In Re: Libor-Based Financial
Court Docket Sheet

2017-02343 (ca2)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/28/2017
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, FILED. [2091359] [17-2343]--[Edited 08/02/2017 by KJW] [Entered: 08/02/2017 09:53 AM]
2
07/28/2017
The Berkshire Bank-Defendant; Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico-Defendant; Direcors Financial Group-Defendant, TERMINATED.[2091387] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/02/2017 10:01 AM]
3
07/28/2017
DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 12/20/2016, RECEIVED.[2091396] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/02/2017 10:04 AM]
4
07/28/2017
DISTRICT COURT ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT, dated 07/05/2017, RECEIVED.[2091397] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/02/2017 10:05 AM]
5
07/28/2017
DISTRICT COURT CORRECTED ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT, dated 07/19/2017, RECEIVED.[2091405] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/02/2017 10:07 AM]
8
07/28/2017
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2091637] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/02/2017 11:19 AM]
10
08/02/2017
NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Alan J. Brudner, Esq. for Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, David Hugh Stern, Esq. for Appellee Portigon AG and Melanie Westover Yanez, Esq. for Appellee Cooperative Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2092233] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/02/2017 04:02 PM]
11
08/03/2017
PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, district court receipt # 0208-13974788, FILED.[2093215] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/03/2017 03:36 PM]
13
08/08/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, FILED. Service date 08/08/2017 by CM/ECF.[2096312] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/08/2017 10:02 PM]
14
08/08/2017
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, FILED. Service date 08/08/2017 by CM/ECF.[2096313] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/08/2017 10:09 PM]
15
08/08/2017
FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, FILED. Service date 08/08/2017 by CM/ECF.[2096314] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/08/2017 10:10 PM]
16
08/08/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, FILED. Service date 08/08/2017 by CM/ECF. [2096320] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/08/2017 10:31 PM]
17
08/08/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, FILED. Service date 08/08/2017 by CM/ECF. [2096321] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/08/2017 10:33 PM]
18
08/10/2017
MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant Bay Area Toll Authority, FILED. Service date 08/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2097386] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/10/2017 09:59 AM]
19
08/10/2017
CAPTION, changes made to appellant parties names, AMENDED.[2097486] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/10/2017 11:02 AM]
20
08/10/2017
ATTORNEY, Brendan P. Glackin for Bay Area Toll Authority, in case 17-2343, [16], ADDED.[2097493] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/10/2017 11:05 AM]
21
08/10/2017
ATTORNEY, Michael J. Miarmi for Bay Area Toll Authority, in case 17-2343, [17], ADDED.[2097501] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/10/2017 11:06 AM]
23
08/10/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., FILED. Service date 08/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2098047] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/10/2017 04:04 PM]
24
08/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Arthur J. Burke, [23], in place of attorney Peter John Davis, SUBSTITUTED.[2098242] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/11/2017 08:33 AM]
26
08/11/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. and Citigroup, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/11/2017 by CM/ECF.[2098632] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/11/2017 12:21 PM]
27
08/11/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, FILED. Service date 08/11/2017 by CM/ECF.[2098726] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/11/2017 01:46 PM]
29
08/11/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 08/11/2017 by CM/ECF.[2099046] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/11/2017 04:14 PM]
30
08/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 08/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2099052] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/11/2017 04:16 PM]
31
08/11/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee BBA Enterprises, Ltd., BBA Libor, Ltd. and British Bankers' Association, FILED. Service date 08/11/2017 by CM/ECF.[2099170] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/11/2017 05:54 PM]
32
08/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Daryl Libow for Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., in case 17-2343, [30], ADDED.[2099212] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/14/2017 08:08 AM]
36
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101243] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/15/2017 02:53 PM]
37
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC and HSBC Holdings PLC, FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101289] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/15/2017 03:17 PM]
38
08/15/2017
ATTORNEY, David Sapir Lesser, [36], in place of attorney Faser Hunter, SUBSTITUTED.[2101302] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/15/2017 03:20 PM]
39
08/15/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel [37], on behalf of Appellees HSBC Bank PLC and HSBC Holdings PLC, FILED.[2101417] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/15/2017 04:13 PM]
40
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101588] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/15/2017 06:49 PM]
41
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Joel Kurtzberg, [40], in place of attorney Lauren Perlgut, SUBSTITUTED.[2101666] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 08:42 AM]
42
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2101711] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 09:09 AM]
43
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101719] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 09:14 AM]
44
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101727] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 09:17 AM]
45
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Paul S. Mishkin for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., in case 17-2343, [43], ADDED.[2101731] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 09:20 AM]
46
08/16/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP be removed as counsel for Credit Suisse Group AG, Royal Bank of Canada, Portigon AG and WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, RECEIVED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2101732] [17-2343]--[Edited 08/16/2017 by TT] [Entered: 08/16/2017 09:20 AM]
47
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Adam Gabor Mehes for Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., in case 17-2343, [44], ADDED.[2101737] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 09:22 AM]
49
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Frank Wise, Jr. for Credit Suisse Group AG, TERMINATED.[2101954] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:06 AM]
50
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Arthur Joseph Burke, for Royal Bank of Canada, TERMINATED.[2101960] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:08 AM]
51
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2101961] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:09 AM]
52
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Frank Wise, Jr. for Portigon AG, TERMINATED.[2101967] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:13 AM]
53
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Arthur Joseph Burke, for WestDeutsche ImmobilieBank AG, TERMINATED.[2101978] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:16 AM]
54
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102447] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 04:17 PM]
55
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102610] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:57 PM]
56
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group PLC, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102619] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 07:19 PM]
57
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group PLC and HBOS plc, FILED. Service date 08/16/2016 by CM/ECF. [2102621] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 07:26 PM]
58
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group PLC and HBOS plc, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102622] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 07:29 PM]
59
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102627] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 09:58 PM]
60
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102629] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 10:05 PM]
61
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102637] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 10:50 PM]
62
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102639] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:00 PM]
63
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102640] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:02 PM]
64
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association and JPMorgan Chase & Co., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102646] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:18 PM]
65
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102653] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:34 PM]
66
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102656] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:43 PM]
67
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102659] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:52 PM]
68
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC and HSBC Holdings PLC, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102801] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/17/2017 09:48 AM]
69
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Marc J. Gottridge, [57], in place of attorney Lisa J. Fried, SUBSTITUTED.[2103263] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/17/2017 01:35 PM]
70
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Benjamin Fleming for Appellees HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group PLC, in case 17-2343, [58], ADDED.[2103270] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/17/2017 01:38 PM]
71
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Portigon AG and WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103335] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/17/2017 02:27 PM]
72
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Moses Silverman for Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, in case 17-2343, [60], ADDED.[2103421] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/17/2017 03:05 PM]
73
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Thomas Smith, [62], in place of attorney Alan J. Brudner, SUBSTITUTED.[2103580] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/17/2017 04:06 PM]
74
08/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2103585] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/17/2017 04:08 PM]
75
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Thomas C. Rice for Appellees JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association and JPMorgan Chase & Co., in case 17-2343, [63], ADDED.[2103587] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/17/2017 04:08 PM]
76
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103598] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/17/2017 04:13 PM]
77
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103612] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/17/2017 04:17 PM]
78
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Mary Beth Forshaw for Appellees JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association and JPMorgan Chase & Co., in case 17-2343, [64], ADDED.[2103651] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/17/2017 04:27 PM]
79
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan C. Turner for Appellees JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association and JPMorgan Chase & Co., in case 17-2343, [65], ADDED.[2103697] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/17/2017 04:42 PM]
80
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Abram Ellis for Appellees JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association and JPMorgan Chase & Co., in case 17-2343, [66], ADDED.[2103740] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/17/2017 04:52 PM]
81
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104088] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/18/2017 10:47 AM]
82
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Christopher M. Paparella, [71], in place of attorney David Hugh Stern, SUBSTITUTED.[2104145] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:13 AM]
83
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Charles Hora for Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2343, [76], ADDED.[2104225] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:44 AM]
84
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Mark D. Villaverde for Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2343, [77], ADDED.[2104231] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:47 AM]
85
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104588] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:38 PM]
86
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104638] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:58 PM]
87
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Gregory T. Casamento [68], in place of attorney Edwin R. DeYoung, SUBSTITUTED.[2104651] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/18/2017 03:01 PM]
88
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104694] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/18/2017 03:22 PM]
89
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Alexander Nuo Li for Appellees JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association and JPMorgan Chase & Co., in case 17-2343, [67], ADDED.[2104800] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/18/2017 04:15 PM]
90
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Elai Katz for Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2343, [85], ADDED.[2105061] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/20/2017 02:45 PM]
91
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Adam Mintz for Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2343, [88], ADDED.[2105912] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/21/2017 01:12 PM]
92
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Jason M. Hall for Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2343, [86], ADDED.[2105925] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/21/2017 01:22 PM]
93
08/22/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL [68], on behalf of Appellees HSBC Bank PLC and HSBC Holdings PLC, FILED.[2106666] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/22/2017 09:27 AM]
95
08/22/2017
NOTICE, to Appellee UBS AG, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2106715] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/22/2017 09:44 AM]
98
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107427] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/22/2017 02:13 PM]
99
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107818] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/22/2017 05:02 PM]
100
08/23/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/23/2017 by CM/ECF. [2108936] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/23/2017 09:30 PM]
108
08/25/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [100], on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED.[2109924] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/25/2017 09:25 AM]
109
08/25/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/25/2017 by CM/ECF. [2109963] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/25/2017 09:40 AM]
110
08/25/2017
ATTORNEY, Christian T. Kemnitz for Royal Bank of Canada, in case 17-2343, [109], ADDED.[2110667] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/25/2017 05:16 PM]
111
08/25/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [108], [109], on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED.[2110668] [17-2343] [Entered: 08/25/2017 05:18 PM]
112
08/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG in 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 08/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2113038] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 08/29/2017 11:35 PM]
113
08/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG in 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2413, 17-2360, FILED. Service date 08/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2113041] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2413, 17-2360] [Entered: 08/29/2017 11:58 PM]
114
08/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2347 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2413 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2352 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2376 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2343 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2360, [113], ADDED.[2113689] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2413] [Entered: 08/30/2017 01:24 PM]
115
08/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2347 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2413 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2352 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2351 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2376 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2343 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2381 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2383, [112], ADDED.[2114140] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 08/30/2017 04:34 PM]
116
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The County of Mendocino, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority and The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority in 17-2413, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116900] [17-2413, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:29 PM]
117
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant City of Houston in 17-2376, 17-1569, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116903] [17-2376, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:32 PM]
118
09/07/2017
NOTE: See lead case, 17-1569, containing complete set of docket entries.[2118656] [17-2343] [Entered: 09/07/2017 09:38 AM]
121
09/08/2017
NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2120046] [17-2343, 17-1569] [Entered: 09/08/2017 11:31 AM]
122
09/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 09/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2121279] [17-2343] [Entered: 09/11/2017 01:51 PM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.