Henderson v. Commissioner of Soc. Sec. Admin.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00114 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
5
05/21/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
05/21/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
06/05/2018
Notice of Appearance
7
06/07/2018
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
8
07/02/2018
Notice of Appearance
9
07/06/2018
Scheduling Order
07/06/2018
Docket Annotation re Opening Brief (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
07/31/2018
Answer to Complaint
11
07/31/2018
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)
12
08/20/2018
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)
13
08/30/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
14
10/01/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
15
10/01/2018
Declaration
16
10/02/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
17
11/05/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
18
11/19/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
19
04/10/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
20
04/11/2019
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.