Hernandez v. Lyou et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00199 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
31
05/25/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
32
05/29/2018
Additional Related Document
06/04/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
08/01/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
08/03/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
08/03/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
37
08/08/2018
Additional Related Document
08/15/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
Docket Annotation re Amended Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
08/22/2018
Additional Related Document
40
08/28/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
08/31/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
09/13/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
09/14/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
09/28/2018
Supplement
46
09/28/2018
Seal
47
10/05/2018
Order on Motion to Seal
48
10/16/2018
Dismiss
49
10/19/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
50
10/24/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
12/17/2018
Order Referring Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.