Holly Noel Davis
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00036 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
doc
05/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
20
06/05/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
21
06/06/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
22
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
23
06/22/2018
Vacating Order (SA)
24
06/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
25
07/02/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
26
07/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
07/05/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.