Hook Line & Sinker, Inc. v. Brady, Jr. et al
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90017 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Entry of Appearance
doc
05/30/2018
Answer to Complaint (APANS01)
doc
06/04/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
9
06/26/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
10
06/26/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
11
09/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
12
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
13
10/16/2018
Proceeding Memo
14
10/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
15
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
16
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
11/02/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.