Hobart v. Hertz Corporation, et al
Court Docket Sheet

2:2002-cv-01308 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 210 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/12/2002
COMPLAINT FILED
2
11/06/2002
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Hertz Corporation on 10/31/02
3
11/06/2002
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Hertz General Intere on 10/31/02
4
11/06/2002
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Hertz Local Ed Corp on 10/31/02
5
11/06/2002
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Hertz Local Ed Trans on 10/31/02
6
11/06/2002
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Hertz Vehicle Fin on 10/31/02
7
11/06/2002
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Hertz Equip Rental on 10/31/02
8
11/06/2002
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Hertz Vehicles LLC on 10/31/02
9
11/19/2002
ANSWER to complaint [1-1] by dfts (former emp)
10
12/20/2002
MOTION for admission pro hac vice as to Timothy R. Newton, atty for dft Hertz Corporation [10-1]
11
12/20/2002
MOTION for admission pro hac vice as to Frank B. Shuster, atty for dft Hertz Corporation [11-1]
12
12/26/2002
ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion for admission pro hac vice as to Frank B. Shuster, atty for dft Hertz Corporation [11-1] (cc: all counsel) (CMM) (ADI-ICMS,).
13
12/26/2002
ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion for admission pro hac vice as to Timothy R. Newton, atty for dft Hertz Corporation [10-1] (cc: all counsel) (CMM) (ADI-ICMS,).
14
01/09/2003
MOTION for Rule 16(b) scheduling conference by pla [14-1]
15
01/22/2003
ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll ; prel scheduling conf set for 9:15 3/10/03 (cc: all counsel) (CMM) (ADI-ICMS,).
16
03/03/2003
JOINT PROPOSED CASE MGT PLAN by pla, dfts
17
03/10/2003
MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Earl H. Carroll. Crt Rptr: Candy Potter. Appearances: Johnn Conley for pla; David Barton for dft, Hertz Corp.; Timothy Newton appearing telephonically for dft, Hertz Corp. ; Preliminary scheduling conference held. Matter discussed. Scheduling Order to issue setting forth case management deadlines and trial date. [cc: EHC] [17-2]
18
03/12/2003
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll ; discovery due 8/29/03 ; pretrial order due 11/3/03 ; jury trial set for 9:00 11/18/03 (cc: all counsel) (CMM) (ADI-ICMS,).
19
03/13/2003
ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll referring the matter to Mag Judge Virginia A Mathis for the purpose of setting a settlement conference within 45 days of the date of this order; FURTHER ORDERED that within 10 days from the date of this order parties are to contact Mag Judge Mathis at (602)322-7610 to schedule the date and time of the settlement conference (cc: all counsel/VAM) re: order filed [19-1] (LAD) (ADI-ICMS,).
20
03/26/2003
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT ORDER by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis ; settlement conference set for 1:30 4/16/03, before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis At least 5 days before the settlement conference, parties shall lodge with the Magistrate Judge a settlement conference statement, the statements should not be filed with the clerk of court (cc: all counsel,ehc) (CMM) (ADI-ICMS,).
21
04/01/2003
STIPULATION to dismiss by pla Stuart Hobart, dft Hertz Vehicles LLC, dft Hertz Vehicle Fin, dft Hertz Local Ed Corp, dft Hertz Local Ed Trans, dft Hertz General Intere, dft Hertz Equip Rental, leaving Hertz Corporation the only remaining dft
22
04/04/2003
ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting stipulation to dismiss by pla Stuart Hobart, dft Hertz Vehicles LLC, dft Hertz Vehicle Fin, dft Hertz Local Ed Corp, dft Hertz Local Ed Trans, dft Hertz General Intere, dft Hertz Equip Rental, leaving Hertz Corporation the only remaining dft party Hertz Equip Rental, party Hertz General Intere, party Hertz Local Ed Trans, party Hertz Local Ed Corp, party Hertz Vehicle Fin, party Hertz Vehicles LLC, dismissed with prejudice, each side to bear its own costs and fees (cc: all counsel) (CMM) (ADI-ICMS,).
23
04/16/2003
MINUTE ENTRY before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis. ; settlement conference held No settlement reached [23-2]
24
07/30/2003
STIPULATED MOTION to continue trial and certain pretrial deadlines (filing of motion for summary judgment to date on or after 9/26/03; pretrial conference to a date on or after 12/1/03, jury trial to a date on or after 12/8/03) by pla Stuart Hobart, dft Hertz Corporation
25
08/05/2003
ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting stipulation to continue trial and certain pretrial deadlines (filing of motion for summary judgment to date on or after 9/26/03; pretrial conference to a date on or after 12/1/03, jury trial to a date on or after 12/8/03) by pla Stuart Hobart, dft Hertz Corporation ; PTO ddl reset for 11/21/03; Final Pretrial conference reset for 9:00 12/1/03; jury trial reset for 9:00 12/9/03 ; Motions for summary judgment due by 9/26/03 (cc: all counsel) (CMM) (ADI-ICMS,).
26
08/08/2003
STIPULATION for Protective Order by pla Stuart Hobart, dft Hertz Corporation
27
08/15/2003
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll : granting stipulation for Protective Order by pla Stuart Hobart, dft Hertz Corporation (cc: all counsel) (CMM) (ADI-ICMS,).
28
09/26/2003
MOTION for summary judgment and memorandum in support by dft Hertz Corporation [28-1] (former emp)
29
09/26/2003
SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS by dft Hertz Corporation re motion for summary judgment and memorandum in support by dft Hertz Corporation [28-1] (former emp)
30
09/26/2003
APPENDIX in support of motion for summary judgment by dft Hertz Corporation [28-1] (former emp)
31
10/24/2003
STIPULATION to extend time until 11/3/03 to file response to dft motion for summary judgment by pla, dft
32
10/28/2003
ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting stipulation to extend time until 11/3/03 to file response to dft motion for summary judgment by pla, dft (cc: all counsel) (CMM) (ADI-ICMS,).
33
11/03/2003
RESPONSE by pla to motion for summary judgment and memorandum in support by dft Hertz Corporation [28-1]
34
11/03/2003
RESPONSE by pla to statement of facts in support of dft motion for summary judgment [29-1]
35
11/03/2003
STATEMENT OF FACTS by pla in support of his response to dft motion for summary judgment [33-1]
36
11/12/2003
NOTICE of compliance of initial disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by dft Hertz Corporation
37
11/20/2003
STIPULATION to vacate court dates set in order filed [25-2] by pla Stuart Hobart, dft Hertz Corporation
38
11/25/2003
ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting stipulation to vacate court dates set in order filed [25-2] by pla Stuart Hobart, dft Hertz Corporation (cc: all counsel) (MAP) (ADI-ICMS,).
39
12/24/2003
ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll ; status conference concerning futher proceedings in this matter set for 2:00 1/26/04 (cc: all counsel) (LSP) (ADI-ICMS,).
40
12/30/2003
STIPULATION to dismiss case with prejudice by pla, dft
41
01/06/2004
ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting stipulation to dismiss case with prejudice by pla, dft (cc: all counsel) (CMM) (ADI-ICMS,).
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.