In Re: Libor-Based Financial
Court Docket Sheet

2017-02360 (ca2)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/31/2017
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Prudential Core Taxable Money Market Fund and Prudential Investment Portfolios 2, FILED. [2092652] [17-2360]--[Edited 08/03/2017 by KJW] [Entered: 08/03/2017 10:37 AM]
2
07/31/2017
DISTRICT COURT ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT, dated 07/05/2017, RECEIVED.[2092662] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/03/2017 10:41 AM]
3
07/31/2017
DISTRICT COURT CORRECTED ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT, dated 07/19/2017, RECEIVED.[2092665] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/03/2017 10:42 AM]
4
07/31/2017
PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Prudential Core Taxable Money Market Fund and Prudential Investment Portfolios 2, district court receipt # 02 08-13955653, FILED.[2092673] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/03/2017 10:44 AM]
7
07/31/2017
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2092681] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/03/2017 10:47 AM]
11
08/10/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. and Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, FILED. Service date 08/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2098057] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/10/2017 04:08 PM]
12
08/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Arthur J. Burke, [11], in place of attorney Peter John Davis, SUBSTITUTED.[2098248] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/11/2017 08:39 AM]
13
08/11/2017
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Prudential Investment Portfolios 2 and Prudential Core Taxable Money Market Fund, FILED. Service date 08/11/2017 by CM/ECF.[2099072] [17-2360]--[Edited 09/07/2017 by TT] [Entered: 08/11/2017 04:26 PM]
14
08/11/2017
FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Prudential Investment Portfolios 2 and Prudential Core Taxable Money Market Fund, FILED. Service date 08/11/2017 by CM/ECF.[2099076] [17-2360]--[Edited 09/07/2017 by TT] [Entered: 08/11/2017 04:28 PM]
17
08/14/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Prudential Investment Portfolios 2, FILED. Service date 08/14/2017 by CM/ECF.[2100003] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/14/2017 02:23 PM]
18
08/14/2017
MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant Prudential Investment Portfolios 2, FILED. Service date 08/14/2017 by CM/ECF. [2100180] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/14/2017 03:33 PM]
20
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC USA, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101319] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/15/2017 03:29 PM]
21
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101595] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/15/2017 07:20 PM]
22
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101596] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/15/2017 07:26 PM]
23
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Joel Kurtzberg, [21], in place of attorney Lauren Perlgut, SUBSTITUTED.[2101706] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/16/2017 09:07 AM]
24
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Joel Kurtzberg, [22], in place of attorney Adam Mintz, SUBSTITUTED.[2101712] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/16/2017 09:10 AM]
25
08/16/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel [20], on behalf of Appellees HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC USA, Inc., FILED.[2101716] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/16/2017 09:13 AM]
27
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102552] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/16/2017 05:20 PM]
28
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102554] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/16/2017 05:22 PM]
29
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102556] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/16/2017 05:28 PM]
30
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Banks PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102581] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/16/2017 05:59 PM]
31
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102612] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:59 PM]
32
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102644] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:13 PM]
33
08/17/2017
NEW PARTY, Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, ADDED.[2102740] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/17/2017 09:21 AM]
34
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Paul S. Mishkin for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., in case 17-2360, [28], ADDED.[2102771] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/17/2017 09:37 AM]
35
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Adam Gabor Mehes for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., in case 17-2360, [29], ADDED.[2102779] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/17/2017 09:40 AM]
36
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC USA, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102809] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/17/2017 09:51 AM]
37
08/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102833] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/17/2017 10:01 AM]
38
08/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2103339] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/17/2017 02:29 PM]
39
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103347] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/17/2017 02:34 PM]
40
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citigroup Funding, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103536] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/17/2017 03:49 PM]
41
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103540] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/17/2017 03:50 PM]
42
08/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2103804] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/17/2017 06:05 PM]
43
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103805] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/17/2017 06:14 PM]
44
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103810] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/17/2017 06:57 PM]
45
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103811] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/17/2017 07:02 PM]
46
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103813] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/17/2017 07:06 PM]
47
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103815] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/17/2017 07:08 PM]
48
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Gregory T. Casamento, [36], in place of attorney Edwin R. DeYoung, SUBSTITUTED.[2104026] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/18/2017 10:14 AM]
49
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Moses Silverman for Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, in case 17-2360, [39], ADDED.[2104156] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:16 AM]
50
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Andrew A. Ruffino for Appellees Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Citigroup Inc., Citigroup Funding, Inc., in case 17-2360, [40], ADDED.[2104200] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:34 AM]
51
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Thomas C. Rice for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, in case 17-2360, [47], ADDED.[2104237] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:49 AM]
52
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Mary Beth Forshaw for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, in case 17-2360, [46], ADDED.[2104244] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:51 AM]
53
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan C. Turner for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, in case 17-2360, [45], ADDED.[2104305] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/18/2017 12:09 PM]
54
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Abram Ellis for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, in case 17-2360, [46], ADDED.[2104308] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/18/2017 12:11 PM]
55
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Alexander Nuo Li for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, in case 17-2360, [47], ADDED.[2104314] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/18/2017 12:13 PM]
56
08/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Funding, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2104330] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/18/2017 12:20 PM]
58
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Prudential Investment Portfolios 2, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104509] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/18/2017 01:59 PM]
59
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Prudential Investment Portfolios 2, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104530] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:08 PM]
60
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Prudential Investment Portfolios 2, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104537] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:10 PM]
61
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Prudential Investment Portfolios 2, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by email. [2104544] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:15 PM]
62
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104593] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:42 PM]
63
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104654] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/18/2017 03:02 PM]
64
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104704] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/18/2017 03:26 PM]
65
08/18/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellees Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. and Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, notifying the Court Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated is not a party to the appeal and requesting removal of Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP from Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Inc., Credit Suisse AG and Royal Bank of Canada, RECEIVED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2104900] [17-2360]--[Edited 08/21/2017 by TT] [Entered: 08/18/2017 05:02 PM]
67
08/19/2017
ATTORNEY, Jason M. Hall for Appellees Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, in case 17-2360, [63], ADDED.[2105020] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/19/2017 12:44 PM]
68
08/19/2017
ATTORNEY, Daniel Paul Cunningham for Appellant Prudential Investment Portfolios 2, in case 17-2360, [58], ADDED.[2105037] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/19/2017 04:14 PM]
69
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Jacob J. Waldman for Appellant Prudential Investment Portfolios 2, in case 17-2360, [60], ADDED.[2105046] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/20/2017 09:24 AM]
70
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Steig David Olson for Appellant Prudential Investment Portfolios 2, in case 17-2360, [61], ADDED.[2105049] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/20/2017 09:37 AM]
71
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Elai Katz for Appellees Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, in case 17-2360, [62], ADDED.[2105064] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/20/2017 04:39 PM]
72
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Arthur Burke for Citibank, N.A., Robert Wise for Credit Suisse AG and Arthur Burke for Royal Bank of Canada, TERMINATED.[2105809] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/21/2017 12:30 PM]
73
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Adam Mintz for Appellees Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, in case 17-2360, [64], ADDED.[2105840] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/21/2017 12:45 PM]
74
08/21/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [32], on behalf of Appellees RBC Capital Markets LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED.[2106211] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/21/2017 03:50 PM]
75
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107883] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/22/2017 11:22 PM]
76
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UBS Securities LLC, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107890] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/22/2017 11:54 PM]
77
08/23/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, request to be removed as counsel for RBC Capital, RECEIVED. Service date 08/23/2017 by CM/ECF.[2108233] [17-2360]--[Edited 08/23/2017 by TT] [Entered: 08/23/2017 10:59 AM]
78
08/23/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert G. Houck, for RBC Capital Markets LLC, TERMINATED.[2108237] [17-2360]--[Edited 08/23/2017 by TT] [Entered: 08/23/2017 11:01 AM]
79
08/23/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/23/2017 by CM/ECF. [2108931] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/23/2017 08:38 PM]
80
08/23/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets LLC, FILED. Service date 08/23/2017 by CM/ECF. [2108932] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/23/2017 08:40 PM]
81
08/23/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/23/2017 by CM/ECF. [2108939] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/23/2017 09:35 PM]
89
08/24/2017
DOCKET ENTRY ERROR.[2109752] [17-2360]--[Edited 08/24/2017 by RD] [Entered: 08/24/2017 04:43 PM]
91
08/24/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF. [2109834] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/24/2017 08:20 PM]
92
08/25/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Thomas Smith for Royal Bank of Canada, in case 17-2360, [79], ADDED.[2109904] [17-2360, 17-2351] [Entered: 08/25/2017 09:06 AM]
93
08/25/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [80], on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets LLC, FILED.[2109908] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/25/2017 09:12 AM]
94
08/25/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets LLC, FILED. Service date 08/25/2017 by CM/ECF. [2109950] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/25/2017 09:36 AM]
95
08/25/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL [93], [94], on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets LLC, FILED.[2110001] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/25/2017 09:57 AM]
96
08/25/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Thomas Smith for RBC Capital Markets LLC, in case 17-2360, [94], ADDED.[2110004] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/25/2017 09:58 AM]
97
08/25/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/25/2017 by CM/ECF.[2110076] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/25/2017 10:40 AM]
98
08/25/2017
ATTORNEY, Christian T. Kemnitz for RBC Capital Markets LLC Royal Bank of Canada, in case 17-2360, [91], ADDED.[2110674] [17-2360] [Entered: 08/25/2017 05:27 PM]
99
08/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG in 17-2351, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, FILED. Service date 08/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2113039] [17-2351, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 08/29/2017 11:46 PM]
100
08/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG in 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2413, 17-2360, FILED. Service date 08/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2113041] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2413, 17-2360] [Entered: 08/29/2017 11:58 PM]
101
08/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2347 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2413 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2352 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2376 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2343 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2360, [100], ADDED.[2113689] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2413] [Entered: 08/30/2017 01:24 PM]
102
08/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Eric Jonathan Stock for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2351 Eric Jonathan Stock for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2381 Eric Jonathan Stock for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2383 Eric Jonathan Stock for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2360, [99], ADDED.[2113695] [17-2351, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 08/30/2017 01:28 PM]
103
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The County of Mendocino, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority and The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority in 17-2413, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116900] [17-2413, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:29 PM]
104
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant City of Houston in 17-2376, 17-1569, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116903] [17-2376, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:32 PM]
106
09/07/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL [36], on behalf of Appellees HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC USA, Inc., FILED.[2118812] [17-2360] [Entered: 09/07/2017 10:41 AM]
107
09/07/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL [80], on behalf of Appellees RBC Capital Markets LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED.[2118829] [17-2360] [Entered: 09/07/2017 10:46 AM]
108
09/08/2017
ORDER, dated 09/08/2017, dismissing appeal by 9/22/2017, unless Appellant Prudential Core Taxable Market Fund, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[2119714] [17-2360] [Entered: 09/08/2017 09:09 AM]
114
09/19/2017
NOTE: See lead case, 17-1569, containing complete set of docket entries.[2127639] [17-2360] [Entered: 09/19/2017 09:56 AM]
119
09/20/2017
NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2128835] [17-2360] [Entered: 09/20/2017 08:57 AM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.