Howard Clyde Pavil, Jr. and Michelle Lynn Pavil
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2016-bk-00300 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/05/2016
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Howard Clyde Pavil, jr. and Michelle Lynn Pavil
71
11/07/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
72
12/03/2018
Substitution of Attorney
73
12/03/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)
12/06/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
74
04/16/2019
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
75
04/16/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.