Hersh v. State of Alaska, Attorney General for Alaska
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00185 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
15
06/15/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
16
06/15/2018
Declaration
07/05/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
Docket Annotation re Amended Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
07/30/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
07/31/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
09/12/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
09/13/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
10/12/2018
Supplement
11/07/2018
Order Reassigning Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
Docket Annotation re 28:2254 Merit Briefing (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
12/11/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
12/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
12/17/2018
Answer to Complaint
28
12/18/2018
Dismiss
29
01/02/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
01/03/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
01/23/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
01/24/2019
Order on Motion to Dismiss (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
02/25/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
02/26/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
03/25/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
03/27/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
04/01/2019
Merit Briefing re 28:2254
38
05/01/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
05/01/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.