Hughes, et al v. Conagra Poultry Co., et al
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

1:1997-cv-01591 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 663 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/31/1997
DEMAND for jury trial by Doyle Hughes, Jenny Hughes, Brenda Hodge (dkt clerk)
2
10/31/1997
NOTICE to Circuit Court of Coffee County, Alabama and to opposing counsel of filing Notice of Removal by Conagra Poultry Co., Kenneth Edwards (dkt clerk)
3
10/31/1997
ANSWER to Complaint by Conagra Poultry Co., Kenneth Edwards; referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
4
10/31/1997
AFFIDAVIT by Kenneth Edwards Re: [3-1] answer by Kenneth Edwards, Conagra Poultry Co.; referred to Judge De Ment (dkt clerk)
11/06/1997
File referred to Judge De Ment (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
12/02/1997
MOTION by Doyle Hughes, Jenny Hughes, Brenda Hodge to Remand to the Circuit Court of Coffee County, Alabama ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
6
12/03/1997
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Rule 16 Pretrial Conference for 7/1/98, in Dothan, Alabama, and this cause is set for jury trial and selection on 8/24/98, in Dothan, Alabama, before Judge Ira De Ment; Motion Filing deadline on 4/2/98; Discovery cutoff 6/17/98; setting amended pleading deadline for 2/16/98; Mediation Notice deadline on 4/28/98; as further set out (signed by Judge Ira De Ment); copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT, RL, CAC. (dkt clerk) Modified on 12/04/1997
7
12/03/1997
ORDER that with regard to all substantive motions (ex: motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, motions to remand, motions to strike, and motions for arbitration: motion must be accompanied by a brief, as further set out; failure to comply strictly with this order may result in appropriate sanctions (signed by Judge Ira De Ment); copies mailed to counsel (dkt clerk) Modified on 12/03/1997
8
12/03/1997
MOTION by Doyle Hughes, Jenny Hughes, Brenda Hodge, Larry Hodge for Leave to File Amend Complaint (Exhibit A attached) ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
9
12/03/1997
NOTICE of Filing Affidavits (Affidavits of Brenda Hodge and Doyle Hughes attached) by Doyle Hughes, Jenny Hughes, Brenda Hodge, Larry Hodge (dkt clerk)
10
12/03/1997
BRIEF by Doyle Hughes, Jenny Hughes, Brenda Hodge, Larry Hodge in support of [5-1] motion to Remand to the Circuit Court of Coffee County, Alabama; referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
11
12/08/1997
APPENDIX OF AUTHORITY (w/attachment [BRIEF]) by Doyle Hughes, Jenny Hughes, Brenda Hodge, Larry Hodge in support of [8-1] motion for Leave to File Amend Complaint (Exhibit A attached) referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk) Modified on 12/09/1997
12
12/08/1997
APPENDIX OF AUTHORITY (Exhibits 1-20 attached [BRIEF]) by Doyle Hughes, Jenny Hughes, Brenda Hodge, Larry Hodge in support of [5-1] motion to Remand to the Circuit Court of Coffee County, Alabama; referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
12/08/1997
Stamped ORDER granting [8-1] motion for Leave to File Amend Complaint (Exhibit A attached) (by Judge Ira De Ment) (RENDERED ON 12/8/97); copies mailed to counsel (VACATED AS PER ORDER DATED 1/15/98) (dkt clerk) Modified on 01/15/1998 (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
12/08/1997
AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT by Doyle Hughes, Jenny Hughes, Brenda Hodge, Larry Hodge amending [1-1] complaint; jury demand against Ty Smith, Will Jeffries (dkt clerk) Modified on 12/31/1997
14
12/09/1997
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, if any there be, no later than 23/23/97, as to why motion to remand should not be granted: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 12/23/97 for Will Jeffries, for Ty Smith, for Kenneth Edwards, for Conagra Poultry Co. (signed by Judge Ira De Ment); copies mailed to counsel (dkt clerk)
15
12/12/1997
RESPONSE by Conagra Poultry Co., Kenneth Edwards, Fictitious Defendant(s), Ty Smith, Will Jeffries in opposition to [5-1] motion to Remand to the Circuit Court of Coffee County, Alabama by Brenda Hodge, Jenny Hughes, Doyle Hughes; referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
16
12/12/1997
BRIEF by Conagra Poultry Co., Kenneth Edwards, Fictitious Defendant(s), Ty Smith, Will Jeffries in support of [15-1] opposition response; referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
17
12/12/1997
EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX (BRIEF) by Conagra Poultry Co., Kenneth Edwards, Fictitious Defendant(s), Ty Smith, Will Jeffries in support of [16-1] brief in support; (Exhibits 1-10 attached) referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk) Modified on 12/12/1997
18
12/17/1997
OBJECTION by Doyle Hughes, Jenny Hughes, Brenda Hodge, Larry Hodge to [6-1] Scheduling order; referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
19
12/31/1997
SUMMONS issued for Ty Smith, Will Jeffries; summons and complaint mailed to named defendants by cmrrr (dkt clerk) Modified on 01/09/1998
20
12/31/1997
REPLY BRIEF by Doyle Hughes, Jenny Hughes, Brenda Hodge, Larry Hodge in support [5-1] motion to Remand to the Circuit Court of Coffee County, Alabama by Brenda Hodge, Jenny Hughes, Doyle Hughes; referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
21
01/05/1998
APPENDIX OF AUTHORITY (Exhibit 1-9 attached) by Doyle Hughes, Jenny Hughes, Brenda Hodge of [20-1] brief reply; referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
22
01/09/1998
RESPONSE by Conagra Poultry Co., Kenneth Edwards, Ty Smith, Will Jeffries to [5-1] motion to Remand to the Circuit Court of Coffee County, Alabama by Brenda Hodge, Jenny Hughes, Doyle Hughes; referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
23
01/09/1998
BRIEF by Conagra Poultry Co., Kenneth Edwards, Ty Smith, Will Jeffries in support of [22-1] motion response, [22-1] motion for Reconsideration of stamped [0-0] order dated 12/8/97; referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
24
01/09/1998
APPENDIX OF AUTHORITIES FOR DEFENDANTS' BRIEF (Exhibits 1-10 attached) by Conagra Poultry Co., Kenneth Edwards, Ty Smith, Will Jeffries in support of [23-1] brief in support; referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk) Modified on 01/09/1998
25
01/13/1998
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of summons and complaint on Will Jeffries on 1/9/98 for Will Jeffries. Answer due on 1/29/98 for Will Jeffries (dkt clerk)
26
01/15/1998
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting [22-1] motion for Reconsideration of stamped [0-0] order dated 12/8/97; and that the court's said order be and same is hereby VACATED; granting [5-1] motion to Remand to the Circuit Court of Coffee County, Alabama; that plaintiff's motion for costs and attorneys fees be and the same is hereby DENIED; directing the clerk to take appropriate steps to effectuate said remand (signed by Judge Ira De Ment); copies mailed to counsel; certified copy of said order mailed to Circuit Court of Coffee County, AL (dkt clerk)
01/15/1998
Case closed (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
01/22/1998
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of order dated 1/15/98 on Janice C. McCall for Circuit Court of Coffee County Courthouse on 1/20/98 (dkt clerk)
28
02/11/1998
Summons returned unexecuted as to Ty Smith; summons and complaint returned to Sender with remarks, "Unclaimed"; notified attorney of said subject matter (dkt clerk)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.