Hotch et al v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:1976-cv-00271 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
464
08/21/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
465
08/23/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
466
09/27/2018
Settlement Agreement
467
10/01/2018
Order
468
02/11/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
469
02/12/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
470
02/22/2019
Returned/Undeliverable Mail

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.