Hickel v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00255 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/17/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/17/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/17/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/17/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/17/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
06/07/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
22
06/07/2018
Affidavit
23
06/07/2018
Affidavit
06/08/2018
Docket Annotation re Non-Compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2 (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
06/12/2018
Hearing
25
06/15/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
07/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
07/17/2018
Notice (Other)
07/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
08/31/2018
ORDER denying 7 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 8/31/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
32
11/02/2018
Stipulation of Dismissal

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.