In Re: Libor-Based Financial
Court Docket Sheet

2017-02347 (ca2)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/31/2017
NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant City of Philadelphia and Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority, FILED. [2091586] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/02/2017 11:07 AM]
2
07/31/2017
DISTRICT COURT ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT, dated 07/05/2017, RECEIVED.[2091594] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/02/2017 11:10 AM]
3
07/31/2017
DISTRICT COURT CORRECTED ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT, dated 07/19/2017, RECEIVED.[2091603] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/02/2017 11:12 AM]
4
07/31/2017
PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant City of Philadelphia and Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority, district court receipt # 0208-13956091, FILED.[2091616] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/02/2017 11:14 AM]
7
07/31/2017
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2091641] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/02/2017 11:22 AM]
10
08/11/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, FILED. Service date 08/11/2017 by CM/ECF.[2098754] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/11/2017 02:04 PM]
11
08/11/2017
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant City of Philadelphia and Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority, FILED. Service date 08/11/2017 by CM/ECF.[2099006] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/11/2017 04:00 PM]
12
08/11/2017
FORM D, on behalf of Appellant City of Philadelphia and Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority, FILED. Service date 08/11/2017 by CM/ECF.[2099010] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/11/2017 04:02 PM]
16
08/14/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant City of Philadelphia and Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority, FILED. Service date 08/14/2017 by CM/ECF.[2099986] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/14/2017 02:10 PM]
17
08/14/2017
MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant City of Philadelphia and Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority, FILED. Service date 08/14/2017 by CM/ECF. [2100113] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/14/2017 03:09 PM]
19
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2100678] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/15/2017 09:20 AM]
20
08/15/2017
ATTORNEY, Arthur J. Burke [19], in place of attorney Peter John Davis, SUBSTITUTED.[2101117] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/15/2017 01:18 PM]
21
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101257] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/15/2017 02:59 PM]
22
08/15/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [21], on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED.[2101400] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/15/2017 04:05 PM]
23
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101427] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/15/2017 04:20 PM]
24
08/15/2017
ATTORNEY, David Sapir Lesser, [23], in place of attorney Fraser Hunter, SUBSTITUTED.[2101441] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/15/2017 04:26 PM]
25
08/15/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL [23], on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED.[2101444] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/15/2017 04:27 PM]
26
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101589] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/15/2017 06:53 PM]
27
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Joel Kurtzberg, [26], in place of attorney Elai Katz, SUBSTITUTED.[2101673] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/16/2017 08:44 AM]
28
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2101752] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/16/2017 09:30 AM]
29
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101758] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/16/2017 09:33 AM]
30
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101760] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/16/2017 09:35 AM]
32
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Paul S. Mishkin for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., in case 17-2347, [29], ADDED.[2102003] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:27 AM]
33
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Adam Gabor Mehes for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., in case 17-2347, [30], ADDED.[2102023] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:34 AM]
34
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102446] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/16/2017 04:15 PM]
35
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Citigroup, Inc., Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102572] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/16/2017 05:48 PM]
36
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102613] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/16/2017 07:00 PM]
37
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102628] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/16/2017 10:01 PM]
38
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102630] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/16/2017 10:07 PM]
39
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee JP Morgan Chase & Co. and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102635] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/16/2017 10:43 PM]
40
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JP Morgan Chase & Co. and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102641] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:06 PM]
41
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JP Morgan Chase & Co. and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102648] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:21 PM]
42
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JP Morgan Chase & Co. and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102654] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:36 PM]
43
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JP Morgan Chase & Co. and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102657] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:47 PM]
44
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JP Morgan Chase & Co. and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102660] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:54 PM]
46
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Moses Silverman for Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, in case 17-2347, [38], ADDED.[2103431] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/17/2017 03:10 PM]
47
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Thomas C. Rice for Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and JP Morgan Chase & Co., in case 17-2347, [40], ADDED.[2103596] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/17/2017 04:12 PM]
48
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Mary Beth Forshaw for Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and JP Morgan Chase & Co., in case 17-2347, [41], ADDED.[2103665] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/17/2017 04:30 PM]
49
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan C. Turner for Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and JP Morgan Chase & Co., in case 17-2347, [42], ADDED.[2103701] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/17/2017 04:44 PM]
50
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Abram Ellis for Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and JP Morgan Chase & Co., in case 17-2347, [43], ADDED.[2103745] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/17/2017 04:54 PM]
51
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Alexander Nuo Li for Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and JP Morgan Chase & Co., in case 17-2347, [44], ADDED.[2103824] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/17/2017 09:45 PM]
52
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of Philadelphia and Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104494] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/18/2017 01:49 PM]
53
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of Philadelphia and Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104502] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/18/2017 01:54 PM]
54
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of Philadelphia and Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104510] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:01 PM]
55
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of Philadelphia and Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104515] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:04 PM]
56
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104571] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:29 PM]
57
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104590] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:39 PM]
58
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104646] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/18/2017 03:00 PM]
59
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104696] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/18/2017 03:24 PM]
60
08/19/2017
ATTORNEY, Daniel L. Brockett for for Appellants City of Philadelphia and Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority, in case 17-2347, [52], ADDED.[2105033] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/19/2017 03:55 PM]
61
08/19/2017
ATTORNEY, Daniel Paul Cunningham for Appellants City of Philadelphia and Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority, in case 17-2347, [53], ADDED.[2105034] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/19/2017 04:01 PM]
62
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Jeremy Andersen for Appellants City of Philadelphia and Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority, in case 17-2347, [54], ADDED.[2105040] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/20/2017 08:53 AM]
63
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Jacob J. Waldman for Appellants City of Philadelphia and Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority, in case 17-2347, [55], ADDED.[2105042] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/20/2017 09:02 AM]
64
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Herbert Scott Washer for Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2347, [56], ADDED.[2105054] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/20/2017 11:49 AM]
65
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Adam Mintz for Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2347, [59], ADDED.[2105851] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/21/2017 12:49 PM]
66
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Jason M. Hall for Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2347, [58], ADDED.[2105923] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/21/2017 01:21 PM]
67
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Elai Katz for Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2347, [57], ADDED.[2106150] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/21/2017 03:27 PM]
68
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107440] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/22/2017 02:17 PM]
69
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107881] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/22/2017 11:13 PM]
70
08/23/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/23/2017 by CM/ECF. [2108937] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/23/2017 09:32 PM]
78
08/25/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [70], on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED.[2109958] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/25/2017 09:39 AM]
79
08/25/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/25/2017 by CM/ECF. [2109970] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/25/2017 09:45 AM]
80
08/25/2017
ATTORNEY, Christian T. Kemnitz for Royal Bank of Canada, in case 17-2351, [79], ADDED.[2110013] [17-2347, 17-2351]--[Edited 08/25/2017 by RD] [Entered: 08/25/2017 10:02 AM]
81
08/25/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [78], [79], on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED.[2110018] [17-2347] [Entered: 08/25/2017 10:06 AM]
82
08/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG in 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 08/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2113038] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 08/29/2017 11:35 PM]
83
08/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG in 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2413, 17-2360, FILED. Service date 08/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2113041] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2413, 17-2360] [Entered: 08/29/2017 11:58 PM]
84
08/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2347 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2413 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2352 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2376 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2343 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2360, [83], ADDED.[2113689] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2413] [Entered: 08/30/2017 01:24 PM]
85
08/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2347 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2413 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2352 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2351 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2376 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2343 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2381 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2383, [82], ADDED.[2114140] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 08/30/2017 04:34 PM]
86
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The County of Mendocino, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority and The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority in 17-2413, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116900] [17-2413, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:29 PM]
87
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant City of Houston in 17-2376, 17-1569, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116903] [17-2376, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:32 PM]
88
09/07/2017
NOTE: See lead case, 17-1569, containing complete set of docket entries.[2118697] [17-2347] [Entered: 09/07/2017 09:57 AM]
91
09/08/2017
NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2120060] [17-2347, 17-1569, 17-2351] [Entered: 09/08/2017 11:36 AM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.