Huntington v. Fore et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00235 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
31
05/24/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
32
05/24/2018
Strike
33
05/29/2018
Strike
34
06/04/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
35
06/22/2018
Amend/Correct
36
06/22/2018
Memorandum
37
07/02/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
38
07/13/2018
Notice (Other)
39
07/17/2018
Notice (Other)
40
08/09/2018
Notice (Other)
41
08/29/2018
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
42
09/05/2018
Unissued Summons
09/05/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
09/27/2018
Notice of Appeal
44
10/04/2018
USCA Case Number
45
10/04/2018
USCA Scheduling Order
46
10/09/2018
Summons Returned Executed
47
10/12/2018
Notice of Appearance
48
10/12/2018
Dismiss
49
10/12/2018
Memorandum
50
10/25/2018
USCA Mandate
51
11/02/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
52
11/02/2018
Affidavit
53
11/15/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
54
01/03/2019
Order on Motion to Dismiss
55
01/03/2019
Judgment
56
01/30/2019
Notice of Appeal
57
02/05/2019
USCA Case Number
58
02/05/2019
USCA Scheduling Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.