Hernandez v. State of Alaska, Public Advocacy et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00201 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
30
05/29/2018
Additional Related Document
31
08/08/2018
Additional Related Document
32
08/22/2018
Additional Related Document
33
08/22/2018
Additional Related Document
34
08/28/2018
Additional Related Document
35
09/04/2018
Additional Related Document
37
09/18/2018
Additional Related Document
38
10/02/2018
Additional Related Document
39
10/04/2018
Additional Related Document
40
10/12/2018
Additional Related Document
41
10/17/2018
Additional Related Document
42
10/23/2018
Additional Related Document
43
10/30/2018
Additional Related Document
44
11/09/2018
Additional Related Document
45
11/16/2018
Additional Related Document
46
11/16/2018
Additional Related Document
47
11/20/2018
Additional Related Document
48
12/12/2018
Additional Related Document
49
12/14/2018
Additional Related Document
50
12/14/2018
Additional Related Document
51
01/29/2019
Additional Related Document
52
02/25/2019
Additional Related Document
53
03/04/2019
Additional Related Document
54
03/07/2019
Additional Related Document
55
03/13/2019
Additional Related Document
56
03/22/2019
Unissued Summons
57
03/26/2019
Order
58
04/11/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
59
04/11/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
60
04/15/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
61
04/17/2019
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.