Hook Line & Sinker, Inc. v. Salamatof Native Association, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90005 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
doc
05/24/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
doc
05/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
05/31/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
12
06/08/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
13
06/08/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
06/11/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
08/24/2018
Partial Summary Judgment (CM52)
15
08/27/2018
Summary Judgment (CM52)
17
09/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
18
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
19
10/16/2018
Proceeding Memo
20
10/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
21
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
22
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.