In Re: Libor-Based Financial
Court Docket Sheet

2nd Circuit Court of Appeals

2017-02413 (ca2)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102611] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:58 PM]

Case 17-2413, Document 121, 09/11/2017, 2121293, Page1 of 1 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR SUBSTITUTE, ADDITIONAL, OR AMICUS COUNSEL Short Title: In Re: LIBOR-Based Financial Instruments Antitrust Litigation _____ Docket No.: 17-2413 ________ Substitute, Additional, or Amicus Counsel’s Contact Information is as follows: Name: Jonathan Ohring Firm: Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP Address: 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY 10005 Telephone: (212) 530-5147 ___________________________ Fax: 212-822-5147 E-mail: JOhring@milbank.com Appearance for: Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A. (n/k/a Coöperatieve Rabobank U.A.)/Defendant-Appellee (party/designation) Select One: G Substitute counsel (replacing lead counsel:) (name/firm) G Substitute counsel (replacing other counsel: _______) (name/firm) G Additional counsel (co-counsel with: David R. Gelfand/Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP ✔) (name/firm) G Amicus (in support of:) (party/designation) CERTIFICATION I certify that: ✔ G I am admitted to practice in this Court and, if required by Interim Local Rule 46.1(a)(2), have renewed my admission on OR G I applied for admission on. Signature of Counsel:/s/Jonathan Ohring Type or Print Name: Jonathan Ohring

DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Letter, [{{196}}] on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The County of Mendocino, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority and The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing AuthoritFILED.[2172261] [17-2413] [Entered: 11/15/2017 08:58 AM]

Case 17-2413, Document 210, 11/15/2017, 2172261, Page1 of 2 United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse 40 Foley Square New York, NY 10007 ROBERT A. KATZMANN CATHERINE O'HAGAN WOLFE CHIEF JUDGE CLERK OF COURT Date: November 15, 2017 DC Docket #: 11-md-2262 Docket #: 17-2413cv DC Court: SDNY (NEW YORK Short Title: In Re: Libor-Based Financial CITY)DC Docket #: 13-cv-5186 DC Court: SDNY (NEW YORK CITY)DC Docket #: 13-cv-626 DC Court: SDNY (NEW YORK CITY)DC Docket #: 13-cv-5221 DC Court: SDNY (NEW YORK CITY)DC Docket #: 13-cv-627 DC Court: SDNY (NEW YORK CITY)DC Docket #: 13-cv-597 DC Court: SDNY (NEW YORK CITY)DC Docket #: 13-cv-8644 DC Court: SDNY (NEW YORK CITY)DC Docket #: 13-cv-5569 DC Court: SDNY (NEW YORK CITY)DC Docket #: 13-cv-625 DC Court: SDNY (NEW YORK CITY)DC Docket #: 13-cv-5187 DC Court: SDNY (NEW YORK CITY) DC Judge: Buchwald NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING On 11/13/2017, the LETTER, on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The County of Mendocino, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority and The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority,was submitted in the above referenced case. The document does not comply with the FRAP or the Court's Local Rules for the following reason(s): Case 17-2413, Document 210, 11/15/2017, 2172261, Page2 of 2 ______ Failure to submit acknowledgment and notice of appearance (Local Rule 12.3) ______ Failure to file the Record on Appeal (FRAP 10, FRAP 11) ______ Missing motion information statement (T-1080-Local Rule 27.1) ______ Missing supporting papers for motion (e.g, affidavit/affirmation/declaration) (FRAP 27) ______ Insufficient number of copies (Local Rules: 21.1, 27.1, 30.1, 31.1) ______ Improper proof of service (FRAP 25) ______ Missing proof of service ______ Served to an incorrect address ______ Incomplete service (Anders v. California 386 U.S. 738 (1967)) ______ Failure to submit document in digital format (Local Rule 25.1) ______ Not Text-Searchable (Local Rule 25.1, Local Rules 25.2), click here for instructions on how to make PDFs text searchable ______ Failure to file appendix on CD-ROM (Local Rule 25.1, Local Rules 25.2) ______ Failure to file special appendix (Local Rule 32.1) ______ Defective cover (FRAP 32) ______ Incorrect caption (FRAP 32) ______ Wrong color cover (FRAP 32) ______ Docket number font too small (Local Rule 32.1) ______ Incorrect pagination, click here for instructions on how to paginate PDFs (Local Rule 32.1) ______ Incorrect font (FRAP 32) ______ Oversized filing (FRAP 27 (motion), FRAP 32 (brief)) ______ Missing Amicus Curiae filing or motion (Local Rule 29.1) ______ Untimely filing ______ Incorrect Filing Event __x____ Other: Please re-file in Lead appeal 17-1569. All documents must be filed in the Lead appeal. Please cure the defect(s) and resubmit the document, with the required copies if necessary, no later than 11/17/2017. The resubmitted documents, if compliant with FRAP and the Local Rules, will be deemed timely filed. Failure to cure the defect(s) by the date set forth above will result in the document being stricken. An appellant's failure to cure a defective filing may result in the dismissal of the appeal. Inquiries regarding this case may be directed to 212-857-8563.

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/03/2017
NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, FILED. [2096170] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/08/2017 04:06 PM]
2
08/03/2017
DISTRICT COURT CORRECTED ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT, dated 07/19/2017, RECEIVED.[2096176] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/08/2017 04:09 PM]
4
08/03/2017
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2096182] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/08/2017 04:10 PM]
5
08/03/2017
PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, district court receipt # 0208-13988715, FILED.[2096199] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/08/2017 04:19 PM]
7
08/09/2017
AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL, with copy of district court docket, on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, FILED.[2097310] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/10/2017 09:14 AM]
8
08/10/2017
NEW PARTY, Appellant Regents of the University of California, East Bay Municipal Utility District, San Diego Association of Governments, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, The County of Mendocino, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo and County of Sonoma, ADDED.[2097336] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/10/2017 09:27 AM]
9
08/10/2017
CAPTION, The Regents of the University of California, East Bay Municipal Utility District, San Diego Association of Governments, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, The County of Mendocino, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo and County of Sonoma added as Plaintiffs - Appellants, AMENDED.[2097346] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/10/2017 09:33 AM]
11
08/10/2017
NEW PARTY, Appellant The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, The Riverside Public Financing Authority, The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority and David E. Sundstrom, ADDED.[2097983] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/10/2017 03:39 PM]
12
08/10/2017
CAPTION, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, The Riverside Public Financing Authority, The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority and David E. Sundstrom added as Plaintiffs - Appellants, AMENDED.[2097986] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/10/2017 03:40 PM]
14
08/11/2017
FORM C, on behalf of Appellants California Public Plaintiffs, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The County of Mendocino, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority and The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority, FILED. Service date 08/11/2017 by CM/ECF.[2099113] [17-2413]--[Edited 08/22/2017 by TT] [Entered: 08/11/2017 04:44 PM]
15
08/11/2017
FORM D, on behalf of Appellants California Public Plaintiffs, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The County of Mendocino, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority and The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority, FILED. Service date 08/11/2017 by CM/ECF.[2099121] [17-2413]--[Edited 08/22/2017 by TT] [Entered: 08/11/2017 04:48 PM]
19
08/15/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF.[2101223] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/15/2017 02:44 PM]
20
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101244] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/15/2017 02:54 PM]
21
08/15/2017
ATTORNEY, Christopher Michael Viapiano for Appellee The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., in case 17-2413, [20], ADDED.[2101312] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/15/2017 03:25 PM]
22
08/15/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation, Ltd., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. and Appellee HSBC Bank PLC and HSBC Holdings PLC, FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101333] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/15/2017 03:31 PM]
23
08/15/2017
MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The County of Mendocino, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority and The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority, FILED. Service date 08/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2101517] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/15/2017 04:56 PM]
26
08/16/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2101955] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:07 AM]
27
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale, S.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102022] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:34 AM]
28
08/16/2017
ATTORNEY, Steven Wolowitz [27], in place of attorney Andrew Calica, SUBSTITUTED.[2102178] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/16/2017 12:50 PM]
29
08/16/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [22], on behalf of Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation, Ltd., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. and Appellees HSBC Bank PLC and HSBC Holdings PLC, FILED.[2102234] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/16/2017 01:48 PM]
30
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102549] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/16/2017 05:16 PM]
31
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102604] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:45 PM]
32
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102611] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:58 PM]
33
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102616] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/16/2017 07:03 PM]
34
08/16/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102652] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/16/2017 11:33 PM]
35
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Arthur Joseph Burke, [30], in place of attorney Peter John Davis, SUBSTITUTED.[2102755] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/17/2017 09:29 AM]
36
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation, Ltd., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. and Appellee HSBC Bank PLC and HSBC Holdings PLC, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102819] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/17/2017 09:56 AM]
37
08/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale, S.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102928] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/17/2017 10:42 AM]
38
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale, S.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102972] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/17/2017 11:02 AM]
39
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale, S.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103015] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/17/2017 11:18 AM]
40
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, David R. Gelfand, [31], in place of attorney Mark D. Villaverde, SUBSTITUTED.[2103146] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/17/2017 12:17 PM]
41
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Charles Hora for Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2413, [32], ADDED.[2103211] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/17/2017 12:46 PM]
42
08/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Mark D. Villaverde for Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2413, [33], ADDED.[2103233] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/17/2017 01:04 PM]
43
08/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2103377] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/17/2017 02:44 PM]
44
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103381] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/17/2017 02:48 PM]
45
08/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Portigon AG and WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2103395] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/17/2017 02:53 PM]
46
08/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2103785] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/17/2017 05:20 PM]
47
08/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2103788] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/17/2017 05:27 PM]
48
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Gregory T. Casamento, [36], in place of attorney Edwin R. DeYoung, SUBSTITUTED.[2104040] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/18/2017 10:24 AM]
49
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Henninger S. Bullock for Appellee Societe Generale, S.A., in case 17-2413, [38], ADDED.[2104099] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/18/2017 10:51 AM]
50
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Andrew Calica for Appellee Societe Generale, S.A., in case 17-2413, [39], ADDED.[2104126] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:02 AM]
51
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Moses Silverman for Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, in case 17-2413, [44], ADDED.[2104185] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/18/2017 11:30 AM]
52
08/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc and HBOS plc, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2104409] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/18/2017 12:52 PM]
53
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc and HBOS plc, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104413] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/18/2017 12:55 PM]
54
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc and HBOS plc, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104415] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/18/2017 12:57 PM]
55
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Benjamin Fleming for Appellees HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2413, [54], ADDED.[2104449] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/18/2017 01:20 PM]
56
08/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Marc J. Gottridge, [53], in place of attorney Lisa J. Fried, SUBSTITUTED.[2104454] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/18/2017 01:22 PM]
57
08/18/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [52], on behalf of Appellees HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc, FILED.[2104465] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/18/2017 01:32 PM]
58
08/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc and HBOS plc, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2104793] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/18/2017 04:12 PM]
59
08/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group plc and HBOS plc, FILED. Service date 08/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2104801] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/18/2017 04:15 PM]
60
08/18/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [34], on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED.[2104818] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/18/2017 04:20 PM]
61
08/18/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel [45], on behalf of Appellees Portigon AG and WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, FILED.[2104878] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/18/2017 04:48 PM]
62
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Lisa J Fried for Appellees HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-2413, [59], ADDED.[2105102] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/21/2017 08:30 AM]
63
08/21/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/21/2017 by CM/ECF.[2105357] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/21/2017 10:10 AM]
64
08/21/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/21/2017 by CM/ECF. [2105367] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/21/2017 10:12 AM]
65
08/21/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. and Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, FILED. Service date 08/21/2017 by CM/ECF. [2105381] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/21/2017 10:17 AM]
66
08/21/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., request that the firm Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP be removed as counsel for Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A., Royal Bank of Canada, Portigon AG and WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, RECEIVED. Service date 08/21/2017 by CM/ECF.[2105397] [17-2413]--[Edited 08/21/2017 by TT] [Entered: 08/21/2017 10:21 AM]
67
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Paul S. Mishkin for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., in case 17-2413, [64], ADDED.[2105407] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/21/2017 10:23 AM]
68
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Adam Gabor Mehes for Appellees Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. and Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, in case 17-2413, [65], ADDED.[2105411] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/21/2017 10:26 AM]
69
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Wise for Citigroup Inc., Arthur Burke and Robert Wise for Citibank, N.A., Arthur Burke for Royal Bank of Canada, Robert Wise for Portigon AG and Arthur Burke for WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, TERMINATED.[2105437] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/21/2017 10:36 AM]
70
08/21/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/21/2017 by CM/ECF. [2106039] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/21/2017 02:34 PM]
71
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, Joel Kurtzberg, [70], in place of attorney Lauren Perlgut, SUBSTITUTED.[2106159] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/21/2017 03:31 PM]
72
08/21/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 08/21/2017 by CM/ECF. [2106202] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/21/2017 03:45 PM]
73
08/21/2017
ATTORNEY, David Sapir Lesser, [72], in place of attorney Frank Hunter, SUBSTITUTED.[2106308] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/21/2017 04:24 PM]
74
08/21/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Portigon AG and WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, FILED. Service date 08/21/2017 by CM/ECF. [2106471] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/21/2017 11:39 PM]
75
08/22/2017
ATTORNEY, Christopher Paparella, [74], in place of attorney David Hugh Stern, SUBSTITUTED.[2106881] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 10:42 AM]
76
08/22/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL [74], on behalf of Appellees Portigon AG and WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, FILED.[2106894] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 10:45 AM]
77
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107238] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 12:10 PM]
78
08/22/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF. [2107417] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 02:04 PM]
79
08/22/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF. [2107626] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 03:47 PM]
80
08/22/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Thomas Smith, [79], in place of attorney Brian J. Poronsky, SUBSTITUTED.[2107721] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 04:26 PM]
81
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107755] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 04:39 PM]
82
08/22/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF. [2107771] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 04:45 PM]
83
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107787] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 04:49 PM]
84
08/22/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF. [2107788] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 04:50 PM]
85
08/22/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF. [2107793] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 04:52 PM]
86
08/22/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF. [2107794] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 04:53 PM]
87
08/22/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF. [2107804] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 04:55 PM]
88
08/22/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF. [2107813] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 04:58 PM]
89
08/22/2017
ATTORNEY, Andrew A. Ruffino for Appellees Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A., in case 17-2413, [78], ADDED.[2107815] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 05:00 PM]
90
08/22/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF. [2107819] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 05:02 PM]
91
08/22/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF. [2107824] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 05:06 PM]
92
08/22/2017
ATTORNEY, Elai Katz for Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2413, [82], ADDED.[2107825] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 05:06 PM]
93
08/22/2017
ATTORNEY, Jason M. Hall for Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2413, [84], ADDED.[2107840] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 05:24 PM]
94
08/22/2017
ATTORNEY, Adam Mintz for Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 17-2413, [85], ADDED.[2107844] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 05:26 PM]
95
08/22/2017
ATTORNEY, Thomas C. Rice for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2413, [86], ADDED.[2107845] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 05:30 PM]
96
08/22/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF.[2107885] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/22/2017 11:31 PM]
97
08/23/2017
ATTORNEY, Mary Beth Forshaw for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2413, [87], ADDED.[2107922] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/23/2017 08:42 AM]
98
08/23/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan C. Turner for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2413, [88], ADDED.[2107928] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/23/2017 08:44 AM]
99
08/23/2017
ATTORNEY, Abram Ellis for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2413, [90], ADDED.[2107940] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/23/2017 08:49 AM]
100
08/23/2017
ATTORNEY, Alexander Nuo Li for Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-2413, [91], ADDED.[2107945] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/23/2017 08:52 AM]
101
08/23/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 08/23/2017 by CM/ECF.[2108109] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/23/2017 10:01 AM]
102
08/23/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/23/2017 by CM/ECF.[2108250] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/23/2017 11:04 AM]
103
08/23/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/23/2017 by CM/ECF. [2108943] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/23/2017 09:43 PM]
105
08/24/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [103], on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED.[2109192] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/24/2017 10:16 AM]
106
08/24/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF. [2109246] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/24/2017 10:45 AM]
112
08/24/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [105], [106], on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada in 17-2351, FILED.[2109679] [17-2413, 17-2351] [Entered: 08/24/2017 04:05 PM]
113
08/24/2017
ATTORNEY, Christian T. Kemnitz for Royal Bank of Canada, in case 17-2413, [106], ADDED.[2109728] [17-2413] [Entered: 08/24/2017 04:30 PM]
115
08/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG in 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 08/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2113038] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 08/29/2017 11:35 PM]
116
08/29/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG in 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2413, 17-2360, FILED. Service date 08/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2113041] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2413, 17-2360] [Entered: 08/29/2017 11:58 PM]
117
08/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2347 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2413 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2352 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2376 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2343 Peter Sullivan for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2360, [116], ADDED.[2113689] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2413] [Entered: 08/30/2017 01:24 PM]
118
08/30/2017
ATTORNEY, Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2347 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2413 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2352 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2351 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2376 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2343 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2381 Jefferson E. Bell for Appellee UBS AG, in case 17-2383, [115], ADDED.[2114140] [17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 08/30/2017 04:34 PM]
119
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The County of Mendocino, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority and The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority in 17-2413, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116900] [17-2413, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:29 PM]
120
09/05/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant City of Houston in 17-2376, 17-1569, FILED. Service date 09/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[2116903] [17-2376, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/05/2017 01:32 PM]
121
09/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 09/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2121293] [17-2413] [Entered: 09/11/2017 01:59 PM]
122
09/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, in case 17-1989, [2121285-2], ADDED.[2121303] [17-1989, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/11/2017 02:07 PM]
123
09/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-2413, [121], ADDED.[2121763] [17-2413, 17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383] [Entered: 09/11/2017 04:46 PM]
124
09/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citi Swapco Inc. and Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. in 17-1569, Appellee Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A. in 17-1915, Appellee Citigroup Inc. in 17-2056, Appellee Citigroup, Inc. and Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. in 17-2343, Appellee Citigroup Financial Products, Inc. in 17-2347, Appellee Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. and Citigroup Funding, Inc. in 17-2360, Appellee Citibank, N.A. in 17-2376, Citigroup Global Markets Ltd. in 17-2381, Appellee Citigroup, Inc., Citi Swapco Inc. and Citigroup Financial Products Inc. in 17-2383, 17-2413, FILED. Service date 09/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2121843] [17-1569, 17-1915, 17-1989, 17-2056, 17-2343, 17-2347, 17-2351, 17-2352, 17-2360, 17-2376, 17-2381, 17-2383, 17-2413] [Entered: 09/11/2017 06:09 PM]
125
09/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan M. Wiseman for Appellees Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A., in case 17-2413, [124], ADDED.[2124364] [17-2413] [Entered: 09/14/2017 11:25 AM]
126
09/14/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [58], on behalf of Appellees HBOS plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc, FILED.[2124373] [17-2413] [Entered: 09/14/2017 11:29 AM]
127
09/14/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL [79], on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, FILED.[2124384] [17-2413] [Entered: 09/14/2017 11:33 AM]
128
09/14/2017
NOTE: See lead case, 17-1569, containing complete set of docket entries.[2124432] [17-2413] [Entered: 09/14/2017 11:47 AM]
131
09/14/2017
NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2125031] [17-2413, 17-1569] [Entered: 09/14/2017 04:47 PM]
210
11/15/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Letter, [196] on behalf of Appellant California Public Plaintiffs, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Regents of the University of California, San Diego Association of Governments, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, David E. Sundstrom, The County of Mendocino, The Richmind Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority and The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing AuthoritFILED.[2172261] [17-2413] [Entered: 11/15/2017 08:58 AM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.