Hook Line & Sinker, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00415 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
doc
05/30/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
doc
05/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
05/31/2018
Amended Order (SA)
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
108
06/05/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
06/05/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
109
06/05/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
110
06/06/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
06/06/2018
Add Party (Text entry; no document attached.)
111
06/07/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)
06/07/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
112
06/07/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
06/08/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
113
06/15/2018
Monthly Operating Report
114
06/15/2018
Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)
06/15/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
115
06/15/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
116
06/18/2018
Assume / Reject Lease or Executory Contract (CM06 or CM19)
06/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
117
06/21/2018
Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN02)
118
06/21/2018
Disclosure Statement
119
06/21/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
120
06/22/2018
Certification
121
06/22/2018
Generic Motion / Application
122
06/22/2018
Set Hearing on Disclosure / Confirmation (SA)
123
06/22/2018
Generic Motion / Application
124
06/22/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
125
06/23/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
126
06/23/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
127
06/23/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
128
06/25/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
129
06/26/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
06/26/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
130
06/26/2018
Generic Motion
131
06/26/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
132
06/27/2018
Certificate of Service
133
06/27/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
134
06/28/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
135
06/29/2018
Certificate of Service
136
07/03/2018
Non-Opposition
137
07/04/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
138
07/05/2018
Generic Motion / Application
139
07/05/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
07/11/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
140
07/15/2018
Monthly Operating Report
141
07/17/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
142
07/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
143
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
144
07/19/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
145
07/19/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
146
07/20/2018
Declaration
147
07/21/2018
Certificate of No Objection
148
07/23/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
149
07/27/2018
Amended Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN04)
150
07/27/2018
Disclosure Statement
07/27/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
151
07/30/2018
Generic Motion
08/01/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
152
08/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
08/03/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
153
08/08/2018
Hearing
154
08/11/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
155
08/13/2018
Monthly Operating Report
156
08/13/2018
Certificate of Service
157
08/13/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
158
08/15/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
159
08/21/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
160
08/22/2018
Certificate of Service
161
08/24/2018
Assume / Reject Lease or Executory Contract
162
08/31/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
163
09/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
164
09/13/2018
Borrow
165
09/13/2018
Limit Notice
166
09/13/2018
Limit Notice
167
09/13/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
168
09/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
169
09/14/2018
Monthly Operating Report
170
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
171
09/18/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
172
09/19/2018
Notice of Appointment of Creditors Committee (BKCR01)
09/26/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
173
09/26/2018
Certificate of No Objection
174
09/28/2018
Borrow
175
10/15/2018
Monthly Operating Report
176
10/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
177
10/16/2018
Proceeding Memo
178
10/18/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
179
10/18/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
180
10/19/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
181
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
182
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
183
11/05/2018
Amended Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN04)
184
11/05/2018
Disclosure Statement
185
11/05/2018
Certification
11/05/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
186
11/06/2018
Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019 (Re Estate - By Trustee or DIP Only) (CM36)
187
11/06/2018
Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019 (Re Estate - By Trustee or DIP Only) (CM36)
188
11/06/2018
Set Hearing on Disclosure / Confirmation (SA)
189
11/06/2018
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
190
11/12/2018
Monthly Operating Report
11/14/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
191
11/19/2018
Certificate of No Objection
192
11/29/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
193
11/30/2018
Certificate of Service
194
12/04/2018
Certificate of Service
195
12/05/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
196
12/06/2018
Certificate of Service
197
12/06/2018
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
12/06/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
198
12/06/2018
Certificate of Service
12/06/2018
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
199
12/06/2018
Entry of Appearance
200
12/06/2018
Objection to Disclosure Statement
201
12/06/2018
Objection to Disclosure Statement
202
12/06/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
203
12/07/2018
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
12/07/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
204
12/07/2018
Chapter 11 Ballots
205
12/07/2018
Generic Motion / Application
206
12/07/2018
Shorten Time
207
12/07/2018
Entry of Appearance
208
12/07/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
209
12/07/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
210
12/07/2018
Declaration
211
12/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims
212
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims
213
12/10/2018
Shorten Time
214
12/10/2018
Hearing
215
12/10/2018
Non-Opposition
216
12/10/2018
Monthly Operating Report
217
12/10/2018
Declaration
218
12/11/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
219
12/11/2018
Proceeding Memo
12/13/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
220
12/14/2018
Compensation
221
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
222
12/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
223
12/17/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
224
12/18/2018
Compensation (SA)
12/20/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
225
12/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
226
12/21/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
227
12/21/2018
Disclosure Statement
228
12/21/2018
Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN02)
229
12/28/2018
Set Hearing on Disclosure / Confirmation (SA)
230
01/07/2019
Approve Settlement (Not Rule 9019)
231
01/10/2019
Shorten Time
232
01/11/2019
Shorten Time
233
01/11/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
234
01/11/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
235
01/13/2019
Monthly Operating Report
236
01/22/2019
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
01/22/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
237
01/22/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
238
01/22/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
01/23/2019
QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image (Text entry; no document attached.)
239
01/23/2019
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
240
01/23/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
241
01/24/2019
Memorandum in Support
242
01/24/2019
Generic Motion / Application
243
01/24/2019
Stipulation
244
01/24/2019
Chapter 11 Ballots
245
01/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims
01/25/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
246
01/25/2019
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
247
01/25/2019
Declaration
248
01/25/2019
Declaration
249
01/25/2019
Declaration
250
01/25/2019
Amended Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN04)
251
01/25/2019
Approve Settlement (Not Rule 9019)
252
01/25/2019
Shorten Time
253
01/25/2019
Affidavit
254
01/25/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
255
01/25/2019
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
256
01/25/2019
Declaration
257
01/27/2019
Declaration
258
01/28/2019
Shorten Time
259
01/28/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
01/28/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
260
01/28/2019
Declaration
261
01/28/2019
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
262
01/28/2019
Chapter 11 Ballots
263
01/28/2019
Declaration
264
01/28/2019
Declaration
265
01/28/2019
Declaration
266
01/28/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
267
01/28/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
268
01/28/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
269
01/29/2019
Declaration
270
01/29/2019
Declaration
271
01/29/2019
Declaration
272
01/29/2019
Declaration
01/30/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
273
02/01/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
274
02/01/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
275
02/01/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
276
02/01/2019
Proceeding Memo
277
02/01/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
278
02/04/2019
Generic Motion / Application
279
02/04/2019
Generic Motion / Application
280
02/04/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
281
02/05/2019
Certificate of Service
282
02/05/2019
Generic Motion / Application
02/05/2019
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
283
02/07/2019
Setting Hearing (SA)
284
02/08/2019
Allow Filing of Late Filed Claim (CM02)
285
02/08/2019
Declaration
286
02/08/2019
Declaration
287
02/08/2019
Amended Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN04)
288
02/08/2019
Supplement to Disclosure Statement
289
02/08/2019
Declaration
290
02/08/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
291
02/08/2019
Amended Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN04)
292
02/08/2019
Disclosure Statement
293
02/11/2019
Errata
294
02/11/2019
Objection to Disclosure Statement
295
02/11/2019
Non-Opposition
296
02/11/2019
Entry of Appearance
297
02/11/2019
Non-Opposition
298
02/12/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
299
02/12/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
300
02/13/2019
Supplement to Disclosure Statement
301
02/13/2019
Chapter 11 Ballots
302
02/13/2019
Supplement to Disclosure Statement
303
02/13/2019
Generic Motion
304
02/13/2019
Amended Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN04)
305
02/13/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
306
02/14/2019
Monthly Operating Report
307
02/15/2019
Proceeding Memo
308
02/15/2019
Set Hearing on Disclosure / Confirmation (SA)
309
02/15/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
02/15/2019
Terminate Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
310
02/16/2019
Employ (CM41)
311
02/16/2019
Declaration
312
02/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.