Hodges Bonded v. Fleming Companies, et al

2:1998-cv-01247 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 482 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/04/1998
DEMAND for jury trial by Hodged Bonded
11/05/1998
File referred to Judge De Ment (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
11/06/1998
Defendant's Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal; Notice Attached
3
11/10/1998
ANSWER to Complaint by Fleming Companies, referred to Judge Ira De Ment
4
03/24/1999
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 2/15/00 before Judge Ira De Ment Motion Filing deadline on 11/15/99 ; Discovery cutoff 2/1/00 ; jury trial set for 3/20/00 before Judge Ira De Ment ; set amended pleading deadline for 6/7/99 Mediation Notice deadline on 7/3/99 (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to CAC, RL, DH, HC.
5
05/12/1999
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Hodged Bonded by Jere L. Beasley, Lowell Landis Sexton, Tiernan W. Luck III
6
10/13/1999
MEMORANDUM by Fleming Companies in support of [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Fleming Companies referred to Judge Ira De Ment
7
10/18/1999
ORDER, pla's Response to Motion set to 11/1/99 for [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment, set reply brief deadline for 11/8/99 for Fleming Companies [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Fleming Companies set for submission on 11/8/99 (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furn RL.
8
11/01/1999
BRIEF by Hodged Bonded in opposition to [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment; (w/Exh. 1-3 attached) referred to Judge Ira De Ment
9
11/05/1999
JOINT MOTION by Hodged Bonded, Fleming Companies to Extend expert disclosure deadline & mod. of section 9 of court's schedo referred to Judge Ira De Ment
10
11/08/1999
REPLY BRIEF by Fleming Companies in opposition to [8-1] brief in opposition by Hodged Bonded referred to Judge Ira De Ment
11/08/1999
Stamped ORDER granting [9-1] joint motion to Extend expert disclosure deadline & mod. of section 9 of court's schedo (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furn: RL. (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
01/04/2000
SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION by Fleming Companies for Summary Judgment referring to: [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Fleming Companies; (w/attachments) referred to Judge Ira De Ment
12
01/10/2000
ORDER, set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 1:00 2/16/00 before Judge Ira De Ment ; Proposed Pretrial Order due 2/9/00 ; Jury Trial set for 3/20/00 before Judge Ira De Ment ; (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furn: RL, yg, hc.
13
01/13/2000
MOTION by Fleming Companies for Leave to assert counterclaim ; (w/attachment) referred to Judge Ira De Ment
14
01/14/2000
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why dft's motion for leave to assert claims should not be granted: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 1/27/00 for Hodged Bonded, set reply brief deadline for 2/3/00 for Fleming Companies (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furn: rl.
15
01/25/2000
Response by Hodged Bonded to [14-1] Order to Show Cause/response in opposition to dft's motion for leave to assert counterclaim; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
16
01/27/2000
ORDER [13-1] Motion for Leave to assert counterclaim by Fleming Companies set for submission on 2/3/00; 1) reset Pretrial Conference for 6/21/00 before Judge Ira DeMent ; 2) reset Jury Trial 8/7/00 before Judge Ira DeMent ; 3) reset Discovery deadline to 6/7/00 ; 4) deadlines in Sections 11, 12, 13 and 14 of Uniform Sched Order, entered 3/24/99 are revised to conform to the new trial dates; 5) all other deadlines in Uniform Sched Order are to remain in full force and effect (signed by Judge Ira DeMent), copies mailed to Counsel. Furnished to RL, CAC, YG, HC. h
17
02/02/2000
MOTION by Hodged Bonded for Leave to File Response to Supplement to Defendant's motion for Summary Judgment. Referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
18
02/02/2000
NOTICE of Settlement Status by Hodged Bonded. Referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
02/02/2000
Stamped ORDER granting [17-1] motion for Leave to File Response to Supplement to Defendant's motion for Summary Judgment; (signed by Judge Ira De Ment). Copies mailed to counsel. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
02/03/2000
REPLY by Fleming Companies to [15-1] Opposition to motion for Leave to assert Counterclaim by Hodged Bonded. Referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
20
03/01/2000
MOTION by Hodged Bonded to Strike [11-1] second aff. of Mel Willming and Exh. 1 to aff. to supplemental amended motion for Summary Judgment by Fleming Companies ; w/attachments referred to Judge Ira De Ment
21
03/13/2000
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Hodged Bonded by M. Adam Jones
22
03/13/2000
MOTION by Hodged Bonded for Tiernan W. Luck to Withdraw as Attorney referred to Judge Ira De Ment
23
03/14/2000
MOTION by Fleming Companies for Leave to File a reply to pla's response to dft's supplement to motion for summary judgment & motion to strike referred to Judge Ira De Ment
03/15/2000
Stamped ORDER granting [22-1] motion for Tiernan W. Luck to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Tiernan W. Luck for Hodged Bonded (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furn: rl. (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
03/15/2000
MOTION by Fleming Companies for Leave to File amended answer to pla's complaint ; w/attachments referred to Judge Ira De Ment
03/16/2000
Stamped ORDER granting [23-1] motion for Leave to File a reply to pla's response to dft's supplement to motion for summary judgment & motion to strike (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furn: rl. (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
03/16/2000
REPLY BRIEF by Fleming Companies in opposition to [20-1] motion to Strike [11-1] second aff. of Mel Willming and Exh. 1 to aff. to supplemental amended motion for Summary Judgment by Fleming Companies by Hodged Bonded, [20-1] brief reply by Hodged Bonded; w/Exh.A-G attached referred to Judge Ira De Ment
26
03/20/2000
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why dft's motion to file amended answer should not be granted: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 4/3/00 for Hodged Bonded, set reply brief deadline for 4/10/00 for Fleming Companies (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furn rl.
27
03/29/2000
OBJECTION by Hodged Bonded to [24-1] motion for Leave to File amended answer to pla's complaint by Fleming Companies referred to Judge Ira De Ment
28
03/31/2000
Supplement to RESPONSE by Hodged Bonded to [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Fleming Companies; (w/attachments) referred to Judge Ira De Ment
29
04/10/2000
REPLY BRIEF by Fleming Companies in opposition to [27-1] objection by Hodged Bonded; (w/attachments) referred to Judge Ira De Ment
30
05/05/2000
ORDER, set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 11:00 6/21/00 before Judge Ira De Ment ; Proposed Pretrial Order due 6/14/00 ; Jury Trial set for 8/7/00 before Judge Ira De Ment ; (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furn: cac yg hc rl.
31
05/24/2000
JOINT MOTION by Hodged Bonded, Fleming Companies to Extend discovery deadline referred to Judge Ira De Ment
05/26/2000
Stamped ORDER granting [31-1] joint motion to Extend discovery deadline; resetting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery cutoff to 7/24/00; (signed by Judge Ira DeMent). Copies mailed to counsel. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
06/05/2000
ORDER, removing this case from the 6/21/00 pretrial docket and from the 8/7/00 trial docket and terminated deadlines, set parties' joint stip. of dismissal deadline to 6/19/00 (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furn: rl hc yg cac.
33
06/05/2000
Notice Concerning Settlement Conference and Mediation by (Atty Lee H. Copeland) mediator referred to Judge Ira De Ment
34
06/14/2000
Joint STIPULATION of dismissal; ref. to Judge De Ment
35
06/15/2000
ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furn: rl.
06/15/2000
Case closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.