Henry v. State of Alaska, Child Support Enforcement Division
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00266 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/09/2018
Complaint
2
11/09/2018
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
3
11/20/2018
Notice (Other)
4
12/12/2018
Notice (Other)
5
12/20/2018
Notice (Other)
6
01/24/2019
Notice (Other)
7
01/31/2019
Notice (Other)
8
02/08/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
9
02/11/2019
Judgment
10
02/15/2019
Stay
11
02/22/2019
Order on Motion to Stay

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.