Houser v. Higher Education Loan Authority of the State of Mi
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-ap-90078 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
27
06/20/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
28
07/17/2018
Case Status Report
29
07/24/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
30
08/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
31
09/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
10/01/2018
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
10/01/2018
Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
33
10/04/2018
Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (SA)
10/05/2018
Close Adversary Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
10/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.