Iditasport Alaska v. Merchant et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00068 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
33
05/18/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
34
05/24/2018
ORDER denying 28 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 5/23/18.
35
05/31/2018
Counterclaim
36
06/04/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
37
06/11/2018
Unissued Summons
06/11/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
06/21/2018
Dismiss
39
07/02/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
07/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
07/05/2018
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
42
07/12/2018
Declaration
07/12/2018
Scheduling Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
07/12/2018
Scheduling Order
44
07/19/2018
Dismiss
45
08/02/2018
Order on Motion to Dismiss
46
08/07/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
47
08/08/2018
Order on Motion to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
48
08/09/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
49
09/13/2018
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion to Dismiss. Ultra plaintiffs' second amended counterclaim, should they decide to file one, shall be filed before 10/4/18. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 9/13/18. Modified on 9/17/2018 to clarify docket text
50
09/14/2018
Order
51
10/16/2018
Order
52
10/31/2018
Response to Order
53
11/02/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines
54
11/14/2018
Response to Order
55
11/15/2018
Order
56
12/10/2018
Stipulation of Dismissal
57
12/11/2018
Order Dismissing Case

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.