In Re: Libor-Based Financial
Court Docket Sheet

2017-01915 (ca2)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/16/2017
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University, FILED. [2060897] [17-1915]--[Edited 06/20/2017 by HT] [Entered: 06/19/2017 11:55 AM]
2
06/16/2017
PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University, district court receipt # 020813789751, FILED.[2060908] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/19/2017 11:59 AM]
3
06/16/2017
DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/20/2016, RECEIVED.[2060910] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/19/2017 12:00 PM]
4
06/16/2017
DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/13/2017, RECEIVED.[2060912] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/19/2017 12:01 PM]
5
06/19/2017
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2060913] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/19/2017 12:01 PM]
11
06/19/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University, FILED. Service date 06/19/2017 by CM/ECF.[2061345] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/19/2017 03:43 PM]
12
06/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University, FILED. Service date 06/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2061356] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/19/2017 03:46 PM]
13
06/19/2017
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University, FILED. Service date 06/19/2017 by CM/ECF.[2061534] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/19/2017 05:03 PM]
14
06/19/2017
FORM D, on behalf of Appellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University, FILED. Service date 06/19/2017 by CM/ECF.[2061538] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/19/2017 05:05 PM]
15
06/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Arun S. Subramanian for Appellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University, in case 17-1915, [12], ADDED.[2061986] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/20/2017 11:36 AM]
19
06/20/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University, FILED. Service date 06/20/2017 by CM/ECF. [2062017] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/20/2017 11:52 AM]
21
06/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Marc M. Seltzer for Appellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University, in case 17-1915, [19], ADDED.[2062138] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/20/2017 01:14 PM]
22
06/20/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 06/20/2017 by CM/ECF.[2062291] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/20/2017 02:58 PM]
23
06/20/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 06/20/2017 by CM/ECF. [2062298] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/20/2017 03:00 PM]
24
06/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Christian T. Kemnitz for Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, in case 17-1915, [23], ADDED.[2062329] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/20/2017 03:12 PM]
25
06/20/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 06/20/2017 by CM/ECF.[2062592] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/20/2017 04:55 PM]
26
06/20/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of New Britain, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation, Yale University and Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/20/2017 by CM/ECF. [2062648] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/20/2017 06:44 PM]
27
06/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Drew Hansen for Appellant City of New Britain, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation, Yale University and Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., in case 17-1915, [26], ADDED.[2063085] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/21/2017 11:54 AM]
28
06/27/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of New Britain, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University, FILED. Service date 06/27/2017 by CM/ECF. [2067383] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/27/2017 04:28 PM]
29
06/27/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Yale University and Vistra Energy Corporation, FILED. Service date 06/27/2017 by CM/ECF. [2067441] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/27/2017 04:51 PM]
30
06/28/2017
ATTORNEY, Nathaniel Christian Giddings for Appellant City of New Britain, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University, in case 17-1915, [28], ADDED.[2067602] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/28/2017 09:04 AM]
31
06/28/2017
ATTORNEY, Hilary Kathleen Scherrer forAppellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Yale University and Vistra Energy Corporation, in case 17-1915, [29], ADDED.[2067605] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/28/2017 09:05 AM]
32
06/29/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 06/29/2017 by CM/ECF.[2069004] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/29/2017 11:45 AM]
33
06/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 06/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2069013] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/29/2017 11:50 AM]
34
06/29/2017
ATTORNEY, Aidan Synnott for Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, in case 17-1915, [33], ADDED.[2069152] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/29/2017 01:51 PM]
35
06/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University, FILED. Service date 06/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2069560] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/29/2017 05:53 PM]
36
06/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse International and Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., FILED. Service date 06/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2069570] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/29/2017 06:46 PM]
37
06/29/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 06/29/2017 by CM/ECF.[2069582] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/29/2017 10:07 PM]
38
06/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 06/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2069583] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/29/2017 10:12 PM]
39
06/30/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 06/30/2017 by CM/ECF.[2069820] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/30/2017 10:31 AM]
40
06/30/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 06/30/2017 by CM/ECF. [2069844] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/30/2017 10:43 AM]
41
06/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Barry Barnett for Appellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University, in case 17-1915, [35], ADDED.[2069967] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/30/2017 11:48 AM]
42
06/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Joel Kurtzberg, [36], in place of attorney Elai Katz, SUBSTITUTED.[2069975] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/30/2017 11:51 AM]
43
06/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Daryl Libow for Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., in case 17-1915, [38], ADDED.[2069981] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/30/2017 11:54 AM]
44
06/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Thomas Andrew Paskowitz for Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, in case 17-1915, [40], ADDED.[2069989] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/30/2017 11:56 AM]
45
06/30/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC and HSBC Holdings PLC, FILED. Service date 06/30/2017 by CM/ECF.[2070364] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/30/2017 03:35 PM]
46
06/30/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc, FILED. Service date 06/30/2017 by CM/ECF.[2070402] [17-1915] [Entered: 06/30/2017 04:08 PM]
47
07/03/2017
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University, informing Court of proposed due date 08/25/2017, RECEIVED. Service date 07/03/2017 by CM/ECF.[2070519] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/03/2017 12:18 PM]
48
07/03/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/03/2017 by CM/ECF. [2070538] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/03/2017 02:42 PM]
49
07/03/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/03/2017 by CM/ECF. [2070539] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/03/2017 02:44 PM]
50
07/03/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 07/03/2017 by CM/ECF.[2070550] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/03/2017 04:56 PM]
51
07/05/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [48], on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED.[2070655] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 09:16 AM]
52
07/05/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [49], on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED.[2070667] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 09:22 AM]
53
07/05/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/05/2017 by CM/ECF. [2070902] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 11:21 AM]
54
07/05/2017
ATTORNEY, Arthur Joseph Burke, [53], in place of attorney Robert Frank Wise, Jr., SUBSTITUTED.[2070916] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 11:26 AM]
55
07/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 07/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2070983] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 11:59 AM]
56
07/05/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/05/2017 by CM/ECF. [2071045] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 12:32 PM]
57
07/05/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/05/2017 by CM/ECF. [2071051] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 12:37 PM]
58
07/05/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/05/2017 by CM/ECF. [2071056] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 12:42 PM]
60
07/05/2017
ATTORNEY, Steven Wolowitz, [56], in place of attorney Henninger S. Bullock, SUBSTITUTED.[2071165] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 02:33 PM]
61
07/05/2017
ATTORNEY, Henninger S. Bullock for Appellee Societe Generale S.A., in case 17-1915, [57], ADDED.[2071168] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 02:35 PM]
62
07/05/2017
ATTORNEY, Andrew Calica for Appellee Societe Generale S.A., in case 17-1915, [58], ADDED.[2071171] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 02:36 PM]
63
07/05/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [56], on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED.[2071176] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 02:37 PM]
64
07/05/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [52], [58], on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED.[2071177] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 02:37 PM]
65
07/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2071198] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 02:52 PM]
66
07/05/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. and Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 07/05/2017 by CM/ECF. [2071429] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 05:27 PM]
67
07/05/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., FILED. Service date 07/05/2017 by CM/ECF. [2071431] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 05:30 PM]
68
07/05/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 07/05/2017 by CM/ECF. [2071432] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 05:32 PM]
69
07/05/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 07/05/2017 by CM/ECF. [2071433] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 05:34 PM]
70
07/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2071465] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 09:30 PM]
71
07/05/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/05/2017 by CM/ECF. [2071466] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 09:36 PM]
72
07/05/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/05/2017 by CM/ECF. [2071467] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 09:39 PM]
73
07/05/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/05/2017 by CM/ECF. [2071468] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 09:42 PM]
74
07/05/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/05/2017 by CM/ECF. [2071469] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 09:45 PM]
75
07/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2071470] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/05/2017 10:20 PM]
76
07/06/2017
ATTORNEY, Herbert Scott Washer for Appellee Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. and Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-1915, [66], ADDED.[2071566] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/06/2017 09:06 AM]
77
07/06/2017
ATTORNEY, Elai Katz for Appellee Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., in case 17-1915, [67], ADDED.[2071571] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/06/2017 09:09 AM]
78
07/06/2017
ATTORNEY, Jason M. Hall for Appellee Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse International, in case 17-1915, [68], ADDED.[2071713] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/06/2017 10:13 AM]
79
07/06/2017
ATTORNEY, Adam Mintz for Appellee Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse InternationalG, in case 17-1915, [69], ADDED.[2071723] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/06/2017 10:15 AM]
81
07/06/2017
ATTORNEY, Paul C. Gluckow for Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-1915, [71], ADDED.[2071847] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/06/2017 11:11 AM]
82
07/06/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan C. Turner for Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-1915, [72], ADDED.[2071853] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/06/2017 11:13 AM]
83
07/06/2017
ATTORNEY, Abram Ellis for Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-1915, [73], ADDED.[2071859] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/06/2017 11:15 AM]
84
07/06/2017
ATTORNEY, Alexander Nuo Li for Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-1915, [74], ADDED.[2071865] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/06/2017 11:16 AM]
85
07/06/2017
NOTICE, to Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays PLC, Citizens Bank of Massachusetts, Cooperative Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., UBS AG, WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG and WestLB AG, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2072251] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/06/2017 02:34 PM]
86
07/07/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University, listing parties to be removed from the caption as Appellees, RECEIVED. Service date 07/07/2017 by CM/ECF.[2073912] [17-1915]--[Edited 07/10/2017 by HT] [Entered: 07/07/2017 05:39 PM]
87
07/07/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., requesting changes in attorney representation status and changes in Appellee designations, RECEIVED. Service date 07/07/2017 by CM/ECF.[2073940] [17-1915]--[Edited 07/10/2017 by HT] [Entered: 07/07/2017 06:24 PM]
88
07/10/2017
CAPTION, removing parties per Appellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University's, letter, [86], AMENDED.[2074251] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/10/2017 10:26 AM]
89
07/10/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 07/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2074451] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/10/2017 11:44 AM]
90
07/10/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan M. Unger for Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, in case 17-1915, [89], ADDED.[2074590] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/10/2017 01:20 PM]
91
07/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperative Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 07/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2076301] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/11/2017 07:40 PM]
92
07/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperative Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 07/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2076302] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/11/2017 07:44 PM]
93
07/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperative Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 07/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2076304] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/11/2017 07:47 PM]
94
07/12/2017
ATTORNEY, David R. Gelfand, [91], in place of attorney Arthur Joseph Burke, SUBSTITUTED.[2076707] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/12/2017 11:11 AM]
95
07/12/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Charles Hora for Appellee Cooperative Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-1915, [92], ADDED.[2076712] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/12/2017 11:12 AM]
96
07/12/2017
ATTORNEY, Mark D. Villaverde for Appellee Cooperative Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-1915, [93], ADDED.[2076717] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/12/2017 11:13 AM]
97
07/12/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cooperative Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 07/12/2017 by CM/ECF.[2077444] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/12/2017 05:35 PM]
98
07/21/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc and HBOS plc, FILED. Service date 07/21/2017 by CM/ECF. [2083427] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/21/2017 09:25 AM]
99
07/21/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc and HBOS plc, FILED. Service date 07/21/2017 by CM/ECF. [2083430] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/21/2017 09:27 AM]
100
07/21/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG and WestLB AG, FILED. Service date 07/21/2017 by CM/ECF.[2083768] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/21/2017 02:01 PM]
101
07/24/2017
ATTORNEY, Lisa J Fried for Appellee HBOS plc & Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1915, [98], ADDED.[2084264] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/24/2017 10:14 AM]
102
07/24/2017
ATTORNEY, Benjamin Fleming for Appellee HBOS plc & Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-1915, [99], ADDED.[2084267] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/24/2017 10:16 AM]
103
07/24/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 07/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2085010] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/24/2017 07:12 PM]
104
07/24/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 07/24/2017 by CM/ECF. [2085012] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/24/2017 07:18 PM]
105
07/24/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 07/24/2017 by CM/ECF. [2085014] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/24/2017 07:25 PM]
106
07/25/2017
ATTORNEY, Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-1915, [104], ADDED.[2085183] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/25/2017 09:45 AM]
107
07/25/2017
ATTORNEY, Eric Jonathan Stock for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-1915, [105], ADDED.[2085186] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/25/2017 09:47 AM]
108
07/25/2017
CAPTION, removing JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., per [70], and Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., per [75], AMENDED.[2085213] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/25/2017 10:02 AM]
109
07/25/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, City of New Britain, Vistra Energy Corporation, Yale University and Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/25/2017 by CM/ECF. [2085432] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/25/2017 11:30 AM]
110
07/25/2017
ATTORNEY, Geng Chen for Appellant Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, City of New Britain, Vistra Energy Corporation, Yale University and Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., in case 17-1915, [109], ADDED.[2085906] [17-1915] [Entered: 07/25/2017 04:40 PM]
112
08/02/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, City of New Britain, Vistra Energy Corporation, Yale University and Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/02/2017 by CM/ECF. [2091719] [17-1915] [Entered: 08/02/2017 11:51 AM]
113
08/02/2017
ATTORNEY, Michael David Hausfeld for Appellants Vistra Energy Corporation, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Yale University and Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, in case 17-1915, [112], ADDED.[2091757] [17-1915] [Entered: 08/02/2017 12:03 PM]
116
08/02/2017
NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2092323] [17-1915] [Entered: 08/02/2017 04:58 PM]
117
08/10/2017
MOTION, to consolidate appeals, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University, FILED. Service date 08/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2097630] [17-1915] [Entered: 08/10/2017 12:16 PM]
120
08/23/2017
MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant City of New Britain, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Vistra Energy Corporation and Yale University, FILED. Service date 08/23/2017 by CM/ECF. [2108944] [17-1915] [Entered: 08/23/2017 11:14 PM]
129
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The County of Mendocino, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority and The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority in 17-2413, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116900] [17-2413, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:29 PM]
130
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant City of Houston in 17-2376, 17-1569, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116903] [17-2376, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:32 PM]
131
09/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, in case 17-1989, [2121285-2], ADDED.[2121303] [17-1989, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/11/2017 02:07 PM]
132
09/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 09/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2121314] [17-1915] [Entered: 09/11/2017 02:13 PM]
133
09/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-1569 Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-1915, [132], ADDED.[2121404] [17-1915, 17-1569] [Entered: 09/11/2017 02:55 PM]
134
09/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2413, [2121293-2], ADDED.[2121763] [17-2413, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 09/11/2017 04:46 PM]
135
09/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citi Swapco Inc. and Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. in 17-1569, Appellee Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A. in 17-1915, Appellee Citigroup Inc. in 17-2056, Appellee Citigroup, Inc. and Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. in 17-2343, Appellee Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. in 17-2347, Appellee Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. and Citigroup Funding, Inc. in 17-2360, Appellee Citibank, N.A. in 17-2376, Citigroup Global Markets Ltd. in 17-2381, Appellee Citigroup, Inc., Citi Swapco Inc. and Citigroup Financial Products Inc. in 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 09/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2121843] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/11/2017 06:09 PM]
136
09/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan M. Wiseman for Appellees Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A., in case 17-1915, [135], ADDED.[2124501] [17-1915] [Entered: 09/14/2017 12:11 PM]
137
09/14/2017
NOTE: See lead case, 17-1569, containing complete set of docket entries.[2124506] [17-1915] [Entered: 09/14/2017 12:12 PM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.