Henry v. Municipality of Anchorage et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cv-00187 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
760
05/18/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
761
05/21/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
762
05/23/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
763
05/30/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
764
05/30/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
765
06/03/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
766
06/03/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
767
06/03/2018
In Limine
768
06/03/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
769
06/03/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
770
06/03/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
771
06/03/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
772
06/04/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
773
06/04/2018
Declaration
774
06/04/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
775
06/04/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
776
06/04/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
777
06/04/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
778
06/04/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
779
06/04/2018
In Limine
780
06/04/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
781
06/04/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
782
06/04/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
783
06/04/2018
In Limine
784
06/04/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
785
06/04/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
787
06/04/2018
In Limine
788
06/04/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
789
06/06/2018
Sealed Motion
06/06/2018
Order on Motion in Limine (Text entry; no document attached.)
791
06/06/2018
Hearing
792
06/11/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
793
06/11/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
794
06/11/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
795
06/11/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
796
06/15/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
797
06/15/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
798
06/15/2018
Declaration
799
06/15/2018
Declaration
800
06/15/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
801
06/15/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
802
06/15/2018
Declaration
803
06/25/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
06/25/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
805
06/25/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
806
06/25/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
807
06/25/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
808
06/25/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
809
06/25/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
810
06/25/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
811
06/25/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
812
06/25/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
813
06/25/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
814
06/25/2018
Declaration
815
06/25/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
816
06/25/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
817
06/25/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
818
06/25/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
819
06/25/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
820
06/29/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
821
06/29/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
822
06/29/2018
Intervene
823
06/29/2018
Memorandum
824
06/29/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
825
06/29/2018
Memorandum
826
06/29/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
827
06/29/2018
Memorandum
828
06/29/2018
Declaration
829
07/02/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
830
07/02/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
831
07/02/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
07/03/2018
Docket Annotation re Motion to Intervene (Text entry; no document attached.)
832
07/02/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
833
07/09/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
834
07/09/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
835
07/09/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
836
07/09/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
837
07/09/2018
Declaration
838
07/09/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
839
07/13/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
840
07/13/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
841
07/13/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
842
07/13/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
843
07/13/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
844
07/16/2018
Hearing
845
07/27/2018
Reconsideration
846
07/30/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
847
08/02/2018
Unseal Document
848
08/03/2018
Order on Motion to Unseal Document
849
08/03/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
850
08/03/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
851
08/03/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
852
08/03/2018
Declaration
853
08/03/2018
Notice of Appearance
854
08/03/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
855
08/03/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
856
08/03/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
857
08/03/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
858
08/07/2018
Hearing
859
08/08/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
860
08/08/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
861
08/08/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
862
08/13/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
863
08/16/2018
DEPS Notice
08/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.