202)
12/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/31/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
01/03/2019
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
01/03/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
01/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
01/09/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
01/09/2019
Vacating Order (SA)
18
01/11/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
19
01/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
20
01/16/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
21
01/17/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
02/07/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
02/19/2019
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.