In Re: Libor-Based Financial
Court Docket Sheet

2nd Circuit Court of Appeals

2017-02056 (ca2)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2082480] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 05:31 PM]

Case 17-2056, Document 111, 09/11/2017, 2121305, Page1 of 1 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR SUBSTITUTE, ADDITIONAL, OR AMICUS COUNSEL Short Title: In re LIBOR-Based Financial Instruments Antitrust Litigation _____ Docket No.: 17-2056 ________ Substitute, Additional, or Amicus Counsel’s Contact Information is as follows: Name: Jonathan Ohring Firm: Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP Address: 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY 10005 Telephone: 212-530-5147 ___________________________ Fax: 212-822-5147 E-mail: JOhring@milbank.com Appearance for: Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A./Defendant-Appellee (party/designation) Select One: G Substitute counsel (replacing lead counsel:) (name/firm) G Substitute counsel (replacing other counsel: _______) (name/firm) G Additional counsel (co-counsel with: David R. Gelfand/Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP ✔) (name/firm) G Amicus (in support of:) (party/designation) CERTIFICATION I certify that: ✔ G I am admitted to practice in this Court and, if required by Interim Local Rule 46.1(a)(2), have renewed my admission on OR G I applied for admission on. Signature of Counsel:/s/Jonathan Ohring Type or Print Name: Jonathan Ohring

ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney David E. Kovel, Esq. for Appellant 303030 Trading LLC, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, Gary Francis, FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd, FTC Futures Fund SICAV, Nathaniel Haynes and Metzler Investment GmbH in 17-2056, Attorney David E. Kovel, Esq. for Appellant FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd, Nathaniel Haynes, FTC Futures Fund SICAV, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, 303030 Trading LLC, Metzler Investment GmbH and Gary Francis in 17-1569, FILED. Service date 02/27/2018 by CM/ECF. [2245248] [17-2056, 17-1569] [Entered: 02/27/2018 03:17 PM]

Case 17-2056, Document 270, 02/27/2018, 2245248, Page1 of 2 UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE SECOND CIRCUIT ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT (Local Rule 34.1(a)) TO REQUEST ORAL ARGUMENT, FILL OUT THIS FORM AND FILE IT WITH THE CLERK WITHIN 14 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE LAST APPELLEE BRIEF. IF THIS FORM IS NOT TIMELY FILED, YOU WILL NOT BE PERMITTED TO ARGUE IN PERSON. Short Title of Case: In re Libor-Based Financial Instruments Docket No.: 17-1569 et al. Name of Party: See Attachment A Status of Party (e.g., appellant, cross-appellee, etc.): Plaintiffs-Appellants Check one of the three options below: ✔ I want oral argument. An attorney whose preference depends on whether other attorneys will argue should consider conferring before I want oral argument only if requesting argument. After the appeal has been at least one other party does. scheduled for oral argument, a motion by counsel to forgo oral argument, even on consent, may be denied. I do not want oral argument. If no party wants oral argument, the case will be decided on the basis of the written briefs. If you want oral argument, you must appear in Court on the date set by the Court for oral argument. The Court may determ ine to decide a case without oral argument even if the parties request it. If you want oral argument, state the name of the person who will argue: Name: David E. Kovel (An attorney must be admitted to practice before the Court in accordance with Local Rule 46.1.) If you want oral argument, list any dates (including religious holidays), that fall in the interval from 6 to 20 weeks after the due date of this form, that the person who will argue is not available to appear in Court: 3/21/18 through 3/31/18 ANYONE WHO WANTS TO ARGUE MUST UPDATE THE COURT IN WRITING OF ANY CHANGE IN AVAILABILITY. THE COURT MAY CONSIDER A FAILURE TO UPDATE ABOUT AVAILABILITY WHEN DECIDING A MOTION TO POSTPONE A SET ARGUMENT DATE. Filed by: Print Name: David E. Kovel Date: 2/27/18 Signature: /s/ David E. Kovel (Revised December 2011) Case 17-2056, Document 270, 02/27/2018, 2245248, Page2 of 2 ATTACHMENT A Metzler Investment GmbH, FTC Futures Fund SICAV, and FTC Futures Fund PCC LTD., Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, 303030 Trading LLC, Gary Francis and Nathaniel Haynes

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/28/2017
NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant 303030 Trading LLC, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd, FTC Futures Fund SICAV, Gary Francis, Nathaniel Haynes and Metzler Investment GmbH, FILED. [2070838] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/05/2017 10:51 AM]
2
06/28/2017
PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant 303030 Trading LLC, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd, FTC Futures Fund SICAV, Gary Francis, Nathaniel Haynes and Metzler Investment GmbH, district court receipt # 0208-13838384, FILED.[2070841] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/05/2017 10:53 AM]
3
06/28/2017
DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/20/2016, RECEIVED.[2070842] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/05/2017 10:54 AM]
4
06/28/2017
DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/26/2017, RECEIVED.[2070843] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/05/2017 10:54 AM]
5
06/28/2017
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2070844] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/05/2017 10:55 AM]
12
07/12/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 07/12/2017 by CM/ECF.[2077029] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/12/2017 02:23 PM]
13
07/12/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 07/12/2017 by CM/ECF. [2077038] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/12/2017 02:26 PM]
14
07/12/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 07/12/2017 by CM/ECF.[2077117] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/12/2017 03:09 PM]
15
07/12/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 07/12/2017 by CM/ECF. [2077129] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/12/2017 03:13 PM]
16
07/12/2017
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant 303030 Trading LLC, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, Gary Francis, FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd, FTC Futures Fund SICAV, Nathaniel Haynes and Metzler Investment GmbH, FILED. Service date 07/12/2017 by CM/ECF.[2077435] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/12/2017 05:27 PM]
17
07/12/2017
FORM D, on behalf of Appellant 303030 Trading LLC, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, Gary Francis, FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd, FTC Futures Fund SICAV, Nathaniel Haynes and Metzler Investment GmbH, FILED. Service date 07/12/2017 by CM/ECF.[2077439] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/12/2017 05:31 PM]
18
07/13/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 07/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2077615] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/13/2017 09:26 AM]
19
07/13/2017
ATTORNEY, Aidan Synnott for Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, in case 17-2056, [13], ADDED.[2077749] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/13/2017 10:21 AM]
20
07/13/2017
ATTORNEY, Daryl Libow for Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., in case 17-2056, [15], ADDED.[2077752] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/13/2017 10:24 AM]
24
07/13/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 07/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2078403] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/13/2017 03:26 PM]
25
07/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG and -- Credit Suisse Group, NA and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FILED. Service date 07/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2080256] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/17/2017 03:07 PM]
26
07/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 07/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2080469] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/17/2017 06:36 PM]
27
07/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 07/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2080470] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/17/2017 06:40 PM]
28
07/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 07/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2080471] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/17/2017 06:42 PM]
29
07/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 07/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2080493] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/17/2017 09:20 PM]
30
07/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan M. Unger for Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, in case 17-2056, [27], ADDED.[2080689] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/18/2017 10:31 AM]
31
07/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Thomas Andrew Paskowitz for Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, in case 17-2056, [28], ADDED.[2080695] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/18/2017 10:32 AM]
32
07/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2081428] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/18/2017 04:52 PM]
33
07/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 07/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2081508] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/18/2017 09:11 PM]
34
07/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2081914] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 11:29 AM]
35
07/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2081932] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 11:36 AM]
36
07/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2081943] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 11:41 AM]
37
07/19/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant 303030 Trading LLC, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, Gary Francis, FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd, FTC Futures Fund SICAV, Nathaniel Haynes and Metzler Investment GmbH, FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF.[2081975] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 11:53 AM]
38
07/19/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [25], on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED.[2082162] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 02:33 PM]
39
07/19/2017
ATTORNEY, Arthur Joseph Burke, [32], in place of attorney Rober Frank Wise, Jr., SUBSTITUTED.[2082165] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 02:37 PM]
40
07/19/2017
ATTORNEY, Christian T. Kemnitz for Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, in case 17-2056, [33], ADDED.[2082166] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 02:38 PM]
41
07/19/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [34], on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED.[2082175] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 02:42 PM]
42
07/19/2017
ATTORNEY, Andrew Calica for Appellee Societe Generale S.A., in case 17-2056, [36], ADDED.[2082182] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 02:46 PM]
43
07/19/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [41], [36], on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED.[2082185] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 02:47 PM]
44
07/19/2017
ATTORNEY, Henninger S. Bullock for Appellee Societe Generale S.A., in case 17-2056, [35], ADDED.[2082188] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 02:48 PM]
45
07/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2082243] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 03:11 PM]
46
07/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2082250] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 03:15 PM]
47
07/19/2017
ATTORNEY, Steven Wolowitz, [45], in place of attorney Henninger S. Bullock, SUBSTITUTED.[2082284] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 03:32 PM]
48
07/19/2017
ATTORNEY, Joel Kurtzberg, [46], in place of attorney Herbert Scott Washer, SUBSTITUTED.[2082287] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 03:34 PM]
49
07/19/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [38], [46], on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED.[2082291] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 03:35 PM]
50
07/19/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF.[2082292] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 03:35 PM]
51
07/19/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF.[2082376] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 04:12 PM]
52
07/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2082389] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 04:18 PM]
53
07/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2082397] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 04:21 PM]
54
07/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2082404] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 04:23 PM]
55
07/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2082412] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 04:26 PM]
56
07/19/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF.[2082476] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 05:05 PM]
57
07/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2082480] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 05:31 PM]
58
07/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2082481] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 05:32 PM]
59
07/19/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., RECEIVED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF.[2082494] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 06:08 PM]
60
07/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2082499] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 06:50 PM]
61
07/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2082501] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 07:11 PM]
62
07/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2082502] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 07:17 PM]
63
07/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2082503] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 07:21 PM]
64
07/19/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF.[2082504] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 07:29 PM]
65
07/19/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 07/19/2017 by CM/ECF.[2082511] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/19/2017 11:47 PM]
66
07/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Herbert Scott Washer for Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2056, [52], ADDED.[2082577] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/20/2017 09:29 AM]
67
07/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Jason M. Hall for Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2056, [53], ADDED.[2082585] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/20/2017 09:31 AM]
68
07/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Elai Katz for Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2056, [54], ADDED.[2082589] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/20/2017 09:33 AM]
69
07/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Adam Mintz for Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2056, [55], ADDED.[2082591] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/20/2017 09:34 AM]
70
07/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Charles Hora for Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., in case 17-2056, [57], ADDED.[2082706] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/20/2017 10:40 AM]
71
07/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Mark D. Villaverde for Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., in case 17-2056, [58], ADDED.[2082710] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/20/2017 10:42 AM]
72
07/20/2017
CAPTION, to comply with Appellant's suggestions on, [37], AMENDED.[2082748] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/20/2017 11:15 AM]
73
07/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Paul C. Gluckow for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2056, [60], ADDED.[2082754] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/20/2017 11:19 AM]
74
07/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan C. Turner for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2056, [61], ADDED.[2082759] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/20/2017 11:22 AM]
75
07/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Abram Ellis for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2056, [62], ADDED.[2082765] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/20/2017 11:24 AM]
76
07/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Alexander Nuo Li for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2056, [63], ADDED.[2082773] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/20/2017 11:25 AM]
78
07/20/2017
NOTICE, to Appellee HBOS plc, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, Lloyds Bank plc, Lloyds Banking Group plc, WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG and WestLB AG, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2083245] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/20/2017 04:19 PM]
79
07/20/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 07/20/2017 by CM/ECF. [2083318] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/20/2017 06:33 PM]
80
07/20/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 07/20/2017 by CM/ECF. [2083320] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/20/2017 06:48 PM]
81
07/21/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc, Lloyds Bank plc and HBOS plc, FILED. Service date 07/21/2017 by CM/ECF.[2083409] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/21/2017 09:15 AM]
82
07/21/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc, Lloyds Bank plc and HBOS plc, FILED. Service date 07/21/2017 by CM/ECF. [2083412] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/21/2017 09:17 AM]
83
07/21/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HBOS plc, Lloyds Banking Group plc and Lloyds Bank plc, FILED. Service date 07/21/2017 by CM/ECF. [2083420] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/21/2017 09:19 AM]
84
07/21/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG and WestLB AG, FILED. Service date 07/21/2017 by CM/ECF.[2083770] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/21/2017 02:03 PM]
85
07/24/2017
ATTORNEY, Eric Jonathan Stock for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2056, [79], ADDED.[2084162] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/24/2017 09:07 AM]
86
07/24/2017
ATTORNEY, Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2056, [80], ADDED.[2084164] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/24/2017 09:09 AM]
87
07/24/2017
ATTORNEY, Lisa J Fried for Appellee Lloyds Bank plc, HBOS plc & Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2056, [82], ADDED.[2084172] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/24/2017 09:12 AM]
88
07/24/2017
ATTORNEY, Benjamin Fleming for Appellee Lloyds Bank plc, HBOS plc & Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2056, [83], ADDED.[2084174] [17-2056] [Entered: 07/24/2017 09:14 AM]
90
08/01/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC and HSBC Holdings PLC, FILED. Service date 08/01/2017 by CM/ECF.[2090967] [17-2056] [Entered: 08/01/2017 11:42 AM]
93
08/02/2017
NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2091695] [17-2056] [Entered: 08/02/2017 11:45 AM]
97
08/10/2017
ORDER, setting Appellants' brief due date as 09/19/2017, for Appellant 303030 Trading LLC, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd, FTC Futures Fund SICAV, Gary Francis, Nathaniel Haynes and Metzler Investment GmbH failure to submit a scheduling notification, FILED.[2097468] [17-2056] [Entered: 08/10/2017 10:53 AM]
98
08/15/2017
MOTION, to consolidate appeals, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant 303030 Trading LLC, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, Gary Francis, FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd, FTC Futures Fund SICAV, Nathaniel Haynes and Metzler Investment GmbH, FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2100840] [17-2056] [Entered: 08/15/2017 10:32 AM]
108
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The County of Mendocino, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority and The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority in 17-2413, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116900] [17-2413, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:29 PM]
109
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant City of Houston in 17-2376, 17-1569, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116903] [17-2376, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:32 PM]
110
09/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, in case 17-1989, [2121285-2], ADDED.[2121303] [17-1989, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/11/2017 02:07 PM]
111
09/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 09/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2121305] [17-2056] [Entered: 09/11/2017 02:07 PM]
112
09/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., in case 17-2056, [111], ADDED.[2121409] [17-2056] [Entered: 09/11/2017 02:57 PM]
113
09/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2413, [2121293-2], ADDED.[2121763] [17-2413, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 09/11/2017 04:46 PM]
114
09/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citi Swapco Inc. and Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. in 17-1569, Appellee Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A. in 17-1915, Appellee Citigroup Inc. in 17-2056, Appellee Citigroup, Inc. and Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. in 17-2343, Appellee Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. in 17-2347, Appellee Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. and Citigroup Funding, Inc. in 17-2360, Appellee Citibank, N.A. in 17-2376, Citigroup Global Markets Ltd. in 17-2381, Appellee Citigroup, Inc., Citi Swapco Inc. and Citigroup Financial Products Inc. in 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 09/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2121843] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/11/2017 06:09 PM]
115
09/15/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan M. Wiseman for Appellee Citigroup Inc., in case 17-2056, [114], ADDED.[2125420] [17-2056] [Entered: 09/15/2017 10:18 AM]
116
09/15/2017
NOTE: See lead case, 17-1569, containing complete set of docket entries.[2125421] [17-2056] [Entered: 09/15/2017 10:19 AM]
268
02/27/2018
MOTION ORDER, granting motion for partial severance of the appeal as to Citibank, NA and Citigroup, Inc in docket number 17-1989 and remand the case to the district court for consideration of a settlement agreement [241] [241] filed by Appellant Ellen Gelboim and Linda Zacher. Appellants are directed to file a status update letter with the Court every 30 days beginning 30 days from the date of this order by DAL, FILED. [2244993][268] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/27/2018 01:17 PM]
269
02/27/2018
CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 02/27/2018, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[2244999] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 02/27/2018 01:20 PM]
270
02/27/2018
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney David E. Kovel, Esq. for Appellant 303030 Trading LLC, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, Gary Francis, FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd, FTC Futures Fund SICAV, Nathaniel Haynes and Metzler Investment GmbH in 17-2056, Attorney David E. Kovel, Esq. for Appellant FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd, Nathaniel Haynes, FTC Futures Fund SICAV, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, 303030 Trading LLC, Metzler Investment GmbH and Gary Francis in 17-1569, FILED. Service date 02/27/2018 by CM/ECF. [2245248] [17-2056, 17-1569] [Entered: 02/27/2018 03:17 PM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.