In Re: Libor-Based Financial

2017-02376 (ca2)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/31/2017
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant City of Houston, FILED. [2093458] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/04/2017 08:52 AM]
2
07/31/2017
DISTRICT COURT CORRECTED ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT, dated 07/19/2017, RECEIVED.[2093462] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/04/2017 08:54 AM]
5
07/31/2017
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2093472] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/04/2017 08:58 AM]
95
08/07/2017
PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant City of Houston, district court receipt # 0208-13988715, FILED.[2111337] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/28/2017 12:24 PM]
6
08/10/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2098066] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/10/2017 04:12 PM]
7
08/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Arthur J. Burke, [6], in place of attorney Peter John Davis, SUBSTITUTED.[2098254] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/11/2017 08:41 AM]
8
08/11/2017
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant City of Houston, FILED. Service date 08/11/2017 by CM/ECF.[2099141] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/11/2017 04:57 PM]
9
08/11/2017
FORM D, on behalf of Appellant City of Houston, FILED. Service date 08/11/2017 by CM/ECF.[2099144] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/11/2017 04:59 PM]
11
08/15/2017
ORDER, dated 08/15/2017, dismissing appeal by 8/29/17, unless Appellant City of Houston, submits fee or moves to proceed in forma pauperis, FILED.[2101061] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/15/2017 12:38 PM]
12
08/15/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF.[2101219] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/15/2017 02:42 PM]
13
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101250] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/15/2017 02:56 PM]
14
08/15/2017
ATTORNEY, Christopher Michael Viapiano for Appellee Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., in case 17-2376, [13], ADDED.[2101373] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/15/2017 03:51 PM]
15
08/15/2017
MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant City of Houston, FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101531] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/15/2017 05:01 PM]
16
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101591] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/15/2017 07:04 PM]
18
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Joel Kurtzberg, [16], in place of attorney Arthur Joseph Burke, SUBSTITUTED.[2101651] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/16/2017 08:36 AM]
19
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2101841] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/16/2017 10:21 AM]
20
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101851] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/16/2017 10:24 AM]
21
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101861] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/16/2017 10:27 AM]
23
08/16/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP request to be removed as counsel for Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A., Credit Suisse Group AG, Royal Bank of Canada, Portigon AG and WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, RECEIVED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2101891] [17-2376]--[Edited 08/16/2017 by TT] [Entered: 08/16/2017 10:40 AM]
24
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2101945] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:02 AM]
25
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale, S.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101996] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:23 AM]
26
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Paul S. Mishkin for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., in case 17-2376, [20], ADDED.[2102098] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/16/2017 12:07 PM]
27
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Adam Gabor Mehes for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., in case 17-2376, [21], ADDED.[2102116] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/16/2017 12:16 PM]
28
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Frank Wise, Jr. and Arthur Joseph Burke, for Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A., Credit Suisse Group AG, Royal Bank of Canada, Portigon AG and WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, TERMINATED.[2102151] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/16/2017 12:34 PM]
29
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Steven Wolowitz, [25], in place of attorney Andrew Calica, SUBSTITUTED.[2102164] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/16/2017 12:45 PM]
30
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC and HSBC Holdings PLC, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102268] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/16/2017 02:11 PM]
31
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC and HSBC Holdings PLC, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102281] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/16/2017 02:19 PM]
32
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102558] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/16/2017 05:29 PM]
33
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102566] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/16/2017 05:39 PM]
34
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102569] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/16/2017 05:42 PM]
35
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by email.[2102615] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/16/2017 07:02 PM]
36
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102645] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:17 PM]
37
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, David R. Gelfand, [32], in place of attorney Mark D. Villaverde, SUBSTITUTED.[2102817] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/17/2017 09:55 AM]
38
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Charles Hora for Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2376, [33], ADDED.[2102852] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/17/2017 10:07 AM]
39
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Mark D. Villaverde for Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2376, [34], ADDED.[2102859] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/17/2017 10:09 AM]
40
08/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale, S.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102916] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/17/2017 10:34 AM]
41
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale, S.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102954] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/17/2017 10:55 AM]
42
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale, S.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102995] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/17/2017 11:10 AM]
43
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Portigon AG and WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103327] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/17/2017 02:22 PM]
44
08/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2103342] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/17/2017 02:31 PM]
45
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103354] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/17/2017 02:36 PM]
46
08/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2103787] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/17/2017 05:23 PM]
47
08/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc and HBOS plc, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2104048] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 10:28 AM]
48
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc and HBOS plc, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104054] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 10:31 AM]
49
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc and HBOS plc, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104064] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 10:34 AM]
50
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Henninger S. Bullock for Appellee Societe Generale, S.A., in case 17-2376, [41], ADDED.[2104086] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 10:44 AM]
51
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Andrew Calica for Appellee Societe Generale, S.A., in case 17-2376, [42], ADDED.[2104101] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 10:53 AM]
52
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Christopher M. Paparella, [43], in place of attorney David Hugh Stern, SUBSTITUTED.[2104139] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:10 AM]
53
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Moses Silverman for Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, in case 17-2376, [45], ADDED.[2104164] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:17 AM]
54
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Marc J. Gottridge [48], in place of attorney Lisa J. Fried, SUBSTITUTED.[2104444] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 01:17 PM]
55
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104577] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:33 PM]
56
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104596] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:43 PM]
57
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104599] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:45 PM]
58
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104606] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 02:47 PM]
59
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104657] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 03:03 PM]
60
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Thomas Smith for Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, in case 17-2376, [36], ADDED.[2104787] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 04:10 PM]
61
08/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2104992] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 08:21 PM]
62
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2105000] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:31 PM]
63
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2105004] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:45 PM]
64
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2105005] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:48 PM]
65
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2105009] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:55 PM]
66
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2105010] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:58 PM]
67
08/19/2017
ATTORNEY, Benjamin Fleming for Appellees HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2376, [49], ADDED.[2105015] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/19/2017 09:26 AM]
68
08/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Herbert Scott Washer for Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2376, [55], ADDED.[2105058] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/20/2017 02:29 PM]
69
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Elai Katz for Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2376, [56], ADDED.[2105153] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/21/2017 09:07 AM]
70
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Thomas C. Rice for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2376, [62], ADDED.[2105171] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/21/2017 09:11 AM]
71
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Mary Beth Forshaw for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2376, [63], ADDED.[2105175] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/21/2017 09:13 AM]
72
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan C. Turner for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2376, [64], ADDED.[2105183] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/21/2017 09:15 AM]
73
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Abram Ellis for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2376, [65], ADDED.[2105201] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/21/2017 09:22 AM]
74
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Alexander Nuo Li for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2376, [66], ADDED.[2105205] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/21/2017 09:24 AM]
75
08/21/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel [30], on behalf of Appellees HSBC Bank PLC and HSBC Holdings PLC, FILED.[2105221] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/21/2017 09:28 AM]
76
08/21/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [59], on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED.[2105265] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/21/2017 09:41 AM]
77
08/21/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/21/2017 by CM/ECF. [2105351] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/21/2017 10:08 AM]
78
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Jason M. Hall for Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2376, [77], ADDED.[2105379] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/21/2017 10:16 AM]
79
08/21/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [77], on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED.[2105387] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/21/2017 10:18 AM]
80
08/21/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 08/21/2017 by CM/ECF. [2106207] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/21/2017 03:48 PM]
81
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, David Sapir Lesser [80], in place of attorney Frank L. Hunter, Jr., SUBSTITUTED.[2106298] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/21/2017 04:20 PM]
82
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107245] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/22/2017 12:13 PM]
83
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107478] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/22/2017 02:37 PM]
84
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107884] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/22/2017 11:26 PM]
85
08/23/2017
ATTORNEY, Andrew A. Ruffino for Appellee Citibank, N.A., in case 17-2376, [58], ADDED.[2108482] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/23/2017 01:04 PM]
86
08/23/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/23/2017 by CM/ECF. [2108940] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/23/2017 09:38 PM]
94
08/24/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [86], on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED.[2109712] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/24/2017 04:21 PM]
101
08/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG in 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 08/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2113038] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 08/29/2017 11:35 PM]
102
08/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG in 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2413, 17-2360, FILED. Service date 08/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2113041] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2413, 17-2360] [Entered: 08/29/2017 11:58 PM]
103
08/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2347 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2413 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2352 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2376 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2343 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2360, [102], ADDED.[2113689] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2413] [Entered: 08/30/2017 01:24 PM]
104
08/30/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/30/2017 by CM/ECF.[2113788] [17-2376] [Entered: 08/30/2017 02:13 PM]
105
08/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2347 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2413 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2352 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2351 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2376 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2343 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2381 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2383, [101], ADDED.[2114140] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 08/30/2017 04:34 PM]
106
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The County of Mendocino, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority and The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority in 17-2413, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116900] [17-2413, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:29 PM]
107
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant City of Houston in 17-2376, 17-1569, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116903] [17-2376, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:32 PM]
108
09/08/2017
STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellees HSBC Bank PLC and HSBC Holdings PLC Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel [30] from the docket, FILED.[2119787] [17-2376] [Entered: 09/08/2017 09:38 AM]
109
09/08/2017
STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellee Royal Bank of Canada's Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel[86] from the docket, FILED.[2119881] [17-2376] [Entered: 09/08/2017 10:26 AM]
110
09/08/2017
NOTE: See lead case, 17-1569, containing complete set of docket entries.[2119896] [17-2376] [Entered: 09/08/2017 10:31 AM]
112
09/08/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 09/08/2017 by CM/ECF. [2119926] [17-2376] [Entered: 09/08/2017 10:41 AM]
114
09/08/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC Bank PLC, FILED. Service date 09/08/2017 by CM/ECF. [2120122] [17-2376] [Entered: 09/08/2017 12:02 PM]
115
09/08/2017
NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2120590] [17-2376] [Entered: 09/08/2017 04:04 PM]
116
09/08/2017
ATTORNEY, Christian T. Kemnitz for Royal Bank of Canada, in case 17-1569 Christian T. Kemnitz for Royal Bank of Canada, in case 17-2376, [112], ADDED.[2120595] [17-2376, 17-1569, 17-2351] [Entered: 09/08/2017 04:08 PM]
117
09/08/2017
ATTORNEY, Jack Ballard for HSBC Holdings PLC HSBC Bank PLC, in case 17-1569 Jack Ballard for HSBC Holdings PLC HSBC Bank PLC, in case 17-2376, [114], ADDED.[2120600] [17-2376, 17-1569] [Entered: 09/08/2017 04:11 PM]
118
09/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 09/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2121297] [17-2376] [Entered: 09/11/2017 02:02 PM]
119
09/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, in case 17-1989, [2121285-2], ADDED.[2121303] [17-1989, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/11/2017 02:07 PM]
120
09/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2376 Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen - Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2343, [118], [2121279-2], ADDED.[2121421] [17-2376, 17-2343] [Entered: 09/11/2017 03:03 PM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.