Hutch Blake Holland
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00111 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 364 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/10/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Hutch Blake Holland
3
01/10/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Hutch Blake Holland.
4
01/10/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Hutch Blake Holland.
5
01/10/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/05/2018 at 01:00 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 04/06/2018.
01/10/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(18-00111-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21590309. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
01/11/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. Andre' M Toffel added to the case. Signed on 1/11/2018.
7
01/11/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
8
01/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 01/12/2018.
9
01/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/13/2018.
10
01/24/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Enslen Crowe Filed by Creditor RoundPoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.